Beyer-Peacock 35 B-B
BR (Pre Tops) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
D7000 | 16/05/1961 | 82A 82B 82A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
16/05/1961 06/1961 08/1961 02/01/1972 30/07/1973 |
30/07/1973 |
D7001 | 03/07/1961 | 82B 82A 86A 82A 81A W |
St Philips Marsh (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
03/07/1961 12/08/1961 02/11/1963 25/01/1964 02/01/1972 16/03/1974 |
16/03/1974 |
D7002 | 19/07/1961 | 82A 82D 82A 83A 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Westbury Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
19/07/1961 04/11/1961 21/04/1962 06/10/1962 04/05/1963 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7003 | 03/08/1961 | 82A 86A 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
03/08/1961 02/11/1963 25/01/1964 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7004 | 15/08/1961 | 82A R W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Reinstated Withdrawn |
15/08/1961 01/01/1972 08/01/1972 16/06/1972 |
16/06/1972 |
D7005 | 25/09/1961 | 82A 82D 82A R W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Westbury Bristol Bath Road Reinstated Withdrawn |
25/09/1961 04/11/1961 21/04/1962 01/01/1972 08/01/1972 02/07/1972 |
02/07/1972 |
D7006 | 06/10/1961 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
06/10/1961 11/09/1971 11/09/1971 |
11/09/1971 |
D7007 | 18/10/1961 | 82D 82A R W |
Westbury (New) Bristol Bath Road Reinstated Withdrawn |
18/10/1961 14/07/1962 01/01/1972 08/01/1972 19/04/1972 |
19/04/1972 |
D7008 | 24/10/1961 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
24/10/1961 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7009 | 07/11/1961 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
07/11/1961 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D7010 | 20/11/1961 | 82A 88A 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
20/11/1961 21/04/1962 29/06/1963 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7011 | 04/12/1961 | 82A 86A 82A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
04/12/1961 02/11/1963 25/01/1964 09/10/1971 01/01/1975 02/03/1975 |
02/03/1975 |
D7012 | 01/12/1961 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
01/12/1961 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7013 | 14/12/1961 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
14/12/1961 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7014 | 18/12/1961 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
18/12/1961 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7015 | 22/12/1961 | 82A 86A 82A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
22/12/1961 02/11/1963 25/01/1964 08/01/1972 07/06/1972 |
07/06/1972 |
D7016 | 03/01/1962 | 82A 81A |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Old Oak Common |
03/01/1962 09/10/1971 |
06/07/1974 |
D7017 | 08/01/1962 | 82A 81A R W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Old Oak Common Reinstated Withdrawn |
08/01/1962 09/10/1971 11/05/1973 05/06/1973 13/03/1975 |
13/03/1975 |
D7018 | 18/01/1962 | 82A 86A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
18/01/1962 20/02/1966 01/01/1972 16/03/1975 |
16/03/1975 |
D7019 | 14/02/1962 | 82A 81A R W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Old Oak Common Reinstated Withdrawn |
14/02/1962 11/1971 08/07/1972 08/09/1972 15/09/1972 |
15/09/1972 |
D7020 | 08/02/1962 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
08/02/1962 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7021 | 14/02/1962 | 82A 86A 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
14/02/1962 02/11/1963 25/01/1964 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7022 | 26/02/1962 | 88A 82A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
26/02/1962 29/06/1963 09/10/1971 03/02/1975 02/03/1975 |
02/03/1975 |
D7023 | 21/02/1962 | 82A 88A 82A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
21/02/1962 24/03/1962 29/06/1963 08/01/1972 09/06/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D7024 | 16/03/1962 | 88A 82A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
16/03/1962 29/06/1963 09/10/1971 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7025 | 15/03/1962 | 88A 82A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
15/03/1962 29/06/1963 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7026 | 26/03/1962 | 82A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
26/03/1962 28/12/1963 06/10/1974 |
06/10/1974 |
D7027 | 07/04/1962 | 82A 84A 81A 82A 84A 82A 87E 82A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Laira Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Laira Bristol Bath Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
07/04/1962 13/04/1964 04/05/1964 22/06/1964 08/08/1965 19/09/1965 27/03/1966 01/05/1966 31/03/1967 29/11/1971 29/11/1971 |
29/11/1971 |
D7028 | 05/04/1962 | 88A 82A 84A 82A 81A 82A 81A OC W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Laira Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
05/04/1962 29/06/1963 13/04/1964 18/03/1968 01/06/1968 11/11/1972 30/12/1972 06/10/1974 19/10/1974 26/11/1974 01/01/1975 |
01/01/1975 |
D7029 | 17/04/1962 | 88A 82A 84A 81A R W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Laira Old Oak Common Reinstated Withdrawn |
17/04/1962 19/09/1965 31/08/1967 01/06/1968 01/01/1975 03/02/1975 28/02/1975 |
28/02/1975 |
D7030 | 19/04/1962 | 88A 82A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
19/04/1962 19/09/1965 01/06/1968 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D7031 | 25/04/1962 | 88A 82A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
25/04/1962 19/09/1965 14/11/1970 11/05/1973 |
11/05/1973 |
D7032 | 05/05/1962 | 88A 82A 86A 82A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
05/05/1962 19/09/1965 15/01/1967 31/01/1967 14/11/1970 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D7033 | 24/05/1962 | 88A 82A 86A 82A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
24/05/1962 19/09/1965 15/01/1967 31/01/1967 14/11/1970 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7034 | 23/05/1962 | 88A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
23/05/1962 19/09/1965 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7035 | 04/06/1962 | 88A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
04/06/1962 19/09/1965 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7036 | 05/06/1962 | 88A 81A R 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Reinstated Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
05/06/1962 19/09/1965 01/01/1972 19/04/1972 13/05/1972 09/06/1972 |
09/06/1972 |
D7037 | 18/06/1962 | 88A 83A 84A 82A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Newton Abbot Laira Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
18/06/1962 13/06/1965 11/07/1965 19/09/1965 14/11/1970 15/09/1972 |
15/09/1972 |
D7038 | 18/06/1962 | 88A 84A 82A R W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Laira Bristol Bath Road Reinstated Withdrawn |
18/06/1962 11/07/1965 15/01/1966 01/01/1972 08/01/1972 02/07/1972 |
02/07/1972 |
D7039 | 22/06/1962 | 88A 84A 82A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Laira Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
22/06/1962 11/07/1965 15/01/1966 03/06/1972 |
03/06/1972 |
D7040 | 13/07/1962 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
13/07/1962 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7041 | 13/07/1962 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
13/07/1962 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7042 | 23/07/1962 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
23/07/1962 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7043 | 24/07/1962 | 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Withdrawn |
24/07/1962 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7044 | 18/08/1962 | 82A 81A 82A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
18/08/1962 10/1971 11/11/1972 10/03/1973 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D7045 | 10/08/1962 | 82A 81A 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
10/08/1962 09/11/1968 08/01/1972 11/11/1972 |
11/11/1972 |
D7046 | 15/08/1962 | 82A 86A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
15/08/1962 30/06/1967 09/11/1968 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7047 | 15/08/1962 | 82A 86A 82A 86A 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
15/08/1962 30/06/1967 09/11/1968 04/04/1970 02/01/1971 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7048 | 26/09/1962 | 82A 81A 86A 82A 86A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
26/09/1962 04/05/1963 30/06/1967 09/11/1968 04/04/1970 22/05/1971 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7049 | 05/10/1962 | 82A 86A 82A 86A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
05/10/1962 30/06/1967 09/11/1968 22/08/1970 22/05/1971 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7050 | 05/10/1962 | 82A 86A 81A 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
05/10/1962 31/03/1967 14/06/1969 08/01/1972 01/11/1972 |
01/11/1972 |
D7051 | 06/10/1962 | 82A 86A 81A 86A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
06/10/1962 31/03/1967 04/04/1970 04/04/1970 22/05/1971 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7052 | 24/10/1962 | 82A 86A 81A R R W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Reinstated Reinstated Withdrawn |
24/10/1962 31/03/1967 22/05/1971 01/01/1972 01/05/1972 08/07/1972 16/10/1972 30/11/1972 |
30/11/1972 |
D7053 | 24/10/1962 | 82A 86A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
24/10/1962 31/03/1967 22/05/1971 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7054 | 16/11/1962 | 82A 86A 82A R 81A R 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Reinstated Old Oak Common Reinstated Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
16/11/1962 31/01/1967 22/05/1971 01/01/1972 01/05/1972 13/05/1972 08/07/1972 15/09/1972 11/11/1972 30/12/1972 |
30/12/1972 |
D7055 | 02/11/1962 | 82A 86A 86A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
02/11/1962 31/01/1967 22/05/1971 16/04/1973 09/06/1973 |
09/06/1973 |
D7056 | 13/11/1962 | 88A 81A 86A 82A 86A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
13/11/1962 29/06/1963 01/06/1968 25/01/1969 01/11/1969 22/05/1971 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7057 | 22/11/1962 | 88A 81A 86A 82A 86A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
22/11/1962 29/06/1963 01/06/1968 25/01/1969 04/04/1970 22/05/1971 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7058 | 28/11/1962 | 88A 81A 86A 86A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
28/11/1962 28/09/1963 14/11/1970 22/05/1971 14/08/1971 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7059 | 28/11/1962 | 88A 81A 86A 82A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
28/11/1962 29/06/1963 01/06/1968 25/01/1969 04/04/1970 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7060 | 19/12/1962 | 88A 81A 86A 82A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
19/12/1962 29/06/1963 01/06/1968 25/01/1969 04/04/1970 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7061 | 29/12/1962 | 88A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
29/12/1962 29/06/1963 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7062 | 31/01/1963 | 88A 81A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
31/01/1963 27/07/1963 14/11/1970 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7063 | 28/12/1962 | 88A 81A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
28/12/1962 27/07/1963 01/06/1968 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7064 | 29/01/1963 | 88A 81A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
29/01/1963 27/07/1963 01/06/1968 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7065 | 28/01/1963 | 88A 81A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
28/01/1963 29/06/1963 14/11/1970 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7066 | 31/01/1963 | 88A 81A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
31/01/1963 11/07/1965 29/11/1971 29/11/1971 |
29/11/1971 |
D7067 | 06/02/1963 | 88A 81A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
06/02/1963 29/06/1963 01/06/1968 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7068 | 13/02/1963 | 88A 83A 84A 83A 86A 82A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
13/02/1963 29/06/1963 11/07/1965 19/06/1966 30/10/1966 08/01/1972 30/12/1972 |
30/12/1972 |
D7069 | 22/02/1963 | 82A 83A 84A 83A 84A 83A 86A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
22/02/1963 13/04/1964 04/05/1964 22/06/1964 11/07/1965 19/06/1966 30/10/1966 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7070 | 08/03/1963 | 82A 83A 84A 83A 84A 83A 86A R W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Reinstated Withdrawn |
08/03/1963 13/04/1964 04/05/1964 22/06/1964 11/07/1965 19/06/1966 30/10/1966 01/01/1972 01/05/1972 08/09/1972 |
08/09/1972 |
D7071 | 11/03/1963 | 82A 83A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
11/03/1963 13/04/1964 07/03/1965 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7072 | 22/03/1963 | 82A 84A 83A 84A 81A 86A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Laira Newton Abbot Laira Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
22/03/1963 13/04/1964 22/06/1964 20/07/1964 10/01/1965 14/11/1970 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7073 | 11/03/1963 | 82A 84A 81A 86A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Laira Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
11/03/1963 13/04/1964 04/05/1964 18/03/1968 10/12/1971 10/12/1971 |
10/12/1971 |
D7074 | 26/03/1963 | 82A 83A 84A 83A 86A 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
26/03/1963 13/06/1965 11/07/1965 19/06/1966 28/08/1966 09/10/1971 30/12/1972 |
30/12/1972 |
D7075 | 29/03/1963 | 83A 82A 86A 82A W |
Newton Abbot (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
29/03/1963 29/06/1963 28/08/1966 09/10/1971 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D7076 | 03/05/1963 | 81A 86A 82A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
03/05/1963 18/03/1968 08/01/1972 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D7077 | 13/12/1963 | 82A 86A 82A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
13/12/1963 28/08/1966 08/01/1972 02/07/1972 |
02/07/1972 |
D7078 | 03/05/1963 | 81A 82A 86A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
03/05/1963 30/09/1967 30/09/1967 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7079 | 16/12/1963 | 82A 86A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
16/12/1963 28/08/1966 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7080 | 14/12/1963 | 86A 81A 86A 82A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
14/12/1963 11/07/1965 30/10/1966 08/01/1972 07/11/1972 |
07/11/1972 |
D7081 | 12/12/1963 | 82A 81A 86A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
12/12/1963 12/10/1964 01/05/1966 11/09/1971 11/09/1971 |
11/09/1971 |
D7082 | 05/06/1963 | 88A 81A 86A 81A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
05/06/1963 11/07/1965 01/05/1966 08/01/1972 19/04/1972 19/04/1972 |
19/04/1972 |
D7083 | 05/06/1963 | 88A 82A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
05/06/1963 19/09/1965 15/01/1967 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D7084 | 26/06/1963 | 88A 82A 86A 81A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
26/06/1963 19/09/1965 15/01/1967 08/01/1972 09/09/1972 11/10/1972 |
11/10/1972 |
D7085 | 24/06/1963 | 88A 81A 86A 81A 86A R W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Reinstated Withdrawn |
24/06/1963 07/03/1965 01/05/1966 08/01/1972 08/05/1972 08/07/1972 15/09/1972 11/10/1972 |
11/10/1972 |
D7086 | 20/07/1963 | 88A 84A 83A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
20/07/1963 11/07/1965 19/06/1966 28/08/1966 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7087 | 20/07/1963 | 88A 82A 81A 86A 82A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
20/07/1963 23/01/1965 08/01/1972 08/05/1972 12/08/1972 07/10/1972 |
07/10/1972 |
D7088 | 29/10/1963 | 82A 81A 84A 86A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Old Oak Common Laira Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
29/10/1963 30/10/1966 31/08/1967 01/06/1968 01/01/1972 |
01/01/1972 |
D7089 | 23/07/1963 | 88A 84A 82A 86A 81A 82A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
23/07/1963 22/06/1964 28/03/1965 30/10/1966 08/01/1972 08/05/1972 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D7090 | 24/09/1963 | 86A 84A 83A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Laira Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
24/09/1963 22/06/1964 19/06/1966 12/06/1972 |
12/06/1972 |
D7091 | 24/09/1963 | 86A 82A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
24/09/1963 23/01/1965 30/10/1966 10/08/1972 |
10/08/1972 |
D7092 | 16/12/1963 | 86A 82A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
16/12/1963 22/06/1964 30/10/1966 20/06/1972 |
20/06/1972 |
D7093 | 14/12/1963 | 82A 86A 82A R W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Reinstated Withdrawn |
14/12/1963 19/06/1966 30/12/1972 06/05/1973 01/08/1973 19/10/1974 26/11/1974 |
26/11/1974 |
D7094 | 14/12/1963 | 86A 82A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
14/12/1963 22/06/1964 01/05/1966 01/11/1972 |
01/11/1972 |
D7095 | 24/12/1963 | 86A 83A 84A 83A 86A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
24/12/1963 13/04/1964 22/06/1964 19/06/1966 28/08/1966 16/10/1972 |
16/10/1972 |
D7096 | 16/12/1963 | 86A 83A 84A 86A 82A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Newton Abbot Laira Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
16/12/1963 13/04/1964 22/06/1964 01/05/1966 30/09/1972 30/12/1972 |
30/12/1972 |
D7097 | 16/12/1963 | 86A 83A 84A 86A 82A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Newton Abbot Laira Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
16/12/1963 25/01/1964 22/06/1964 01/05/1966 11/11/1972 30/12/1972 |
30/12/1972 |
D7098 | 01/01/1964 | 83A 84A 86A W |
Newton Abbot (New) Laira Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
01/01/1964 22/06/1964 01/05/1966 30/12/1972 |
30/12/1972 |
D7099 | 22/01/1964 | 83A 84A 86A W |
Newton Abbot (New) Laira Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
22/01/1964 22/06/1964 01/05/1966 15/10/1972 |
05/10/1972 |
D7100 | 05/02/1964 | 83A 84A 86A 82A 81A 86A 81A 82A W |
Newton Abbot (New) Laira Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
05/02/1964 22/06/1964 01/05/1966 25/01/1969 15/03/1969 14/11/1970 27/02/1971 08/01/1972 01/11/1972 |
01/11/1972 |