Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 179 Today
» 3545 Yesterday
» 16486 Week
» 68371 Month
» 693726 Year
» 3720579 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

31 A1A-A1A


Pre-TOPS TOPS Rebuild Rebuild Date Notes
D5500 31018 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/03/1969  
D5501 31001 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 27/02/1969  
D5502 31002 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/1968  
D5503 31003 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 19/10/1968  
D5504 31004 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/10/1968  
D5505 31005 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 14/11/1968  
D5506 31006 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 25/05/1968  
D5507 31007 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/02/1969  
D5508 31008 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/10/1968  
D5509 31009 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/12/1968  
D5510 31010 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/01/1969  
D5511 31011 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/01/1969  
D5512 31012 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 11/02/1969  
D5513 31013 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 19/04/1968  
D5514 31014 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 19/12/1968  
D5515 31015 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 17/07/1968  
D5516 31016 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 17/01/1969  
D5517 31017 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 19/10/1968  
D5518 31101 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/08/1967  
D5519 31019 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 28/11/1968  
D5520 31102 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1967  
D5521 31103 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5522 31104
31418
31104
31418
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 11/1973  
D5523 31105 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1967  
D5524 31106 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/1967  
D5525 31107 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 11/09/1965  
D5526 31108 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 25/05/1968  
D5527 31109 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1965  
D5528 31110 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/03/1969  
D5529 31111 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/05/1968  
D5530 31112 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 19/12/1968  
D5531 31113 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/1968  
D5532 31114
31453
31553
31114
31453
31553
31114
31453
31553
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/04/1990  
D5533 31115
31466
31115
31466
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/03/1985  
D5534 31116 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1965  
D5535 31117 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 20/11/1968  
D5536 31118 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/1966  
D5537 31119 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/1967  
D5538 31120 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 28/03/1968  
D5539 31121 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/12/1968  
D5540 31122 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1965  
D5541 31123 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1965  
D5542 31124 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/1968  
D5543 31125 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/1968  
D5544 31126 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 31/07/1968  
D5545 31127 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1968  
D5546 31128 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/1965  
D5547 31129
31461
31129
31461
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 20/01/1985  
D5548 31130 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1967  
D5549 31131 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 24/09/1966  
D5550 31132 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/05/1968  
D5551 31133
31450
31133
31450
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 14/09/1984  
D5552 31134 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 26/04/1968  
D5553 31135 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/11/1965  
D5554 31136 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/11/1968  
D5555 31137
31444
31544
31444
31137
31444
31544
31444
31137
31444
31544
31444
31137
31444
31544
31444
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/12/1993  
D5556 31138 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1965  
D5557 31139
31438
31538
31139
31438
31538
31139
31438
31538
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 14/12/1993  
D5558 31140
31421
31140
31421
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 11/1974  
D5559 31141 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1965  
D5560 31142 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/1968  
D5561 31143 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/1967  
D5562 31144 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/03/1966  
D5563 31145 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/04/1968  
D5564 31146 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 29/03/1968  
D5565 31147 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 29/03/1968  
D5566 31148
31448
31548
31148
31448
31548
31148
31448
31548
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/04/1990  
D5567 31149 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 19/07/1968  
D5568 31150 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 11/09/1965  
D5569 31151
31436
31151
31436
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/03/1984  
D5570 31152 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 26/06/1965  
D5571 31153
31432
31153
31432
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 23/12/1983  
D5572 31154 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1968  
D5573 31155 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 20/06/1968  
D5574 31156 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/11/1965  
D5575 31157
31424
31524
31157
31424
31524
31157
31424
31524
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/05/1990  
D5576 31158 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/11/1965  
D5577 31159 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/1968  
D5578 31160 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 18/06/1968  
D5579 31161
31400
31161
31400
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/05/1988  
D5580 31162 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/12/1967  
D5581 31163 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1966  
D5582 31164 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1968  
D5583 31165 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/10/1968  
D5584 31166 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1966  
D5585 31167 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/09/1967  
D5586 31168 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/09/1967  
D5587 31169
31457
31169
31457
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 22/11/1984  
D5588 31170 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 18/11/1967  
D5589 31401
31401
31401
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1974  
D5590 31171 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1966  
D5591 31172
31420
31172
31420
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1974  
D5592 31402
31402
31402
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1974  
D5593 31173 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/11/1966  
D5594 31174 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 11/09/1965  
D5595 31175 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1966  
D5596 31403
31403
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1974  
D5597 31176 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 29/12/1967  
D5598 31177
31443
31177
31443
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 21/05/1984  
D5599 31178 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 18/07/1968  
D5600 31179
31435
31179
31435
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 21/02/1984  
D5601 31180 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/1965  
D5602 31181 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1966  
D5603 31182
31437
31537
31437
31182
31437
31537
31437
31182
31437
31537
31437
31182
31437
31537
31437
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/02/2001  
D5604 31183 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1966  
D5605 31404
31404
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1974  
D5606 31405
31405
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/1972  
D5607 31184 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1967  
D5608 31185 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1966  
D5609 31186
31601
31186
31601
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 23/03/1999  
D5610 31187 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/11/1966  
D5611 31188 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1966  
D5612 31189 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1967  
D5613 31190 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1966  
D5614 31191
31602
31191
31602
31191
31602
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 16/06/1999  
D5615 31192 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1968  
D5616 31406
31406
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1974  
D5617 31193
31426
31526
31426
31193
31426
31526
31426
31193
31426
31526
31426
31193
31426
31526
31426
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/02/2001  
D5618 31194
31427
31194
31427
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 24/10/1983  
D5619 31195 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/1968  
D5620 31196 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/1965  
D5621 31197
31423
31197
31423
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1975  
D5622 31198 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1966  
D5623 31199 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 24/11/1967  
D5624 31200 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1967  
D5625 31201 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1966  
D5626 31202 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1966  
D5627 31203 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/1966  
D5628 31204
31440
31204
31440
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 18/04/1984  
D5629 31205 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 09/07/1968  
D5630 31206 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1966  
D5631 31207 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5632 31208 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/1965  
D5633 31209 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 11/12/1965  
D5634 31210 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/05/1968  
D5635 31211
31428
31211
31428
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 29/10/1983  
D5636 31212 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 18/11/1967  
D5637 31213
31465
31565
31465
31213
31465
31565
31465
31213
31465
31565
31465
31213
31465
31565
31465
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/02/1993  
D5638 31214 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/1966  
D5639 31215 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1968  
D5640 31407
31507
31407
31507
31407
31507
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/04/1990  
D5641 31216
31467
31216
31467
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 17/03/1985  
D5642 31217 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/11/1965  
D5643 31218 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/1966  
D5644 31219 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/03/1966  
D5645 31220
31441
31541
31220
31441
31541
31220
31441
31541
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/04/1990  
D5646 31408
31408
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1974  
D5647 31221 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1967  
D5648 31222 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/1967  
D5649 31223 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5650 31224 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 11/12/1965  
D5651 31225 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/11/1965  
D5652 31226 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 26/03/1968  
D5653 31227 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1966  
D5654 31228
31454
31554
31454
31228
31454
31554
31454
31228
31454
31554
31454
31228
31454
31554
31454
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/02/2002  
D5655 31229 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/10/1968  
D5656 31409
31409
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1974  
D5657 31230 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 15/11/1968  
D5658 31231 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 15/12/1967  
D5659 31232 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 09/1968  
D5660 31233 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1967  
D5661 31234 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 20/12/1968  
D5662 31235 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/11/1966  
D5663 31236
31433
31533
31433
31236
31433
31533
31433
31236
31433
31533
31433
31236
31433
31533
31433
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/02/2002  
D5664 31237 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5665 31238 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/1966  
D5666 31239
31439
31239
31439
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/04/1984  
D5667 31240 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5668 31241 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/1967  
D5669 31410
31410
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1974  
D5670 31242 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 09/1968  
D5671 31243 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 21/12/1967  
D5672 31244 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1968  
D5673 31245 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5674 31246
31455
31555
31455
31246
31455
31555
31455
31246
31455
31555
31455
31246
31455
31555
31455
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/12/1992  
D5675 31247 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/1965  
D5676 31248 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/1966  
D5677 31249 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1964  
D5678 31250 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1966  
D5679 31251
31442
31251
31442
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/05/1984  
D5680 31252 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/1965  
D5681 31253
31431
31531
31253
31431
31531
31253
31431
31531
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 11/10/1990  
D5682 31254 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 21/09/1968  
D5683 31255 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/03/1966  
D5684 31256
31459
31256
31459
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 14/12/1984  
D5685 31257 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/1966  
D5686 31258
31434
31258
31434
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/02/1984  
D5687 31259 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/1965  
D5688 31260 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1966  
D5689 31261 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1966  
D5690 31262 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1967  
D5691 31411
31511
31411
31511
31411
31511
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/05/1990  
D5692 31412
31512
31412
31512
31412
31512
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/10/1990  
D5693 31263 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1967  
D5694 31264 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 12/1966  
D5695 31265
31430
31530
31265
31430
31530
31265
31430
31530
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 31/12/1989  
D5696 31266
31460
31266
31460
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 21/12/1984  
D5697 31267
31419
31519
31267
31419
31519
31267
31419
31519
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/04/1990  
D5698 31268 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1967  
D5699 31269
31429
31269
31429
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 16/11/1983  
D5800 31270 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/1966  
D5801 31271 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1967  
D5802 31272 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5803 31273 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/08/1967  
D5804 31274
31425
31274
31425
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/09/1983  
D5805 31275 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 24/09/1966  
D5806 31276 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1967  
D5807 31277
31469
31569
31277
31469
31569
31277
31469
31569
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 09/10/1990  
D5808 31278 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1967  
D5809 31279
31452
31552
31452
31279
31452
31552
31452
31279
31452
31552
31452
31279
31452
31552
31452
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 27/08/1998  
D5810 31280 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1967  
D5811 31281 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1967  
D5812 31413
31413
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1974  
D5813 31282 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/11/1966  
D5814 31414
31514
31414
31514
31414
31514
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 15/10/1990  
D5815 31283 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5816 31284 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1967  
D5817 31285 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/1967  
D5818 31286 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/1967  
D5819 31287 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1967  
D5820 31288 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1967  
D5821 31289 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 16/08/1967  
D5822 31290 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1967  
D5823 31291
31456
31556
31456
31556
31291
31456
31556
31456
31556
31291
31456
31556
31456
31556
31291
31456
31556
31456
31556
31291
31456
31556
31456
31556
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 18/03/1994  
D5824 31415
31415
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1974  
D5825 31292 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5826 31293 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/09/1967  
D5827 31294 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/1967  
D5828 31295
31447
31547
31295
31447
31547
31295
31447
31547
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 31/12/1989  
D5829 31296 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1967  
D5830 31297
31463
31563
31297
31463
31563
31297
31463
31563
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 09/10/1990  
D5831 31298 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1967  
D5832 31299 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 16/11/1967  
D5833 31300
31445
31545
31300
31445
31545
31300
31445
31545
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/06/1990  
D5834 31301 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1966  
D5835 31302 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1968  
D5836 31303
31458
31558
31458
31303
31458
31558
31458
31303
31458
31558
31458
31303
31458
31558
31458
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/02/2001  
D5837 31304 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1967  
D5838 31305 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 16/12/1967  
D5839 31306 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1968  
D5840 31307
31449
31549
31449
31307
31449
31549
31449
31307
31449
31549
31449
31307
31449
31549
31449
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 05/02/2001  
D5841 31308 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1965  
D5842 31416
31516
31416
31516
31416
31516
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/11/1990  
D5843 31309 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 06/1967  
D5844 31310
31422
31522
31310
31422
31522
31310
31422
31522
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/04/1990  
D5845 31311 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 08/1965  
D5846 31312 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/11/1965  
D5847 31313 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/11/1967  
D5848 31314 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1965  
D5849 31315
31462
31315
31462
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/02/1985  
D5850 31316
31446
31546
31316
31446
31546
31316
31446
31546
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/04/1990  
D5851 31317 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 21/09/1968  
D5852 31318
31451
31551
31318
31451
31551
31318
31451
31551
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 30/05/1990  
D5853 31319 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 01/1968  
D5854 31320 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 10/1967  
D5855 31321
31468
31568
31468
31321
31468
31568
31468
31321
31468
31568
31468
31321
31468
31568
31468
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 16/04/1993  
D5856 31417
31417
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 02/1974  
D5857 31322 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 07/09/1967  
D5858 31323 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 18/11/1967  
D5859 31324 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 13/11/1965  
D5860 31325
31464
31325
31464
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 17/02/1985  
D5861 31326
31970
Rebuilt from 30 to 31 04/1965  
D5862 31327 Rebuilt from 30 to 31 03/1966