Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 110 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4602 Week
» 29436 Month
» 63768 Year
» 1729144 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

102


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
13/02/1959 To Service 51425   NEW 51A Darlington
13/02/1959 To Service 51435   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
13/02/1959 To Service 51495   NEW 51A Darlington
13/02/1959 To Service 51505   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
20/02/1959 To Service 51426   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
20/02/1959 To Service 51436   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
20/02/1959 To Service 51496   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
20/02/1959 To Service 51506   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
26/02/1959 To Service 51427   NEW 51A Darlington
26/02/1959 To Service 51497   NEW 51A Darlington
05/03/1959 To Service 51428   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
05/03/1959 To Service 51437   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
05/03/1959 To Service 51498   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
05/03/1959 To Service 51507   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
10/03/1959 To Service 51438   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
10/03/1959 To Service 51508   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
12/03/1959 To Service 51429   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
12/03/1959 To Service 51499   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
16/03/1959 To Service 51439   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
16/03/1959 To Service 51509   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
19/03/1959 To Service 51430   NEW 51A Darlington
19/03/1959 To Service 51500   NEW 51A Darlington
24/03/1959 To Service 51440   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
24/03/1959 To Service 51510   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
02/04/1959 To Service 51431   NEW 51A Darlington
02/04/1959 To Service 51501   NEW 51A Darlington
07/04/1959 To Service 51441   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
07/04/1959 To Service 51512   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
10/04/1959 To Service 51432   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
10/04/1959 To Service 51502   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
23/04/1959 To Service 51433   NEW 51A Darlington
23/04/1959 To Service 51443   NEW 51A Darlington
23/04/1959 To Service 51503   NEW 51A Darlington
23/04/1959 To Service 51513   NEW 51A Darlington
01/05/1959 To Service 51434   NEW 51A Darlington
01/05/1959 To Service 51444   NEW 51A Darlington
01/05/1959 To Service 51504   NEW 51A Darlington
01/05/1959 To Service 51514   NEW 51A Darlington
27/10/1959 To Service 51795   NEW 64H Leith Central
27/10/1959 To Service 51796   NEW 64H Leith Central
27/10/1959 To Service 51802   NEW 64H Leith Central
27/10/1959 To Service 51803   NEW 64H Leith Central
14/11/1959 To Service 51797   NEW 64H Leith Central
14/11/1959 To Service 51804   NEW 64H Leith Central
21/11/1959 To Service 51798   NEW 64H Leith Central
21/11/1959 To Service 51805   NEW 64H Leith Central
30/11/1959 To Service 51799   NEW 64H Leith Central
30/11/1959 To Service 51806   NEW 64H Leith Central
11/12/1959 To Service 51800   NEW 64H Leith Central
11/12/1959 To Service 51801   NEW 64H Leith Central
11/12/1959 To Service 51807   NEW 64H Leith Central
11/12/1959 To Service 51808   NEW 64H Leith Central
11/09/1977 Condemned 51447       COND
21/05/1981 Reallocation 51803 64H Leith Central DE Dundee West
28/09/1986 Condemned 51514 51A Darlington   COND
20/09/1987 Reallocation 51505 53B Hull Botanic Gardens BR Bristol Bath Road
20/09/1987 Reallocation 51511 SGosfo   BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51431 51A Darlington NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51434 51A Darlington NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51496 56G Bradford Hammerton Street CF Cardiff Canton
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51501 51A Darlington NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51503 51A Darlington NL Neville Hill
02/11/1987 Condemned 51497 51A Darlington   COND
16/11/1987 Condemned 51440 56G Bradford Hammerton Street   COND
08/05/1988 Reallocation 51798 64H Leith Central TS Tyseley
08/05/1988 Reallocation 51802 64H Leith Central TS Tyseley
14/05/1988 Reallocation 51435 53B Hull Botanic Gardens TS Tyseley
19/06/1988 Condemned 51457 TS Tyseley   COND
19/06/1988 Condemned 51802 TS Tyseley   COND
09/09/1988 Condemned 51537       COND