LSWR/SR Adams "B4" Class 0-4-0T
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
B4 | 81 | 30081 | 11/1893 | SOT ELH W |
Southampton Docks Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
B4 | 82 | 30082 | 06/1908 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/07/1957 |
20/07/1957 |
B4 | 83 | 30083 | 06/1908 | DOV DOV 74A 74A 72D 72D 71A W |
Dover Marine Dover Marine Ashford Ashford Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 07/10/1950 31/10/1950 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 29/10/1953 10/1959 |
10/1959 |
B4 | 84 | 30084 | 06/1908 | PLY 74C W |
Plymouth Friary Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/12/1951 29/08/1959 |
29/08/1959 |
B4 | 85 | 30085 | 10/1891 | SOT ELH W |
Southampton Docks Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
B4 | 86 | 30086 | 12/1891 | BAT BAT BM 74C 70C W |
Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Bournemouth Dover Marine Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 12/03/1949 13/05/1954 12/08/1955 02/1959 |
02/1959 |
B4 | 87 | 30087 | 12/1891 | ELH BM W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/07/1949 20/12/1958 |
20/12/1958 |
B4 | 88 | 30088 | 10/1892 | ELH BAT PLY 71A 72D 71A W |
Eastleigh Stewarts Lane Plymouth Friary Eastleigh Plymouth Friary Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 28/05/1949 30/06/1952 01/10/1953 13/10/1958 11/07/1959 |
11/07/1959 |
B4 | 89 | 30089 | 11/1892 | SOT BAT ELH 72D 71A 70C W |
Southampton Docks Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Plymouth Friary Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 26/09/1949 19/03/1952 13/10/1958 11/03/1959 10/03/1963 |
10/03/1963 |
B4 | 90 | 30090 | 11/1892 | BAT BAT W |
Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 05/1948 |
05/1948 |
B4 | 91 | 30091 | 11/1892 | PLY W |
Plymouth Friary Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1948 |
08/1948 |
B4 | 92 | 30092 | 12/1892 | BM W |
Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
B4 | 93 | 30093 | 12/1892 | BM BM W |
Bournemouth Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 23/04/1960 |
23/04/1960 |
B4 | 94 | 30094 | 12/1892 | PLY W |
Plymouth Friary Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/03/1957 |
09/03/1957 |
B4 | 95 | 30095 | 11/1893 | PLY PLY W |
Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
B4 | 96 | 30096 | 11/1893 | ELH ELH AFD 71A W |
Eastleigh Eastleigh Ashford Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 26/09/1949 07/10/1950 06/10/1963 |
06/10/1963 |
B4 | 97 | 30097 | 11/1893 | SOT ELH W |
Southampton Docks Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
B4 | 98 | 30098 | 11/1893 | SOT ELH 9E W |
Southampton Docks Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 01/08/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
B4 | 99 | 30099 | 12/1893 | BM W |
Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
B4 | 100 | 30100 | 12/1893 | BM W |
Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
B4 | 101 | 30101 | 04/1908 | SOT 9E ELH W |
Southampton Docks Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 01/08/1948 11/1948 |
11/1948 |
B4 | 102 | 30102 | 12/1893 | ELH ELH YEO PLY 71A 71B 71A W |
Eastleigh Eastleigh Yeovil Town Plymouth Friary Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 03/05/1949 28/05/1949 13/10/1958 11/03/1959 09/11/1961 15/09/1963 |
15/09/1963 |
B4 | 103 | 30103 | 12/1893 | GFD PLY W |
Guildford Plymouth Friary Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
B4 | 147 | 30147 | 04/1908 | SOT ELH W |
Southampton Docks Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
B4 | 176 | 30176 | 10/1893 | SOT 9E W |
Southampton Docks Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 06/1948 |
06/1948 |