Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 73 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4988 Week
» 16225 Month
» 249145 Year
» 1914521 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Stirling "O1" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
12/1912 Condemned 282       COND  
03/1925 Condemned 119       COND  
06/1926 Condemned 393       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31369     FAV Faversham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1369     TON Tonbridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31371     EKR East Kent Railway  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31372     EKR East Kent Railway  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31373     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31374     HIT Hither Green  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31377     HIT Hither Green  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1378     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31014     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31041     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31238     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31379     FAV Faversham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31380     TON Tonbridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31381     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1383     EKR East Kent Railway  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31384     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31385     HIT Hither Green  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31386     HIT Hither Green  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31388     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31389     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31390     AFD Ashford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31391     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31395     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31396     TON Tonbridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31397     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31398     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1048     TON Tonbridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31106     FAV Faversham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31316     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31003     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31109     HIT Hither Green  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31123     AFD Ashford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31248     HIT Hither Green  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31046     FAV Faversham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1065     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1064     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1251     HIT Hither Green  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31039     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31066     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31080     RAM Ramsgate  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31108     DOV Dover Marine  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1425     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31426     AFD Ashford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31428     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31429     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1430     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31432     STL St Leonards  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1434     AFD Ashford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31437     TON Tonbridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31438     FAV Faversham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31439     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31093     BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31044     HIT Hither Green  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31051     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 31007     GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
01/04/1948 Reallocation 31041 STL St Leonards AFD Ashford  
01/04/1948 Reallocation 31109 HIT Hither Green TON Tonbridge  
01/04/1948 Reallocation 31432 STL St Leonards TON Tonbridge  
01/04/1948 Reallocation 31044 HIT Hither Green GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
06/1948 Condemned 31014 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
06/1948 Condemned 31397 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
07/1948 Condemned 31388 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
08/1948 Condemned 31396 TON Tonbridge   COND  
08/1948 Condemned 31426 AFD Ashford   COND  
08/1948 Condemned 31051 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
10/1948 Condemned 31386 HIT Hither Green   COND  
10/1948 Condemned 31046 FAV Faversham   COND  
10/1948 Condemned 31437 TON Tonbridge   COND  
11/1948 Condemned 31378 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
11/1948 Condemned 31438 FAV Faversham   COND  
01/1949 Condemned 31371 EKR East Kent Railway   COND  
01/1949 Condemned 31106 FAV Faversham   COND  
01/1949 Condemned 31003 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
01/1949 Condemned 31109 TON Tonbridge   COND  
02/1949 Condemned 31372 EKR East Kent Railway   COND  
02/1949 Condemned 31389 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 31380 TON Tonbridge GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 31248 HIT Hither Green GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 31093 BA Bricklayers Arms DOV Dover Marine  
03/1949 Condemned 31428 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
12/03/1949 Reallocation 31374 HIT Hither Green GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
05/1949 Condemned 31398 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
05/1949 Condemned 31439 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
05/1949 Condemned 31007 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
06/1949 Condemned 31316 RAM Ramsgate   COND  
07/1949 Condemned 31238 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
08/1949 Condemned 31039 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
08/1949 Condemned 31080 RAM Ramsgate   COND  
09/1949 Condemned 31374 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
09/1949 Condemned 31385 HIT Hither Green   COND  
09/1949 Condemned 31429 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
11/1949 Condemned 31380 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
12/1949 Condemned 31384 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
12/12/1949 Reallocation 31425 BA Bricklayers Arms DOV Dover Marine  
01/1950 Condemned 31377 HIT Hither Green   COND  
01/1950 Condemned 31123 AFD Ashford   COND  
04/02/1950 Reallocation 31432 TON Tonbridge GIL Gillingham (Kent)  
22/04/1950 Reallocation 31048 TON Tonbridge 74C Dover Marine  
22/04/1950 Reallocation 31430 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 74C Dover Marine  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 31434 AFD Ashford 74A Ashford  
24/06/1950 Reallocation 31434 74A Ashford 74C Dover Marine  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 31383 EKR East Kent Railway 74C Dover Marine  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 31048 74C Dover Marine 74A Ashford  
31/10/1950 Reallocation 31048 74A Ashford 74A Ashford  
07/04/1951 Condemned 31383 74C Dover Marine   COND  
05/1951 Condemned 31041 AFD Ashford   COND  
05/1951 Condemned 31379 FAV Faversham   COND  
05/1951 Condemned 31381 DOV Dover Marine   COND  
05/1951 Condemned 31390 AFD Ashford   COND  
05/1951 Condemned 31093 DOV Dover Marine   COND  
06/1951 Condemned 31391 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
06/1951 Condemned 31395 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
06/1951 Condemned 31248 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
06/1951 Condemned 31066 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
06/1951 Condemned 31432 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
06/1951 Condemned 31044 GIL Gillingham (Kent)   COND  
07/1951 Condemned 31373 DOV Dover Marine   COND  
07/1951 Condemned 31108 DOV Dover Marine   COND  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31369 FAV Faversham 74C Dover Marine  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 1065 DOV Dover Marine 74A Ashford  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 1064 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 74A Ashford  
27/07/1951 Reallocation 31258 HIT Hither Green 74C Dover Marine  
09/1951 Condemned 31369 74C Dover Marine   COND  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 31065 74A Ashford 74C Dover Marine  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 31048 74A Ashford 73A Stewarts Lane  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 31064 74A Ashford 73A Stewarts Lane  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 31258 74C Dover Marine 74A Ashford  
19/07/1957 Reallocation 31258 74A Ashford 74C Dover Marine  
24/05/1958 Condemned 31064 73A Stewarts Lane   COND  
13/10/1958 Reallocation 31370 TON Tonbridge 73A Stewarts Lane  
16/05/1959 Condemned 31430 74C Dover Marine   COND  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31370 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31048 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
15/08/1959 Condemned 31434 74C Dover Marine   COND  
29/08/1959 Condemned 31425 DOV Dover Marine   COND  
02/1960 Condemned 31370 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/02/1960 Reallocation 31370 98W   73H Dover Marine  
09/02/1960 Reallocation 31048 70A Nine Elms 73H Dover Marine  
15/10/1960 Condemned 31048 73H Dover Marine   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 31258 74C Dover Marine   COND  
24/06/1961 Condemned 31065 74C Dover Marine   COND