Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 453 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4945 Week
» 29779 Month
» 64111 Year
» 1729487 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

102


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
51495 13/02/1959 Darlington 62.08
51496 20/02/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.06
51497 26/02/1959 Darlington 02/11/1987 Neville Hill 28.75 62.04
51498 05/03/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.02
51499 12/03/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.01
51500 19/03/1959 Darlington 61.99
51501 02/04/1959 Darlington 61.95
51502 10/04/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.93
51503 23/04/1959 Darlington 61.89
51504 01/05/1959 Darlington 61.87
51505 13/02/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.08
51506 20/02/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.06
51507 05/03/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.02
51508 10/03/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.01
51509 16/03/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 61.99
51510 24/03/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.97
51511 15/04/1959 61.91
51512 07/04/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 61.93
51513 23/04/1959 Darlington 61.89
51514 01/05/1959 Darlington 28/09/1986 Hull Botanic Gardens 27.33 61.87
51515
51516
51517
51518
51519
51520
51521
51522
51523
51524
51525
51526
51527
51528
51529
51530
51531
51532
51533
51534
51535
51536
51537 09/09/1988 Eastfield
51538
51539
51540
51802 27/10/1959 Leith Central 19/06/1988 Tyseley 28.67 61.38
51803 27/10/1959 Leith Central 61.38
51804 14/11/1959 Leith Central 61.33
51805 21/11/1959 Leith Central 61.31
51806 30/11/1959 Leith Central 61.28
51807 11/12/1959 Leith Central 61.25
51808 11/12/1959 Leith Central 61.25