SR Bulleid "Q1" Class 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C1 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C2 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C3 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C4 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C5 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C6 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C7 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C8 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C9 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C10 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C11 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C12 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C13 | GFD | Guildford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C14 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C15 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C16 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C17 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C18 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C19 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C20 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C21 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C22 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C23 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C24 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C25 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C26 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C27 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C28 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C29 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C30 | TON | Tonbridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C31 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C32 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C33 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C34 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C35 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C36 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C37 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C38 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C39 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | C40 | FEL | Feltham | |||
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C9 | GFD | Guildford | FEL | Feltham | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C10 | GFD | Guildford | FEL | Feltham | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C11 | GFD | Guildford | FEL | Feltham | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C12 | GFD | Guildford | FEL | Feltham | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C13 | GFD | Guildford | FEL | Feltham | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C31 | FEL | Feltham | TON | Tonbridge | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C32 | FEL | Feltham | TON | Tonbridge | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C33 | FEL | Feltham | TON | Tonbridge | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C34 | FEL | Feltham | TON | Tonbridge | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C35 | FEL | Feltham | TON | Tonbridge | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C36 | FEL | Feltham | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C37 | FEL | Feltham | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C38 | FEL | Feltham | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C39 | FEL | Feltham | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | C40 | FEL | Feltham | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |
06/10/1948 | Reallocation | C8 | GFD | Guildford | FEL | Feltham | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | C6 | GFD | Guildford | FEL | Feltham | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | C7 | GFD | Guildford | FEL | Feltham | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 33036 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | TON | Tonbridge | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 33037 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | TON | Tonbridge | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 33038 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | TON | Tonbridge | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 33039 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 74D | Tonbridge | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 33040 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 74D | Tonbridge | |
24/06/1950 | Reallocation | 33039 | 74D | Tonbridge | 74E | St Leonards | |
24/06/1950 | Reallocation | 33040 | 74D | Tonbridge | 74E | St Leonards | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 33014 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 33015 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 33016 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 33026 | TON | Tonbridge | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 33026 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | |
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 33027 | TON | Tonbridge | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | |
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 33028 | TON | Tonbridge | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | |
27/06/1951 | Reallocation | 33016 | 70C | Guildford | 71D | Fratton | |
27/07/1951 | Reallocation | 33014 | 70C | Guildford | 73C | Hither Green | |
27/07/1951 | Reallocation | 33015 | 70C | Guildford | 73C | Hither Green | |
27/07/1951 | Reallocation | 33036 | TON | Tonbridge | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
27/07/1951 | Reallocation | 33037 | TON | Tonbridge | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
27/07/1951 | Reallocation | 33038 | TON | Tonbridge | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
05/09/1951 | Reallocation | 33026 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 74D | Tonbridge | |
05/09/1951 | Reallocation | 33027 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 74D | Tonbridge | |
05/09/1951 | Reallocation | 33028 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 74D | Tonbridge | |
21/01/1952 | Reallocation | 33016 | 71D | Fratton | 71A | Eastleigh | |
07/10/1952 | Reallocation | 33036 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 74D | Tonbridge | |
07/10/1952 | Reallocation | 33037 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 73C | Hither Green | |
07/10/1952 | Reallocation | 33038 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 71A | Eastleigh | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 33002 | GFD | Guildford | 73E | Faversham | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 33004 | GFD | Guildford | 73E | Faversham | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 33005 | GFD | Guildford | 73E | Faversham | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 33007 | FEL | Feltham | 73C | Hither Green | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 33009 | FEL | Feltham | 73C | Hither Green | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 33011 | FEL | Feltham | 73C | Hither Green | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 33016 | 71A | Eastleigh | 73E | Faversham | |
27/03/1953 | Reallocation | 33002 | 73E | Faversham | 70C | Guildford | |
27/03/1953 | Reallocation | 33018 | ELH | Eastleigh | 74B | Ramsgate | |
27/03/1953 | Reallocation | 33019 | ELH | Eastleigh | 74B | Ramsgate | |
27/03/1953 | Reallocation | 33022 | ELH | Eastleigh | 74B | Ramsgate | |
26/05/1953 | Reallocation | 33005 | 73E | Faversham | 70C | Guildford | |
26/05/1953 | Reallocation | 33007 | 73C | Hither Green | 70B | Feltham | |
26/05/1953 | Reallocation | 33009 | 73C | Hither Green | 70B | Feltham | |
26/05/1953 | Reallocation | 33011 | 73C | Hither Green | 70B | Feltham | |
26/05/1953 | Reallocation | 33018 | 74B | Ramsgate | 70C | Guildford | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 33004 | 73E | Faversham | 70C | Guildford | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 33016 | 73E | Faversham | 73C | Hither Green | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 33018 | 70C | Guildford | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 33019 | 74B | Ramsgate | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 33022 | 74B | Ramsgate | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
24/08/1953 | Reallocation | 33018 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70C | Guildford | |
24/08/1953 | Reallocation | 33019 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70C | Guildford | |
01/10/1953 | Reallocation | 33018 | 70C | Guildford | 73C | Hither Green | |
01/10/1953 | Reallocation | 33022 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70C | Guildford | |
01/10/1953 | Reallocation | 33026 | 74D | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
01/10/1953 | Reallocation | 33027 | 74D | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
29/10/1953 | Reallocation | 33024 | ELH | Eastleigh | 74D | Tonbridge | |
13/05/1954 | Reallocation | 33016 | 73C | Hither Green | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
13/05/1954 | Reallocation | 33017 | ELH | Eastleigh | 75A | Brighton | |
13/05/1954 | Reallocation | 33018 | 73C | Hither Green | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
13/05/1954 | Reallocation | 33037 | 73C | Hither Green | 75A | Brighton | |
18/06/1954 | Reallocation | 33015 | 73C | Hither Green | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
18/06/1954 | Reallocation | 33025 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
18/06/1954 | Reallocation | 33038 | 71A | Eastleigh | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
20/08/1954 | Reallocation | 33025 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 33015 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 33016 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 33017 | 75A | Brighton | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 33018 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 70B | Feltham | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 33037 | 75A | Brighton | 73C | Hither Green | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 33038 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
08/02/1955 | Reallocation | 33015 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/02/1955 | Reallocation | 33017 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/02/1955 | Reallocation | 33038 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
19/07/1957 | Reallocation | 33039 | 74E | St Leonards | 73C | Hither Green | |
19/07/1957 | Reallocation | 33040 | 74E | St Leonards | 73C | Hither Green | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 33001 | GFD | Guildford | 73J | Tonbridge | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 33002 | 70C | Guildford | 73J | Tonbridge | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 33003 | GFD | Guildford | 73J | Tonbridge | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 33004 | 70C | Guildford | 73J | Tonbridge | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 33014 | 73C | Hither Green | 73J | Tonbridge | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 33037 | 73C | Hither Green | 73J | Tonbridge | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 33039 | 73C | Hither Green | 73J | Tonbridge | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 33040 | 73C | Hither Green | 73J | Tonbridge | |
10/02/1961 | Reallocation | 33001 | 73J | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
10/02/1961 | Reallocation | 33002 | 73J | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
10/02/1961 | Reallocation | 33003 | 73J | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
10/02/1961 | Reallocation | 33004 | 73J | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
10/02/1961 | Reallocation | 33014 | 73J | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
10/02/1961 | Reallocation | 33015 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70B | Feltham | |
10/02/1961 | Reallocation | 33017 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70B | Feltham | |
10/02/1961 | Reallocation | 33024 | 74D | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
10/02/1961 | Reallocation | 33038 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70B | Feltham | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 33034 | TON | Tonbridge | 70C | Guildford | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 33035 | TON | Tonbridge | 70C | Guildford | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 33036 | 74D | Tonbridge | 70C | Guildford | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 33037 | 73J | Tonbridge | 71A | Eastleigh | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 33039 | 73J | Tonbridge | 71A | Eastleigh | |
26/05/1961 | Reallocation | 33040 | 73J | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
28/05/1962 | Reallocation | 33028 | 74D | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
28/05/1962 | Reallocation | 33029 | TON | Tonbridge | 70B | Feltham | |
28/05/1962 | Reallocation | 33030 | TON | Tonbridge | 70A | Nine Elms | |
28/05/1962 | Reallocation | 33031 | TON | Tonbridge | 70A | Nine Elms | |
28/05/1962 | Reallocation | 33032 | TON | Tonbridge | 70C | Guildford | |
28/05/1962 | Reallocation | 33033 | TON | Tonbridge | 70C | Guildford | |
24/09/1962 | Reallocation | 33024 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
24/09/1962 | Reallocation | 33026 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
24/09/1962 | Reallocation | 33028 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
24/09/1962 | Reallocation | 33029 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
17/12/1962 | Reallocation | 33014 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
17/12/1962 | Reallocation | 33015 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
17/12/1962 | Reallocation | 33016 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
17/12/1962 | Reallocation | 33017 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
17/12/1962 | Reallocation | 33018 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
03/02/1963 | Condemned | 33028 | 75E | Three Bridges | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 33005 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
07/07/1963 | Condemned | 33002 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
07/07/1963 | Condemned | 33013 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
07/07/1963 | Condemned | 33025 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
18/08/1963 | Condemned | 33021 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
25/08/1963 | Condemned | 33008 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
25/08/1963 | Condemned | 33011 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
25/08/1963 | Condemned | 33016 | 75E | Three Bridges | COND | ||
25/08/1963 | Condemned | 33024 | 75E | Three Bridges | COND | ||
16/09/1963 | Reallocation | 33001 | 70B | Feltham | 70C | Guildford | |
29/09/1963 | Condemned | 33031 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
06/10/1963 | Condemned | 33037 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
14/10/1963 | Reallocation | 33004 | 70B | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
14/10/1963 | Reallocation | 33006 | FEL | Feltham | 75E | Three Bridges | |
01/12/1963 | Condemned | 33019 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 33010 | FEL | Feltham | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 33014 | 75E | Three Bridges | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 33017 | 75E | Three Bridges | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 33022 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 33029 | 75E | Three Bridges | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 33032 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 33034 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
05/01/1964 | Condemned | 33038 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 33004 | 75E | Three Bridges | 70C | Guildford | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 33006 | 75E | Three Bridges | 70C | Guildford | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 33014 | 98W | 70C | Guildford | ||
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 33015 | 75E | Three Bridges | 70C | Guildford | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 33018 | 75E | Three Bridges | 70C | Guildford | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 33026 | 75E | Three Bridges | 70B | Feltham | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 33030 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70B | Feltham | |
26/01/1964 | Condemned | 33007 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
17/05/1964 | Condemned | 33001 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
14/06/1964 | Condemned | 33003 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
14/06/1964 | Condemned | 33023 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
14/06/1964 | Condemned | 33030 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
14/06/1964 | Condemned | 33033 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
14/06/1964 | Condemned | 33035 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
14/06/1964 | Condemned | 33039 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
14/06/1964 | Condemned | 33040 | 70B | Feltham | COND | ||
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 33006 | 70C | Guildford | 70B | Feltham | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 33020 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
28/06/1964 | Condemned | 33036 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 33009 | 70B | Feltham | 70C | Guildford | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 33012 | FEL | Feltham | 70C | Guildford | |
15/11/1964 | Condemned | 33015 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 33006 | 70B | Feltham | 70C | Guildford | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 33020 | 70B | Feltham | 70C | Guildford | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 33026 | 70B | Feltham | 70C | Guildford | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 33027 | 70B | Feltham | 70C | Guildford | |
22/11/1964 | Condemned | 33012 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
03/01/1965 | Condemned | 33004 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 33006 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 33009 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 33018 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 33020 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 33026 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 33027 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
04/07/1965 | Condemned | 33018 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
26/09/1965 | Condemned | 33009 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
26/09/1965 | Condemned | 33026 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
22/11/1965 | Reallocation | 33006 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
22/11/1965 | Reallocation | 33020 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
22/11/1965 | Reallocation | 33027 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
09/01/1966 | Condemned | 33006 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
09/01/1966 | Condemned | 33020 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
09/01/1966 | Condemned | 33027 | 70C | Guildford | COND |