Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 775 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3081 Week
» 27915 Month
» 62247 Year
» 1727623 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

140


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
56175      
56176
56177
56178
56179
56180
56181
56182
56183
56184
56185 15/05/1958 50A York (North) (New) 15/05/1958
56186 16/05/1958 50A York (North) (New) 16/05/1958
56187 16/05/1958 50A York (North) (New) 16/05/1958
56188 24/05/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 24/05/1958
56189 30/05/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 30/05/1958