Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 18 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3343 Week
» 3343 Month
» 70205 Year
» 1735581 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

141


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
56114 10/08/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 10/08/1956
56115 23/10/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 23/10/1956
56116 02/11/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 02/11/1956
56117 19/11/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/11/1956
56118 03/12/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 03/12/1956
56119 20/12/1956 53C
NR
Hull Springhead (New)
Norwich Thorpe
20/12/1956
26/07/1981
56120 01/01/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 01/01/1957
56121 12/01/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 12/01/1957
56122 23/01/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 23/01/1957
56123 29/01/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 29/01/1957
56124 01/02/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 01/02/1957
56125 04/02/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 04/02/1957
56126 18/02/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/02/1957
56127 21/02/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 21/02/1957
56128 26/02/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 26/02/1957
56129 04/03/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 04/03/1957
56130 11/03/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 11/03/1957
56131 18/03/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/03/1957
56132 22/03/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 22/03/1957
56133 11/04/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 11/04/1957
56134 17/04/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 17/04/1957
56135 26/04/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 26/04/1957
56136 01/05/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 01/05/1957
56137 06/05/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 06/05/1957
56138 13/05/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 13/05/1957
56139 21/05/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 21/05/1957
56140 31/05/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 31/05/1957
56141 31/05/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 31/05/1957
56142 27/06/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 27/06/1957
56143 05/07/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 05/07/1957
56144 05/07/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 05/07/1957
56145
56146
56147
56148
56149
56412 31/05/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 31/05/1958
56413 31/05/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 31/05/1958
56414 06/06/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 06/06/1958
56415 06/06/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 06/06/1958
56416 12/06/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 12/06/1958
56417 19/06/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 19/06/1958
56418 19/06/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 19/06/1958
56419 26/06/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 26/06/1958
56420 26/06/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 26/06/1958
56421 01/07/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 01/07/1958
56422 17/07/1958 31A
NR
Cambridge (New)
Norwich Thorpe
17/07/1958
20/07/1981
56423 23/07/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 23/07/1958
56424 29/07/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 29/07/1958
56425 29/07/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 29/07/1958
56426 29/07/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 29/07/1958
56427 01/08/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 01/08/1958
56428 01/08/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 01/08/1958
56429 08/08/1958 31A
NR
Cambridge (New)
Norwich Thorpe
08/08/1958
26/07/1981
56430 03/09/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 03/09/1958
56431 03/09/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 03/09/1958
56432 09/09/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 09/09/1958
56433 12/09/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 12/09/1958
56434 19/09/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 19/09/1958
56435 24/09/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 24/09/1958
56436 26/09/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 26/09/1958
56437 03/10/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 03/10/1958
56438 03/10/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 03/10/1958
56439 10/10/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 10/10/1958
56440 17/10/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 17/10/1958
56441 17/10/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 17/10/1958
56442 29/10/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 29/10/1958
56443 29/10/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 29/10/1958
56444 05/11/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 05/11/1958
56445 05/11/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 05/11/1958
56446 12/11/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 12/11/1958
56447 23/11/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 23/11/1958
56448 23/11/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 23/11/1958
56449 29/11/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 29/11/1958
56450 06/12/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 06/12/1958
56451 06/12/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 06/12/1958
56452 13/12/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 13/12/1958
56453 18/12/1958 40A Lincoln (New) 18/12/1958
56454 31/12/1958 31A Cambridge (New) 31/12/1958
56455 05/01/1959 40A Lincoln (New) 05/01/1959
56456 05/01/1959 31A Cambridge (New) 05/01/1959
56457 15/01/1959 31A Cambridge (New) 15/01/1959
56458 21/01/1959 40A Lincoln (New) 21/01/1959
56459 29/01/1959 40A Lincoln (New) 29/01/1959
56460 09/02/1959 40A Lincoln (New) 09/02/1959
56461 09/02/1959 40A Lincoln (New) 09/02/1959
56462 14/02/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 14/02/1959
56463 21/02/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 21/02/1959
56464 21/02/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 21/02/1959
56465 16/03/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 16/03/1959
56466 16/03/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 16/03/1959
56467 16/03/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 16/03/1959
56468 16/03/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 16/03/1959
56469 16/03/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 16/03/1959
56470 20/03/1959 61A
NR
Kittybrewster (New)
Norwich Thorpe
20/03/1959
26/07/1981
56471 01/04/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 01/04/1959
56472 01/04/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 01/04/1959
56473 01/04/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 01/04/1959
56474 08/04/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 08/04/1959
56475 20/04/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 20/04/1959
56476 20/04/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 20/04/1959
56477 20/04/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 20/04/1959
56478 05/05/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 05/05/1959
56479      
56480      
56481       22/12/1973
56482      
56483