Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 60 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5535 Week
» 5535 Month
» 72397 Year
» 1737773 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

140


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
15/05/1958 To Service 56185   NEW 50A York (North)
16/05/1958 To Service 56186   NEW 50A York (North)
16/05/1958 To Service 56187   NEW 50A York (North)
24/05/1958 To Service 56188   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
30/05/1958 To Service 56189   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street