Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 792 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 7418 Week
» 32252 Month
» 66584 Year
» 1731960 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

102


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
51425 13/02/1959 51A Darlington (New) 13/02/1959
51426 20/02/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 20/02/1959
51427 26/02/1959 51A Darlington (New) 26/02/1959
51428 05/03/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 05/03/1959
51429 12/03/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 12/03/1959
51430 19/03/1959 51A Darlington (New) 19/03/1959
51431 02/04/1959 51A
NL
Darlington (New)
Neville Hill
02/04/1959
04/10/1987
51432 10/04/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 10/04/1959
51433 23/04/1959 51A Darlington (New) 23/04/1959
51434 01/05/1959 51A
NL
Darlington (New)
Neville Hill
01/05/1959
04/10/1987
51435 13/02/1959 53B
TS
Hull Botanic Gardens (New)
Tyseley
13/02/1959
14/05/1988
51436 20/02/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 20/02/1959
51437 05/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 05/03/1959
51438 10/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 10/03/1959
51439 16/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 16/03/1959
51440 24/03/1959 56G
W
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Withdrawn
24/03/1959
16/11/1987
16/11/1987
51441 07/04/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 07/04/1959
51442
51443 23/04/1959 51A Darlington (New) 23/04/1959
51444 01/05/1959 51A Darlington (New) 01/05/1959
51445     23/09/1987
51446
51447 11/09/1977
51448
51449     04/10/1987
51450     04/10/1987
51451
51452
51453
51454
51455
51456 TS Tyseley 20/04/1988
51457 TS Tyseley 08/05/1988 19/06/1988
51458
51459
51460
51461
51462 CF Cardiff Canton 20/09/1987
51463
51464
51465
51466
51467
51468
51469
51470
51495 13/02/1959 51A Darlington (New) 13/02/1959
51496 20/02/1959 56G
CF
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Cardiff Canton
20/02/1959
04/10/1987
51497 26/02/1959 51A
W
Darlington (New)
Withdrawn
26/02/1959
02/11/1987
02/11/1987
51498 05/03/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 05/03/1959
51499 12/03/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 12/03/1959
51500 19/03/1959 51A Darlington (New) 19/03/1959
51501 02/04/1959 51A
NL
Darlington (New)
Neville Hill
02/04/1959
04/10/1987
51502 10/04/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 10/04/1959
51503 23/04/1959 51A
NL
Darlington (New)
Neville Hill
23/04/1959
04/10/1987
51504 01/05/1959 51A Darlington (New) 01/05/1959
51505 13/02/1959 53B
BR
Hull Botanic Gardens (New)
Bristol Bath Road
13/02/1959
20/09/1987
51506 20/02/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 20/02/1959
51507 05/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 05/03/1959
51508 10/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 10/03/1959
51509 16/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 16/03/1959
51510 24/03/1959 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 24/03/1959
51511 15/04/1959 BR (New)
Bristol Bath Road
15/04/1959
20/09/1987
51512 07/04/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 07/04/1959
51513 23/04/1959 51A Darlington (New) 23/04/1959
51514 01/05/1959 51A
W
Darlington (New)
Withdrawn
01/05/1959
28/09/1986
28/09/1986
51515     23/09/1987
51516
51517
51518
51519
51520 TS Tyseley 20/04/1988
51521     04/10/1987
51522     04/10/1987
51523 CH Chester West 23/09/1987
51524
51525
51526
51527
51528
51529
51530 CF Cardiff Canton 20/09/1987
51531
51532
51533
51534
51535
51536
51537 09/09/1988
51538
51539
51540
51795 27/10/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 27/10/1959
51796 27/10/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 27/10/1959
51797 14/11/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 14/11/1959
51798 21/11/1959 64H
TS
Leith Central (New)
Tyseley
21/11/1959
08/05/1988
51799 30/11/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 30/11/1959
51800 11/12/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 11/12/1959
51801 11/12/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 11/12/1959
51802 27/10/1959 64H
TS
Leith Central (New)
Tyseley
27/10/1959
08/05/1988
19/06/1988
51803 27/10/1959 64H
DE
Leith Central (New)
Dundee West
27/10/1959
21/05/1981
51804 14/11/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 14/11/1959
51805 21/11/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 21/11/1959
51806 30/11/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 30/11/1959
51807 11/12/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 11/12/1959
51808 11/12/1959 64H Leith Central (New) 11/12/1959