Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 856 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5483 Week
» 7221 Month
» 134664 Year
» 1800040 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

140


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
56175
56176
56177
56178
56179
56180
56181
56182
56183
56184
56185 15/05/1958 York (North) 63.02
56186 16/05/1958 York (North) 63.02
56187 16/05/1958 York (North) 63.02
56188 24/05/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 63.00
56189 30/05/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.98