31 A1A-A1A
Old Number | Company | Old Num Type | New Number | Company | Subtype | New Num Type | Date | Notes | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D5518 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31101 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1973 | |
D5842 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31416 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 09/1973 | |
D5861 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31326 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 10/10/1973 | |
D5843 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31309 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 18/10/1973 | |
D5852 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31318 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 19/10/1973 | |
D5632 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31208 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 26/10/1973 | |
D5557 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31139 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 29/10/1973 | |
D5858 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31323 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 02/11/1973 | |
D5623 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31199 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 08/11/1973 | |
D5522 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31418 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 12/11/1973 | |
D5588 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31170 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 17/11/1973 | |
D5803 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31273 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 17/11/1973 | |
D5823 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31291 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 24/11/1973 | |
D5580 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31162 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 27/11/1973 | |
D5828 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31295 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 06/12/1973 | |
D5658 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31231 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 07/12/1973 | |
D5841 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31308 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 12/12/1973 | |
D5570 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31152 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 15/12/1973 | |
D5833 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31300 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 18/12/1973 | |
D5541 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31123 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D5575 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31157 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D5646 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31408 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D5696 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31266 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 12/01/1974 | |
D5671 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31243 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | on | 18/01/1974 | |
D5500 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31018 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | w/e | 26/01/1974 | |
D5549 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31131 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 26/01/1974 | |
D5639 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31215 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 26/01/1974 | |
D5645 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31220 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 26/01/1974 | |
D5670 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31242 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 26/01/1974 | |
D5681 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31253 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 26/01/1974 | |
D5821 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31289 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 26/01/1974 | |
D5854 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31320 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 26/01/1974 | |
D5502 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31002 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5504 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31004 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5505 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31005 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5507 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31007 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5513 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31013 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5514 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31014 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5520 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31102 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5856 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31417 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5523 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31105 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5524 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31106 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5525 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31107 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5526 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31108 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5527 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31109 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5528 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31110 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5531 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31113 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5532 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31114 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5536 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31118 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5537 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31119 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5538 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31120 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5539 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31121 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5540 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31122 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5542 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31124 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5545 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31127 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5546 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31128 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5547 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31129 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5551 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31133 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5553 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31135 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5555 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31137 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5559 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31141 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5562 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31144 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5565 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31147 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5566 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31148 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5567 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31149 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5568 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31150 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5571 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31153 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5572 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31154 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5573 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31155 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5574 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31156 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5576 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31158 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5578 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31160 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5579 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31161 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5581 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31163 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5582 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31164 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5584 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31166 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5586 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31168 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5587 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31169 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5814 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31414 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5593 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31173 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5692 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31412 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5598 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31177 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5599 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31178 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5600 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31179 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5603 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31182 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5691 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31411 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5669 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31410 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5607 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31184 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5656 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31409 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5620 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31196 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5626 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31202 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5629 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31205 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5631 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31207 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5635 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31211 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5636 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31212 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5640 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31407 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5642 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31217 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5616 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31406 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5647 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31221 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5648 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31222 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5651 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31225 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5653 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31227 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5659 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31232 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5664 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31237 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5665 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31238 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5667 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31240 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5673 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31245 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5674 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31246 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5675 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31247 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5677 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31249 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5678 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31250 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5682 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31254 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5684 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31256 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5686 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31258 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5687 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31259 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5688 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31260 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5690 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31262 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5592 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31402 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5693 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31263 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5589 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31401 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5699 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31269 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5800 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31270 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5801 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31271 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5808 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31278 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5809 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31279 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5810 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31280 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5811 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31281 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5813 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31282 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5815 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31283 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5816 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31284 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5819 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31287 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5820 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31288 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5822 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31290 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5827 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31294 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5829 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31296 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5831 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31298 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5832 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31299 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5838 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31305 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5839 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31306 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5840 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31307 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5844 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31310 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5846 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31312 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5849 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31315 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5855 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31321 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D5501 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31001 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5508 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31008 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5556 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31138 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5569 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31151 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5577 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31159 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5604 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31183 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5643 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31218 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5672 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31244 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5676 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31248 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5679 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31251 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5680 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31252 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5698 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31268 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5807 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31277 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5835 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31302 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5847 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31313 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5857 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31322 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5862 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31327 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | w/e | 02/02/1974 | |
D5503 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31003 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5509 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31009 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5515 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31015 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5519 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31019 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5521 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31103 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5529 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31111 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5533 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31115 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5534 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31116 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5535 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31117 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5543 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31125 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5544 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31126 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5550 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31132 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5552 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31134 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5558 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31140 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5560 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31142 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5561 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31143 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5563 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31145 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5564 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31146 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5824 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31415 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5583 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31165 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5585 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31167 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5591 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31172 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5812 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31413 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5597 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31176 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5602 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31181 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5608 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31185 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5609 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31186 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5610 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31187 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5611 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31188 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5612 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31189 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5613 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31190 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5614 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31191 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5615 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31192 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5618 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31194 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5619 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31195 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5621 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31197 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5622 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31198 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5624 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31200 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5625 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31201 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5628 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31204 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5630 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31206 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5633 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31209 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5634 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31210 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5637 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31213 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5638 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31214 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5641 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31216 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5644 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31219 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5649 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31223 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5650 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31224 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5652 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31226 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5654 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31228 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5606 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31405 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5657 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31230 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5660 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31233 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5661 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31234 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5662 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31235 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5663 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31236 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5666 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31239 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5668 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31241 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5605 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31404 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5685 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31257 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5689 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31261 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5596 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31403 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5694 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31264 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5804 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31274 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5805 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31275 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5806 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31276 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5817 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31285 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5825 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31292 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5836 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31303 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5845 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31311 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5850 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31316 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5851 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31317 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5853 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31319 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5859 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31324 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5860 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31325 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 03/1974 | |
D5506 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31006 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5510 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31010 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5511 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31011 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5512 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31012 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5517 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31017 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5590 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31171 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5595 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31175 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5601 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31180 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5627 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31203 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5683 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31255 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5695 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31265 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5802 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31272 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5826 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31293 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5697 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31419 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D5516 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31016 | BR | 31/0 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5530 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31112 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5548 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31130 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5554 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31136 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5594 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31174 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5655 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31229 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5818 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31286 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5830 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31297 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5834 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31301 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5837 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31304 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5848 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31314 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 05/1974 | |
D5617 | BR | Pre TOPS | 31193 | BR | 31/1 | TOPS | m/e | 06/1974 | |
31172 | BR | TOPS | 31420 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 10/1974 | |
31140 | BR | TOPS | 31421 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 11/1974 | |
31310 | BR | TOPS | 31422 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 12/1974 | |
31197 | BR | TOPS | 31423 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1975 | |
31157 | BR | TOPS | 31424 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1975 | |
31014 | BR | TOPS | ADB968015 | BR | Dept | Departmental | 07/1977 | ||
31013 | BR | TOPS | ADB968013 | BR | Dept | Departmental | 05/03/1979 | ||
31002 | BR | TOPS | ADB968014 | BR | Dept | Departmental | 05/01/1980 | ||
31008 | BR | TOPS | ADB968016 | BR | Dept | Departmental | 05/10/1980 | ||
31274 | BR | TOPS | 31425 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 30/09/1983 | |
31193 | BR | TOPS | 31426 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 07/10/1983 | |
31194 | BR | TOPS | 31427 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 24/10/1983 | |
31211 | BR | TOPS | 31428 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 29/10/1983 | |
31269 | BR | TOPS | 31429 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 16/11/1983 | |
31265 | BR | TOPS | 31430 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 24/11/1983 | |
31253 | BR | TOPS | 31431 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 29/11/1983 | |
31153 | BR | TOPS | 31432 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 23/12/1983 | |
31236 | BR | TOPS | 31433 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 03/02/1984 | |
31258 | BR | TOPS | 31434 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 10/02/1984 | |
31179 | BR | TOPS | 31435 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 21/02/1984 | |
31151 | BR | TOPS | 31436 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 05/03/1984 | |
31182 | BR | TOPS | 31437 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 16/03/1984 | |
31139 | BR | TOPS | 31438 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 23/03/1984 | |
31239 | BR | TOPS | 31439 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 06/04/1984 | |
31204 | BR | TOPS | 31440 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 18/04/1984 | |
31220 | BR | TOPS | 31441 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 02/05/1984 | |
31251 | BR | TOPS | 31442 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 10/05/1984 | |
31177 | BR | TOPS | 31443 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 21/05/1984 | |
31137 | BR | TOPS | 31444 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 29/05/1984 | |
31300 | BR | TOPS | 31445 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 13/06/1984 | |
31316 | BR | TOPS | 31446 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 29/06/1984 | |
31295 | BR | TOPS | 31447 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 30/07/1984 | |
31148 | BR | TOPS | 31448 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 22/08/1984 | |
31307 | BR | TOPS | 31449 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 30/08/1984 | |
31133 | BR | TOPS | 31450 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 14/09/1984 | |
31318 | BR | TOPS | 31451 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 26/09/1984 | |
31279 | BR | TOPS | 31452 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 10/10/1984 | |
31114 | BR | TOPS | 31453 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 18/10/1984 | |
31228 | BR | TOPS | 31454 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 29/10/1984 | |
31246 | BR | TOPS | 31455 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 03/11/1984 | |
31291 | BR | TOPS | 31456 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 15/11/1984 | |
31169 | BR | TOPS | 31457 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 22/11/1984 | |
31303 | BR | TOPS | 31458 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 04/12/1984 | |
31256 | BR | TOPS | 31459 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 14/12/1984 | |
31266 | BR | TOPS | 31460 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 21/12/1984 | |
31129 | BR | TOPS | 31461 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 20/01/1985 | |
31315 | BR | TOPS | 31462 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 03/02/1985 | |
31297 | BR | TOPS | 31463 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 11/02/1985 | |
31325 | BR | TOPS | 31464 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 17/02/1985 | |
31213 | BR | TOPS | 31465 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 25/02/1985 | |
31115 | BR | TOPS | 31466 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 10/03/1985 | |
31216 | BR | TOPS | 31467 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 17/03/1985 | |
31321 | BR | TOPS | 31468 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 31/03/1985 | |
31298 | BR | TOPS | 97203 | BR | 97/2 | Departmental | m/e | 07/1986 | |
31277 | BR | TOPS | 31469 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 20/01/1987 | |
31326 | BR | TOPS | 97204 | BR | 97/2 | Departmental | on | 04/09/1987 | |
31326 | BR | TOPS | 31970 | BR | 31/9 | TOPS | on | 04/09/1987 | |
31161 | BR | TOPS | 31400 | BR | 31/4 | TOPS | on | 13/05/1988 | |
31447 | BR | TOPS | 31547 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 31/12/1989 | |
31437 | BR | TOPS | 31537 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 31/12/1989 | |
31433 | BR | TOPS | 31533 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 31/12/1989 | |
31430 | BR | TOPS | 31530 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 31/12/1989 | |
31458 | BR | TOPS | 31558 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31456 | BR | TOPS | 31556 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31454 | BR | TOPS | 31554 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31453 | BR | TOPS | 31553 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31452 | BR | TOPS | 31552 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31448 | BR | TOPS | 31548 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31446 | BR | TOPS | 31546 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31444 | BR | TOPS | 31544 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31441 | BR | TOPS | 31541 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31422 | BR | TOPS | 31522 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31419 | BR | TOPS | 31519 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31407 | BR | TOPS | 31507 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/04/1990 | |
31451 | BR | TOPS | 31551 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/05/1990 | |
31424 | BR | TOPS | 31524 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/05/1990 | |
31411 | BR | TOPS | 31511 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/05/1990 | |
31468 | BR | TOPS | 31568 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 31/05/1990 | |
31455 | BR | TOPS | 31555 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 01/06/1990 | |
31445 | BR | TOPS | 31545 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 07/06/1990 | |
31465 | BR | TOPS | 31565 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 09/08/1990 | |
31449 | BR | TOPS | 31549 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 04/10/1990 | |
31426 | BR | TOPS | 31526 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 05/10/1990 | |
31469 | BR | TOPS | 31569 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 09/10/1990 | |
31463 | BR | TOPS | 31563 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 09/10/1990 | |
31431 | BR | TOPS | 31531 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 11/10/1990 | |
31414 | BR | TOPS | 31514 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 15/10/1990 | |
31412 | BR | TOPS | 31512 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 30/10/1990 | |
31416 | BR | TOPS | 31516 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 08/11/1990 | |
31555 | BR | TOPS | 31455 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 13/12/1992 | |
31565 | BR | TOPS | 31465 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 07/02/1993 | |
31568 | BR | TOPS | 31468 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 16/04/1993 | |
31556 | BR | TOPS | 31456 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 12/12/1993 | |
31544 | BR | TOPS | 31444 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 12/12/1993 | |
31438 | BR | TOPS | 31538 | BR | 31/5 | TOPS | on | 14/12/1993 | |
31456 | BR | TOPS | 31556 | BR | 31/5 (2) | TOPS | on | 18/03/1994 | |
31552 | BR | TOPS | 31452 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 27/08/1998 | |
31186 | BR | TOPS | 31601 | BR | 31/6 | TOPS | on | 23/03/1999 | |
31191 | BR | TOPS | 31602 | BR | 31/6 | TOPS | on | 16/06/1999 | |
31558 | BR | TOPS | 31458 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 05/02/2001 | |
31549 | BR | TOPS | 31449 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 05/02/2001 | |
31537 | BR | TOPS | 31437 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 05/02/2001 | |
31526 | BR | TOPS | 31426 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 05/02/2001 | |
31554 | BR | TOPS | 31454 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 01/02/2002 | |
31533 | BR | TOPS | 31433 | BR | 31/4 (2) | TOPS | on | 01/02/2002 |