73 Bo-Bo
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
E6007 | 73100 | 13/10/1965 | Prs | Preserved | 58.26 | Brighton Evening Argus | |||||
E6008 | 73102 | 10/1965 | 58.25 | ||||||||
E6009 | 73103 | 10/1965 | 58.25 | ||||||||
E6010 | 73104 | 11/1965 | 58.17 | ||||||||
E6011 | 73105 | 11/1965 | 58.17 | ||||||||
E6012 | 73106 | 12/1965 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/2004 | 38.78 | |||||
E6013 | 73107 | 12/1965 | Prs | Preserved | 58.09 | ||||||
E6014 | 73108 | 01/1966 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/2004 | 38.69 | |||||
E6015 | 73109 | 01/1966 | 58.00 | Battle of Britain - 50th Anniversary | |||||||
E6016 | 73110 | 01/1966 | Prs | Preserved | 58.00 | ||||||
E6017 | 73111 | 02/1966 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Stewarts Lane MPD) | 01/1997 | 30.94 | |||||
E6018 | 73112 | 02/1966 | 57.92 | ||||||||
E6019 | 73211 | 02/1966 | 57.92 | ||||||||
E6020 | 73114 | 02/1966 | 57.92 | ||||||||
E6021 | 73115 | 02/1966 | Cut | British Rail (at Slade Green MPD) | 04/1982 | 16.17 | |||||
E6022 | 73210 | 03/1966 | Prs | Preserved | 57.84 | Selhurst | |||||
E6023 | 73117 | 03/1966 | 57.84 | ||||||||
E6024 | 73118 | 03/1966 | 57.84 | The Romney Hythe and Dymchurch Railway | |||||||
E6025 | 73119 | 03/1966 | 57.84 | ||||||||
E6026 | 73209 | 04/1966 | 57.76 | ||||||||
E6027 | 10/04/1966 | 16/07/1972 | 6.25 | Cut | British Rail (at Selhurst MPD) | 02/1973 | 6.86 | ||||
E6028 | 73208 | 04/1966 | 57.76 | ||||||||
E6029 | 73122 | 05/1966 | 57.67 | ||||||||
E6030 | 73206 | 05/1966 | 57.67 | ||||||||
E6031 | 73205 | 05/1966 | 57.67 | ||||||||
E6032 | 73204 | 05/1966 | 57.67 | Stewarts Lane 1860-1985 | |||||||
E6033 | 73126 | 06/1966 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/2009 | 43.20 | Kent & East Sussex Light Railway | ||||
E6034 | 73203 | 06/1966 | Cut | Sims Metals (Halesowen) | 57.59 | ||||||
E6035 | 73128 | 06/1966 | Prs | Preserved | 57.59 | ||||||
E6036 | 73129 | 07/1966 | Prs | Preserved | 57.51 | ||||||
E6037 | 73130 | 07/1966 | 57.51 | ||||||||
E6038 | 73131 | 08/1966 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/2004 | 38.03 | |||||
E6039 | 73132 | 08/1966 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 57.42 | ||||||
E6040 | 73133 | 08/1966 | Prs | Preserved | 57.42 | The Bluebell Railway | |||||
E6041 | 73134 | 19/09/1966 | 57.33 | Woking Homes 1885-1985 | |||||||
E6042 | 73235 | 19/09/1966 | 57.33 | ||||||||
E6043 | 73136 | 09/1966 | Prs | Preserved | 57.34 | ||||||
E6044 | 73137 | 09/1966 | 57.34 | ||||||||
E6045 | 73138 | 11/1966 | Prs | Preserved | 57.17 | Post Haste - 150 Years of Travelling Post Offices | |||||
E6046 | 73139 | 11/1966 | 57.17 | ||||||||
E6047 | 73140 | 11/1966 | Prs | Preserved | 57.17 | ||||||
E6048 | 73141 | 01/01/1967 | 57.04 | ||||||||
E6049 | 73201 | 01/01/1967 | 57.04 | Broadlands |