Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 84 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5559 Week
» 5559 Month
» 72421 Year
» 1737797 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

128


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
55987 09/01/1960 Cricklewood East 61.20
55988 09/01/1960 Cricklewood East 61.20
55989 23/01/1960 Cricklewood East 61.16
55990 30/01/1960 Cricklewood East 61.14
55991 02/01/1960 To Western Region / GWR 61.22
55992 06/02/1960 To Western Region / GWR 61.12
55993 27/02/1960 To Western Region / GWR 61.06
55994 05/03/1960 To Western Region / GWR 61.04
55995 26/03/1960 To Western Region / GWR 60.99
55996 02/04/1960 To Western Region / GWR 60.97