Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 79 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 79 Week
» 11224 Month
» 111009 Year
» 1776385 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "E1R" Class 0-6-2T


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
El Radials 2094 32094 11/1883 BPL
PLY
W
Barnstaple Junction
Plymouth Friary
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/10/1949
05/1955
05/1955
El Radials 2095 32095 11/1883 BPL
72D
W
Barnstaple Junction
Plymouth Friary
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
24/11/1956
24/11/1956
El Radials 2096 32096 12/1883 BPL
72D
W
Barnstaple Junction
Plymouth Friary
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/07/1955
10/11/1956
10/11/1956
El Radials 2124 32124 08/1878 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/01/1959
31/01/1959
El Radials 2135 32135 01/1879 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1959
02/1959
El Radials 2608 32608 11/1876 BPL
W
Barnstaple Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/05/1957
11/05/1957
El Radials 2610 32610 12/1874 BPL
W
Barnstaple Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1956
04/1956
El Radials 2695 32695 09/1876 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1957
04/1957
El Radials 2696 32696 10/1876 BPL
W
Barnstaple Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/01/1956
07/01/1956
El Radials 2697 32697 09/1876 EXJ
W
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1959
28/11/1959