Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 95 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5570 Week
» 5570 Month
» 72432 Year
» 1737808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

128


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
55987 09/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 09/01/1960
55988 09/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 09/01/1960
55989 23/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 23/01/1960
55990 30/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 30/01/1960
55991 02/01/1960 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 02/01/1960
55992 06/02/1960 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 06/02/1960
55993 27/02/1960 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 27/02/1960
55994 05/03/1960 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 05/03/1960
55995 26/03/1960 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 26/03/1960
55996 02/04/1960 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 02/04/1960