Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3518 Week
» 28352 Month
» 62684 Year
» 1728060 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

102


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
51425 13/02/1959 Darlington 62.08
51426 20/02/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.06
51427 26/02/1959 Darlington 62.04
51428 05/03/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.02
51429 12/03/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.00
51430 19/03/1959 Darlington 61.98
51431 02/04/1959 Darlington 61.95
51432 10/04/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 61.92
51433 23/04/1959 Darlington 61.89
51434 01/05/1959 Darlington 61.87
51435 13/02/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.08
51436 20/02/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.06
51437 05/03/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.02
51438 10/03/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.01
51439 16/03/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 61.99
51440 24/03/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 16/11/1987 28.67 61.97
51441 07/04/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 61.93
51442
51443 23/04/1959 Darlington 61.89
51444 01/05/1959 Darlington 61.87
51445
51446
51447 11/09/1977
51448
51449
51450
51451
51452
51453
51454
51455
51456
51457 19/06/1988 Tyseley
51458
51459
51460
51461
51462
51463
51464
51465
51466
51467
51468
51469
51470
51795 27/10/1959 Leith Central 61.38
51796 27/10/1959 Leith Central 61.38
51797 14/11/1959 Leith Central 61.33
51798 21/11/1959 Leith Central 61.31
51799 30/11/1959 Leith Central 61.28
51800 11/12/1959 Leith Central 61.25
51801 11/12/1959 Leith Central 61.25