31/0 |
D5500
|
31018
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/10/1957 |
10/07/1976 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
12/03/1969 |
31/0 |
D5501
|
31001
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/11/1957 |
10/07/1976 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
27/02/1969 |
31/0 |
D5502
|
31002
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
ADB968014
|
|
16/12/1957 |
01/01/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/0 |
D5503
|
31003
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/01/1958 |
03/02/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
28/01/1977 |
31/0 |
D5504
|
31004
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/01/1958 |
05/10/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
28/01/1977 |
31/0 |
D5505
|
31005
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/02/1958 |
03/02/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/0 |
D5506
|
31006
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/03/1958 |
05/01/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
28/01/1977 |
31/0 |
D5507
|
31007
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/04/1958 |
04/11/1976 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
06/02/1969 |
31/0 |
D5508
|
31008
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
ADB968016
|
|
17/04/1958 |
01/10/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
28/01/1977 |
31/0 |
D5509
|
31009
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/05/1958 |
10/07/1976 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
13/12/1968 |
31/0 |
D5510
|
31010
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/05/1958 |
10/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
28/01/1977 |
31/0 |
D5511
|
31011
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/06/1958 |
10/07/1976 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
10/01/1969 |
31/0 |
D5512
|
31012
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/06/1958 |
04/11/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
31/0 |
D5513
|
31013
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
ADB968013
|
|
13/07/1958 |
01/03/1979 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
09/12/1976 |
31/0 |
D5514
|
31014
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
ADB968015
|
|
24/07/1958 |
01/11/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/0 |
D5515
|
31015
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/07/1958 |
04/05/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
12/05/1977 |
31/0 |
D5516
|
31016
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/09/1958 |
10/07/1976 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
17/01/1969 |
31/0 |
D5517
|
31017
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/09/1958 |
04/05/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5518
|
|
31101
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/10/1958 |
11/01/1993 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
28/01/1977 |
31/0 |
D5519
|
31019
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/12/1958 |
05/10/1980 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
28/11/1968 |
31/1 |
D5520
|
|
31102
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/02/1959 |
11/1996 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5521
|
|
31103
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/03/1959 |
05/10/1980 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
10/1966 |
31/4 |
D5522
|
|
(31104)
|
31418
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/03/1959 |
06/10/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5523
|
|
31105
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/03/1959 |
01/05/1997 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
02/1967 |
31/1 |
D5524
|
|
31106
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/03/1959 |
01/11/1995 |
Air Brakes fitted |
01/1970 |
31/1 |
D5525
|
|
31107
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/04/1959 |
31/10/2008 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5526
|
|
31108
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/04/1959 |
27/09/1991 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
25/05/1968 |
31/1 |
D5527
|
|
31109
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/04/1959 |
11/03/1988 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
18/08/1978 |
31/1 |
D5528
|
|
31110
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/04/1959 |
31/05/2006 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
11/04/1970 |
31/1 |
D5529
|
|
31111
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/05/1959 |
12/06/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/1 |
D5530
|
|
31112
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/05/1959 |
01/05/1997 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
19/12/1968 |
31/1 |
D5531
|
|
31113
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/05/1959 |
30/07/2004 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
08/1968 |
31/5 |
D5532
|
|
31114
|
31453
|
31553
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/06/1959 |
01/11/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5533
|
|
31115
|
31466
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/06/1959 |
01/02/2001 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
31/1 |
D5534
|
|
31116
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/06/1959 |
04/02/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
14/07/1977 |
31/1 |
D5535
|
|
31117
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/06/1959 |
11/03/1987 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
05/1970 |
31/1 |
D5536
|
|
31118
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/06/1959 |
20/02/1989 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
30/05/1970 |
31/1 |
D5537
|
|
31119
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/06/1959 |
09/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5538
|
|
31120
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/07/1959 |
27/09/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/1 |
D5539
|
|
31121
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/07/1959 |
01/09/1988 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
06/1970 |
31/1 |
D5540
|
|
31122
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/07/1959 |
22/01/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5541
|
|
31123
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/07/1959 |
16/03/1992 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
09/1977 |
31/1 |
D5542
|
|
31124
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/07/1959 |
25/05/1990 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
31/1 |
D5543
|
|
31125
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/07/1959 |
12/1994 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
11/1975 |
31/1 |
D5544
|
|
31126
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/08/1959 |
14/01/2000 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
11/1975 |
31/1 |
D5545
|
|
31127
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/10/1959 |
21/06/1989 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
01/1968 |
31/1 |
D5546
|
|
31128
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/08/1959 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5547
|
|
31129
|
31461
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/08/1959 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5548
|
|
31130
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/09/1959 |
08/1997 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/1973 |
31/1 |
D5549
|
|
31131
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/09/1959 |
22/03/1989 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
01/1979 |
31/1 |
D5550
|
|
31132
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/09/1959 |
16/06/2000 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
31/4 |
D5551
|
|
31133
|
31450
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/09/1959 |
01/12/1998 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5552
|
|
31134
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/09/1959 |
14/01/2000 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
31/1 |
D5553
|
|
31135
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/09/1959 |
04/02/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/03/1971 |
31/1 |
D5554
|
|
31136
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/10/1959 |
24/08/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
31/5 |
D5555
|
|
31137
|
31444
|
31544
|
|
31444
|
|
|
|
|
01/10/1959 |
01/12/1995 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
23/06/1977 |
31/1 |
D5556
|
|
31138
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/10/1959 |
02/02/1989 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
03/06/1977 |
31/5 |
D5557
|
|
31139
|
31438
|
31538
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/10/1959 |
01/09/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5558
|
|
31140
|
31421
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/10/1959 |
01/03/1997 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/1 |
D5559
|
|
31141
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/10/1959 |
25/01/1989 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5560
|
|
31142
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/10/1959 |
05/05/2000 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
12/1974 |
31/1 |
D5561
|
|
31143
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/10/1959 |
12/12/1988 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
09/02/1977 |
31/1 |
D5562
|
|
31144
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/11/1959 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5563
|
|
31145
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/11/1959 |
14/01/2000 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
11/1978 |
31/1 |
D5564
|
|
31146
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/11/1959 |
24/03/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/03/1971 |
31/1 |
D5565
|
|
31147
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/11/1959 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/5 |
D5566
|
|
31148
|
31448
|
31548
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/11/1959 |
01/07/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5567
|
|
31149
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/11/1959 |
05/05/2000 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
31/1 |
D5568
|
|
31150
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/12/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/4 |
D5569
|
|
31151
|
31436
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/12/1959 |
01/10/1986 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5570
|
|
31152
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/12/1959 |
01/06/1989 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5571
|
|
31153
|
31432
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/12/1959 |
01/05/1996 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5572
|
|
31154
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/12/1959 |
31/05/2006 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5573
|
|
31155
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/12/1959 |
26/05/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
11/1975 |
31/1 |
D5574
|
|
31156
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/12/1959 |
28/02/1992 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
13/11/1965 |
31/5 |
D5575
|
|
31157
|
31424
|
31524
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/12/1959 |
01/05/1996 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
01/1975 |
31/1 |
D5576
|
|
31158
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/12/1959 |
07/07/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/1 |
D5577
|
|
31159
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/12/1959 |
12/06/1996 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/1979 |
31/1 |
D5578
|
|
31160
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/01/1960 |
14/01/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5579
|
|
31161
|
31400
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/01/1960 |
01/07/1991 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
25/05/1968 |
31/1 |
D5580
|
|
31162
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/01/1960 |
01/05/1992 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5581
|
|
31163
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/01/1960 |
19/01/1999 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
01/1966 |
31/1 |
D5582
|
|
31164
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/01/1960 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5583
|
|
31165
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/01/1960 |
21/01/2000 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
31/1 |
D5584
|
|
31166
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/01/1960 |
19/01/1999 |
EQ Brakes Added |
30/10/1970 |
31/1 |
D5585
|
|
31167
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/01/1960 |
27/09/1988 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5586
|
|
31168
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/02/1960 |
20/12/1991 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
08/09/1967 |
31/4 |
D5587
|
|
31169
|
31457
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/02/1960 |
01/02/1994 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5588
|
|
31170
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/02/1960 |
08/01/1990 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5589
|
|
|
31401
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/02/1960 |
31/03/1988 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5590
|
|
31171
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/02/1960 |
31/10/2003 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
28/01/1977 |
31/4 |
D5591
|
|
31172
|
31420
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/02/1960 |
01/01/2001 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/4 |
D5592
|
|
|
31402
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/02/1960 |
20/03/1992 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5593
|
|
31173
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/02/1960 |
14/04/1989 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5594
|
|
31174
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/03/1960 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5595
|
|
31175
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/03/1960 |
02/03/1987 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
05/1966 |
31/4 |
D5596
|
|
|
31403
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/03/1960 |
04/02/2000 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5597
|
|
31176
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/03/1960 |
27/04/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5598
|
|
31177
|
31443
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/03/1960 |
01/07/1989 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5599
|
|
31178
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/03/1960 |
23/06/2000 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
07/1968 |
31/4 |
D5600
|
|
31179
|
31435
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/03/1960 |
01/11/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5601
|
|
31180
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/03/1960 |
03/03/2000 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
31/1 |
D5602
|
|
31181
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/03/1960 |
13/03/2003 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
31/5 |
D5603
|
|
31182
|
31437
|
31537
|
|
31437
|
|
|
|
|
31/03/1960 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5604
|
|
31183
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/04/1960 |
08/07/1988 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/4 |
D5605
|
|
|
31404
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/04/1960 |
21/02/1991 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/4 |
D5606
|
|
|
31405
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/04/1960 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5607
|
|
31184
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/04/1960 |
04/02/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5608
|
|
31185
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/04/1960 |
31/03/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
24/10/1968 |
31/6 |
D5609
|
|
31186
|
|
|
|
|
31601
|
|
|
|
21/04/1960 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5610
|
|
31187
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/04/1960 |
03/03/2000 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5611
|
|
31188
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/04/1960 |
24/01/1999 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/10/1968 |
31/1 |
D5612
|
|
31189
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/05/1960 |
26/05/1989 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5613
|
|
31190
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/05/1960 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/6 |
D5614
|
|
31191
|
|
|
|
|
31602
|
|
|
|
12/05/1960 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5615
|
|
31192
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/05/1960 |
10/10/1982 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/4 |
D5616
|
|
|
31406
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/05/1960 |
04/01/1991 |
Air Brakes fitted |
17/12/1971 |
31/5 |
D5617
|
|
31193
|
31426
|
31526
|
|
31426
|
|
|
|
|
19/05/1960 |
01/05/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5618
|
|
31194
|
31427
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/05/1960 |
01/02/1999 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
05/1967 |
31/1 |
D5619
|
|
31195
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/05/1960 |
04/02/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/06/1975 |
31/1 |
D5620
|
|
31196
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/06/1960 |
26/02/1993 |
Air Brakes fitted |
26/09/1970 |
31/4 |
D5621
|
|
31197
|
31423
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/06/1960 |
01/09/1996 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
03/1979 |
31/1 |
D5622
|
|
31198
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/06/1960 |
16/03/1990 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5623
|
|
31199
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/06/1960 |
05/05/2000 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5624
|
|
31200
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/06/1960 |
30/06/2007 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5625
|
|
31201
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/06/1960 |
24/03/2000 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5626
|
|
31202
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/06/1960 |
28/10/1988 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5627
|
|
31203
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/06/1960 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/4 |
D5628
|
|
31204
|
31440
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/06/1960 |
01/03/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5629
|
|
31205
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/06/1960 |
18/02/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
23/10/1975 |
31/1 |
D5630
|
|
31206
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/07/1960 |
30/11/2006 |
Air Brakes fitted |
07/08/1975 |
31/1 |
D5631
|
|
31207
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/07/1960 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
10/1966 |
31/1 |
D5632
|
|
31208
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/07/1960 |
13/03/1990 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5633
|
|
31209
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/07/1960 |
15/05/2003 |
Air Brakes fitted |
01/05/1975 |
31/1 |
D5634
|
|
31210
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/07/1960 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
30/10/1970 |
31/4 |
D5635
|
|
31211
|
31428
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/07/1960 |
01/01/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5636
|
|
31212
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/07/1960 |
16/12/1991 |
Air Brakes fitted |
06/06/1970 |
31/5 |
D5637
|
|
31213
|
31465
|
31565
|
|
31465
|
|
|
|
|
28/07/1960 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
10/1977 |
31/1 |
D5638
|
|
31214
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/08/1960 |
15/05/1983 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
12/1966 |
31/1 |
D5639
|
|
31215
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/08/1960 |
04/06/1993 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/5 |
D5640
|
|
|
31407
|
31507
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/08/1960 |
31/05/2006 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/4 |
D5641
|
|
31216
|
31467
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/08/1960 |
01/03/1998 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/1 |
D5642
|
|
31217
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/08/1960 |
08/07/1993 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5643
|
|
31218
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/08/1960 |
20/04/1988 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5644
|
|
31219
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/08/1960 |
18/02/2000 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/5 |
D5645
|
|
31220
|
31441
|
31541
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/09/1960 |
01/03/1996 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5646
|
|
|
31408
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/09/1960 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
12/10/1968 |
31/1 |
D5647
|
|
31221
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/09/1960 |
30/08/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
30/10/1970 |
31/1 |
D5648
|
|
31222
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/09/1960 |
13/10/1988 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5649
|
|
31223
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/09/1960 |
16/12/1991 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5650
|
|
31224
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/09/1960 |
30/06/2000 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5651
|
|
31225
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/09/1960 |
07/03/1989 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5652
|
|
31226
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/09/1960 |
03/01/1989 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5653
|
|
31227
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/09/1960 |
16/12/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/10/1968 |
31/5 |
D5654
|
|
31228
|
31454
|
31554
|
|
31454
|
|
|
|
|
29/09/1960 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
30/10/1970 |
31/1 |
D5655
|
|
31229
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/09/1960 |
10/08/2001 |
EQ Brakes Added |
30/10/1970 |
31/4 |
D5656
|
|
|
31409
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/10/1960 |
04/01/1991 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
11/12/1971 |
31/1 |
D5657
|
|
31230
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/10/1960 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
15/11/1968 |
31/1 |
D5658
|
|
31231
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/10/1960 |
22/01/1990 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5659
|
|
31232
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/10/1960 |
26/05/2000 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
31/1 |
D5660
|
|
31233
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/10/1960 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5661
|
|
31234
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/10/1960 |
11/06/1993 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
20/12/1968 |
31/1 |
D5662
|
|
31235
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/10/1960 |
26/05/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
28/05/1969 |
31/5 |
D5663
|
|
31236
|
31433
|
31533
|
|
31433
|
|
|
|
|
03/11/1960 |
01/07/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5664
|
|
31237
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/11/1960 |
16/06/2000 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
10/1966 |
31/1 |
D5665
|
|
31238
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/11/1960 |
14/01/2000 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
03/1979 |
31/4 |
D5666
|
|
31239
|
31439
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/11/1960 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5667
|
|
31240
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/11/1960 |
17/01/1990 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
10/1966 |
31/1 |
D5668
|
|
31241
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/11/1960 |
14/03/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5669
|
|
|
31410
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/11/1960 |
30/06/2003 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
11/1977 |
31/1 |
D5670
|
|
31242
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/01/1961 |
14/12/1998 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/10/1971 |
31/1 |
D5671
|
|
31243
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/10/1960 |
08/04/1991 |
Air Brakes fitted |
18/01/1974 |
31/1 |
D5672
|
|
31244
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/11/1960 |
31/05/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5673
|
|
31245
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/12/1960 |
05/01/1987 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/1975 |
31/5 |
D5674
|
|
31246
|
31455
|
31555
|
|
31455
|
|
|
|
|
01/12/1960 |
01/09/1996 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5675
|
|
31247
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/12/1960 |
04/02/2000 |
Tablet catcher apparatus removed |
07/1975 |
31/1 |
D5676
|
|
31248
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/12/1960 |
31/03/2000 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
31/1 |
D5677
|
|
31249
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/12/1960 |
16/12/1991 |
Trip cock gear removed |
02/1978 |
31/1 |
D5678
|
|
31250
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/12/1960 |
11/02/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/11/1968 |
31/4 |
D5679
|
|
31251
|
31442
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/12/1960 |
01/09/1993 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5680
|
|
31252
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/12/1960 |
31/03/2000 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
03/1978 |
31/5 |
D5681
|
|
31253
|
31431
|
31531
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/01/1961 |
01/01/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
30/10/1970 |
31/1 |
D5682
|
|
31254
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/01/1961 |
01/12/1979 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
04/1977 |
31/1 |
D5683
|
|
31255
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/01/1961 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
31/4 |
D5684
|
|
31256
|
31459
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/01/1961 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
07/1981 |
31/1 |
D5685
|
|
31257
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/02/1961 |
10/09/1990 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/07/1969 |
31/4 |
D5686
|
|
31258
|
31434
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/02/1961 |
01/11/1998 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/1 |
D5687
|
|
31259
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/02/1961 |
02/03/1989 |
EQ Brakes Added |
30/10/1970 |
31/1 |
D5688
|
|
31260
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/02/1961 |
12/01/1990 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
04/1977 |
31/1 |
D5689
|
|
31261
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/03/1961 |
05/01/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
30/10/1970 |
31/1 |
D5690
|
|
31262
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/03/1961 |
29/05/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5691
|
|
|
31411
|
31511
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
16/03/1961 |
30/11/2005 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/02/1972 |
31/5 |
D5692
|
|
|
31412
|
31512
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/03/1961 |
31/05/2006 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
04/1977 |
31/1 |
D5693
|
|
31263
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/03/1961 |
10/08/2001 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/11/1976 |
31/1 |
D5694
|
|
31264
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/04/1961 |
08/04/1991 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
12/1966 |
31/5 |
D5695
|
|
31265
|
31430
|
31530
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/04/1961 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
04/1977 |
31/4 |
D5696
|
|
31266
|
31460
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/05/1961 |
01/12/1992 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5697
|
|
(31267)
|
31419
|
31519
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/05/1961 |
01/12/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5698
|
|
31268
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/05/1961 |
11/02/2000 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/11/1972 |
31/4 |
D5699
|
|
31269
|
31429
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
27/04/1961 |
01/11/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5800
|
|
31270
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/06/1961 |
26/05/2000 |
Modified headcode box |
08/1976 |
31/1 |
D5801
|
|
31271
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
08/06/1961 |
01/05/1997 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5802
|
|
31272
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/06/1961 |
15/08/1995 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/06/1969 |
31/1 |
D5803
|
|
31273
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
22/06/1961 |
12/04/2001 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5804
|
|
31274
|
31425
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
29/06/1961 |
01/09/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5805
|
|
31275
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/07/1961 |
31/01/2005 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
24/09/1966 |
31/1 |
D5806
|
|
31276
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
13/07/1961 |
11/02/2000 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
02/1967 |
31/5 |
D5807
|
|
31277
|
31469
|
31569
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/07/1961 |
01/02/1995 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
07/1966 |
31/1 |
D5808
|
|
31278
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/07/1961 |
29/03/1989 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5809
|
|
31279
|
31452
|
31552
|
|
31452
|
|
|
|
|
27/07/1961 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5810
|
|
31280
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/08/1961 |
24/10/1988 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5811
|
|
31281
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/08/1961 |
15/05/1989 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
03/1967 |
31/4 |
D5812
|
|
|
31413
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/08/1961 |
01/05/1997 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
06/1967 |
31/1 |
D5813
|
|
31282
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/09/1961 |
17/01/1994 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
30/11/1966 |
31/5 |
D5814
|
|
|
31414
|
31514
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/09/1961 |
01/02/1999 |
Air Brakes fitted |
02/06/1973 |
31/1 |
D5815
|
|
31283
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/09/1961 |
03/11/1989 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
10/1966 |
31/1 |
D5816
|
|
31284
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/09/1961 |
30/08/1989 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5817
|
|
31285
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/10/1961 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
06/1967 |
31/1 |
D5818
|
|
31286
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/10/1961 |
20/12/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5819
|
|
31287
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/10/1961 |
09/09/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5820
|
|
31288
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/10/1961 |
08/04/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5821
|
|
31289
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/11/1961 |
01/03/1992 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5822
|
|
31290
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
09/11/1961 |
04/02/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5823
|
|
31291
|
31456
|
31556
|
31556
|
31456
|
|
|
|
|
16/11/1961 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5824
|
|
|
31415
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/11/1961 |
01/07/1995 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
04/08/1972 |
31/1 |
D5825
|
|
31292
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/11/1961 |
07/02/1990 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
10/1966 |
31/1 |
D5826
|
|
31293
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/12/1961 |
09/11/1990 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
25/06/1977 |
31/1 |
D5827
|
|
31294
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/12/1961 |
04/02/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5828
|
|
31295
|
31447
|
31547
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/12/1961 |
01/01/1996 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5829
|
|
31296
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/01/1962 |
01/12/1993 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
02/1967 |
31/5 |
D5830
|
|
31297
|
31463
|
31563
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/01/1962 |
01/02/1998 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5831
|
|
31298
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
97203
|
18/01/1962 |
06/07/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5832
|
|
31299
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/02/1962 |
10/10/1990 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5833
|
|
31300
|
31445
|
31545
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
15/02/1962 |
01/05/1997 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5834
|
|
31301
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/03/1962 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
10/1966 |
31/1 |
D5835
|
|
31302
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/04/1962 |
14/01/2000 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/08/1978 |
31/5 |
D5836
|
|
31303
|
31458
|
31558
|
|
31458
|
|
|
|
|
12/04/1962 |
01/01/1996 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5837
|
|
31304
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
19/04/1962 |
14/01/2000 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5838
|
|
31305
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/04/1962 |
08/11/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5839
|
|
31306
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
03/05/1962 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5840
|
|
31307
|
31449
|
31549
|
|
31449
|
|
|
|
|
10/05/1962 |
01/03/1996 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
13/11/1965 |
31/1 |
D5841
|
|
31308
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
17/05/1962 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
05/11/1976 |
31/5 |
D5842
|
|
|
31416
|
31516
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
24/05/1962 |
01/10/1995 |
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
10/03/1973 |
31/1 |
D5843
|
|
31309
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
31/05/1962 |
08/04/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5844
|
|
31310
|
31422
|
31522
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/06/1962 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
31/1 |
D5845
|
|
31311
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
14/06/1962 |
07/02/1989 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
08/1965 |
31/1 |
D5846
|
|
31312
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
21/06/1962 |
14/01/1996 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/03/1971 |
31/1 |
D5847
|
|
31313
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
28/06/1962 |
31/05/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5848
|
|
31314
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
05/07/1962 |
19/09/1982 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
02/1965 |
31/4 |
D5849
|
|
31315
|
31462
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
12/07/1962 |
01/04/1998 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/5 |
D5850
|
|
31316
|
31446
|
31546
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
18/07/1962 |
01/11/1995 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5851
|
|
31317
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
26/07/1962 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
09/1968 |
31/5 |
D5852
|
|
31318
|
31451
|
31551
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
02/08/1962 |
01/03/1996 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5853
|
|
31319
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/08/1962 |
30/04/2007 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5854
|
|
31320
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
23/08/1962 |
28/04/1990 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
10/1967 |
31/5 |
D5855
|
|
31321
|
31468
|
31568
|
|
31468
|
|
|
|
|
30/08/1962 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
31/4 |
D5856
|
|
|
31417
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
30/08/1962 |
30/11/2005 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
01/1966 |
31/1 |
D5857
|
|
31322
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/09/1962 |
28/07/1989 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5858
|
|
31323
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
20/09/1962 |
08/06/1989 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
18/11/1967 |
31/1 |
D5859
|
|
31324
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
04/10/1962 |
16/04/1993 |
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
13/11/1965 |
31/4 |
D5860
|
|
31325
|
31464
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
11/10/1962 |
01/01/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5861
|
|
31326
|
|
|
|
|
|
31970
|
|
97204
|
18/10/1962 |
01/09/1991 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
31/1 |
D5862
|
|
31327
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
25/10/1962 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
03/1966 |