Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1044 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 7561 Week
» 7561 Month
» 74423 Year
» 1739799 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

141


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
10/08/1956 To Service 56114   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
23/10/1956 To Service 56115   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
02/11/1956 To Service 56116   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/11/1956 To Service 56117   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
03/12/1956 To Service 56118   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
20/12/1956 To Service 56119   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
01/01/1957 To Service 56120   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
12/01/1957 To Service 56121   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
23/01/1957 To Service 56122   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
29/01/1957 To Service 56123   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
01/02/1957 To Service 56124   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
04/02/1957 To Service 56125   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
18/02/1957 To Service 56126   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
21/02/1957 To Service 56127   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
26/02/1957 To Service 56128   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
04/03/1957 To Service 56129   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
11/03/1957 To Service 56130   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
18/03/1957 To Service 56131   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
22/03/1957 To Service 56132   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
11/04/1957 To Service 56133   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
17/04/1957 To Service 56134   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
26/04/1957 To Service 56135   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
01/05/1957 To Service 56136   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
06/05/1957 To Service 56137   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
13/05/1957 To Service 56138   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
21/05/1957 To Service 56139   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
31/05/1957 To Service 56140   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
31/05/1957 To Service 56141   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
27/06/1957 To Service 56142   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
05/07/1957 To Service 56143   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
05/07/1957 To Service 56144   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
31/05/1958 To Service 56412   NEW 40A Lincoln
31/05/1958 To Service 56413   NEW 40A Lincoln
06/06/1958 To Service 56414   NEW 40A Lincoln
06/06/1958 To Service 56415   NEW 40A Lincoln
12/06/1958 To Service 56416   NEW 40A Lincoln
19/06/1958 To Service 56417   NEW 40A Lincoln
19/06/1958 To Service 56418   NEW 40A Lincoln
26/06/1958 To Service 56419   NEW 40A Lincoln
26/06/1958 To Service 56420   NEW 40A Lincoln
01/07/1958 To Service 56421   NEW 40A Lincoln
17/07/1958 To Service 56422   NEW 31A Cambridge
23/07/1958 To Service 56423   NEW 31A Cambridge
29/07/1958 To Service 56424   NEW 31A Cambridge
29/07/1958 To Service 56425   NEW 31A Cambridge
29/07/1958 To Service 56426   NEW 31A Cambridge
01/08/1958 To Service 56427   NEW 31A Cambridge
01/08/1958 To Service 56428   NEW 31A Cambridge
08/08/1958 To Service 56429   NEW 31A Cambridge
03/09/1958 To Service 56430   NEW 31A Cambridge
03/09/1958 To Service 56431   NEW 31A Cambridge
09/09/1958 To Service 56432   NEW 31A Cambridge
12/09/1958 To Service 56433   NEW 31A Cambridge
19/09/1958 To Service 56434   NEW 31A Cambridge
24/09/1958 To Service 56435   NEW 31A Cambridge
26/09/1958 To Service 56436   NEW 31A Cambridge
03/10/1958 To Service 56437   NEW 31A Cambridge
03/10/1958 To Service 56438   NEW 31A Cambridge
10/10/1958 To Service 56439   NEW 31A Cambridge
17/10/1958 To Service 56440   NEW 31A Cambridge
17/10/1958 To Service 56441   NEW 31A Cambridge
29/10/1958 To Service 56442   NEW 31A Cambridge
29/10/1958 To Service 56443   NEW 31A Cambridge
05/11/1958 To Service 56444   NEW 31A Cambridge
05/11/1958 To Service 56445   NEW 31A Cambridge
12/11/1958 To Service 56446   NEW 31A Cambridge
23/11/1958 To Service 56447   NEW 40A Lincoln
23/11/1958 To Service 56448   NEW 40A Lincoln
29/11/1958 To Service 56449   NEW 40A Lincoln
06/12/1958 To Service 56450   NEW 40A Lincoln
06/12/1958 To Service 56451   NEW 40A Lincoln
13/12/1958 To Service 56452   NEW 40A Lincoln
18/12/1958 To Service 56453   NEW 40A Lincoln
31/12/1958 To Service 56454   NEW 31A Cambridge
05/01/1959 To Service 56455   NEW 40A Lincoln
05/01/1959 To Service 56456   NEW 31A Cambridge
15/01/1959 To Service 56457   NEW 31A Cambridge
21/01/1959 To Service 56458   NEW 40A Lincoln
29/01/1959 To Service 56459   NEW 40A Lincoln
09/02/1959 To Service 56460   NEW 40A Lincoln
09/02/1959 To Service 56461   NEW 40A Lincoln
14/02/1959 To Service 56462   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
21/02/1959 To Service 56463   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
21/02/1959 To Service 56464   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
16/03/1959 To Service 56465   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
16/03/1959 To Service 56466   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
16/03/1959 To Service 56467   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
16/03/1959 To Service 56468   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
16/03/1959 To Service 56469   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
20/03/1959 To Service 56470   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
01/04/1959 To Service 56471   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
01/04/1959 To Service 56472   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
01/04/1959 To Service 56473   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
08/04/1959 To Service 56474   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
20/04/1959 To Service 56475   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
20/04/1959 To Service 56476   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
20/04/1959 To Service 56477   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
05/05/1959 To Service 56478   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
22/12/1973 Condemned 56481       COND
20/07/1981 Reallocation 56422 31A Cambridge NR Norwich Thorpe
26/07/1981 Reallocation 56119 53C Hull Springhead NR Norwich Thorpe
26/07/1981 Reallocation 56429 31A Cambridge NR Norwich Thorpe
26/07/1981 Reallocation 56470 61A Kittybrewster NR Norwich Thorpe