SR Bulleid "Q1" Class 0-6-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tue 27/07/1954 | 33031, 33036, 33038 |
74D, 74D, 75C |
Ashford Works visit: Around the works. - On Works. Ashford Works visit: Around the works. - On Works. Ashford Works visit: Around the works. - Ex-Works on the shed. |
RO 9/1954 | ||
Sat 18/02/1961 | 33020, 33039 |
71A, 73J |
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sat 25/02/1961 | 33020, 33039 |
71A, 73J |
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sun 26/11/1961 | 33023, 33033, 33040 |
71A, 73J, 70B |
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sat 07/05/1966 | 33020, 33027 |
Wdn, Wdn |
At Dock Street Goods yard, Newport: Dumped - Awaiting entry to Buttigieg's scrapyard | RO 8/1966 |