BR
Database
Complete BR Locomotive Database 1948-1997
Home
Guestbook
Contact
Links
Preferences
Menu
Locomotives
Build Dates
Withdrawals
Names
Snapshots
Regional
Locomotives
Workings
ReClassifications
Pilot Scheme
Prototypes
Preservation
Diesels
Electrics
Steam
Classes
Steam
Standards
GWR
1850-1947
Barry
Brecon & Merthyr Junction
Burry Port & Gwendraeth Valley
Cambrian
Cardiff
Midland & South Western Junction
Powlesland & Mason
Port Talbot
Rhymney
Swansea Harbour Trust
Taff Vale
Vale of Rheidol
SR
1923-1947
London South Western
London, Brighton & South Coast
South Eastern & Chatham
LNER
LNER Designs 1923-1947
Great Central
Great Eastern
Great Northern
Great North of Scotland
Hull and Barnsley
Midland and Great Northern
North British
North Eastern
LMS
LMS Designs 1923-1947
Caledonian
Furness
Glasgow & South Western
Highland
London & North Western
London, Tilbury & Southend
Lancashire & Yorkshire
Maryport & Carlisle
Midland
North Staffordshire
Somerset & Dorset
ex WD
by Wheels
2 Driver Tank Engines
2-2-4T
2 Driver Tender Engines
2-2-2
4 Coupled Tank Engines
0-4-0T
0-4-0ST
0-4-2T
0-4-2ST
0-4-4T
2-4-0T
2-4-0WT
2-4-2T
4-4-0T
4-4-2T
4-4-4T
4 Coupled Tender Engines
0-4-0
0-4-2
0-4-4
2-4-0
2-4-2
4-4-0
4-4-2
4-4-4
6 Coupled Tank Engines
0-6-0T
0-6-0PT
0-6-0ST
0-6-2T
0-6-2ST
0-6-4T
2-6-0T
2-6-2T
2-6-4T
4-6-0T
4-6-2T
4-6-4T
6 Coupled Tender Engines
0-6-0
0-6-2
0-6-4
2-6-0
2-6-2
2-6-4
4-6-0
4-6-2
4-6-4
8 Coupled Tank Engines
0-8-0T
0-8-2T
0-8-4T
2-8-0T
2-8-2T
8 Coupled Tender Engines
0-8-0
0-8-2
0-8-4
2-8-0
2-8-2
10 Coupled Tank Engines
0-10-0T
10 Coupled Tender Engines
0-10-0
2-10-0
Special
0-6-6-0T
2-6-6-2T
2-8-8-2T
Diesel
Shunters
Type 1
Type 2
Type 3
Type 4
Type 5
Electric
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Multiple Units
Steam Railmotors
GWR Railmotors
LNER Railmotors
LMS Railmotors
Diesel Multiple Units
GWR Railcars
LNER Railcars
1st Generation DMU's
2nd Generation DMU's
DEMU's
Pullman
HST
Electric Multiple Units
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Sites
Depots
Builders
Locomotive Works
Scrapyards
People
Chief Mechanical Engineers
Management
Miscellaneous
Companies
British Railways
GWR & Constituents
Taff Vale
Rhymney
Cambrian
Barry
Cardiff Railway
SR & Constituents
LSWR
LBSCR
SECR
LNER & Constituents
GER
GCR
GNR
MGNR
NER
NBR
GNSR
ex LMS
MR
LNWR
LYR
LTSR
S&DJR
G&SWR
CR
HR
Timelines
Line Closures
Workings
Events
News Stories
Miscellaneous
Reports
Wheel Arrangements
Background Images
On This Day ...
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.
?
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 483 Today
» 5387 Yesterday
» 29060 Week
» 89354 Month
» 549295 Year
» 4988732 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(
Free MySQL Counter
)
SR Maunsell "D1" Class 4-4-0
Summary
Gallery
Fleet
Alloc
Names
Cycle
Snap
Mods
Stats
Hist
Renumber
Day2Day
Preservation
Date
Event
Number
From
Depot From
To
Depot To
Usage
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1145
BAT
Stewarts Lane
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1246
DOV
Dover Marine
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1247
BAT
Stewarts Lane
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1470
DOV
Dover Marine
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1487
FAV
Faversham
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1489
FAV
Faversham
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1492
BAT
Stewarts Lane
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1494
BAT
Stewarts Lane
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1502
FAV
Faversham
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1505
FAV
Faversham
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1509
FAV
Faversham
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1545
DOV
Dover Marine
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1727
DOV
Dover Marine
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1735
DOV
Dover Marine
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1736
BAT
Stewarts Lane
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1739
FAV
Faversham
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1741
FAV
Faversham
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1743
BAT
Stewarts Lane
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1745
BAT
Stewarts Lane
01/01/1948
Reallocation
1749
BAT
Stewarts Lane
01/06/1948
Reallocation
1492
BAT
Stewarts Lane
GIL
Gillingham (Kent)
01/06/1948
Reallocation
1494
BAT
Stewarts Lane
GIL
Gillingham (Kent)
01/06/1948
Reallocation
1727
DOV
Dover Marine
FAV
Faversham
01/06/1948
Reallocation
1743
BAT
Stewarts Lane
TON
Tonbridge
01/06/1948
Reallocation
1745
BAT
Stewarts Lane
TON
Tonbridge
01/08/1948
Reallocation
31246
DOV
Dover Marine
BAT
Stewarts Lane
01/08/1948
Reallocation
1739
FAV
Faversham
BAT
Stewarts Lane
06/10/1948
Reallocation
1247
BAT
Stewarts Lane
DOV
Dover Marine
06/10/1948
Reallocation
1736
BAT
Stewarts Lane
DOV
Dover Marine
12/02/1949
Reallocation
31246
BAT
Stewarts Lane
TON
Tonbridge
03/05/1949
Reallocation
1735
DOV
Dover Marine
BAT
Stewarts Lane
28/05/1949
Reallocation
31487
FAV
Faversham
FAV
Faversham
28/05/1949
Reallocation
31509
FAV
Faversham
FAV
Faversham
28/05/1949
Reallocation
31749
BAT
Stewarts Lane
BAT
Stewarts Lane
30/06/1949
Reallocation
31743
TON
Tonbridge
BAT
Stewarts Lane
26/09/1949
Reallocation
1735
BAT
Stewarts Lane
DOV
Dover Marine
25/02/1950
Reallocation
31509
FAV
Faversham
74D
Tonbridge
08/12/1950
Reallocation
31741
FAV
Faversham
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
30/12/1950
Condemned
31736
DOV
Dover Marine
COND
05/02/1951
Reallocation
31145
BAT
Stewarts Lane
74C
Dover Marine
05/02/1951
Reallocation
31246
TON
Tonbridge
74C
Dover Marine
05/02/1951
Reallocation
31487
FAV
Faversham
73E
Faversham
05/02/1951
Reallocation
31492
GIL
Gillingham (Kent)
73E
Faversham
05/02/1951
Reallocation
31494
GIL
Gillingham (Kent)
73E
Faversham
05/02/1951
Reallocation
31545
DOV
Dover Marine
74D
Tonbridge
05/02/1951
Reallocation
31735
DOV
Dover Marine
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
05/02/1951
Reallocation
31741
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
73E
Faversham
05/02/1951
Reallocation
31745
TON
Tonbridge
73A
Stewarts Lane
03/1951
Condemned
31502
FAV
Faversham
COND
03/1951
Condemned
31745
73A
Stewarts Lane
COND
11/04/1951
Reallocation
31509
74D
Tonbridge
73E
Faversham
11/04/1951
Reallocation
31545
74D
Tonbridge
73E
Faversham
11/04/1951
Reallocation
31727
FAV
Faversham
74D
Tonbridge
11/04/1951
Reallocation
31735
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
74D
Tonbridge
13/04/1951
Reallocation
31509
73E
Faversham
73E
Faversham
13/04/1951
Reallocation
31545
73E
Faversham
73E
Faversham
13/04/1951
Reallocation
31727
74D
Tonbridge
74D
Tonbridge
12/05/1951
Reallocation
31739
BAT
Stewarts Lane
73B
Bricklayers Arms
12/05/1951
Reallocation
31741
73E
Faversham
73B
Bricklayers Arms
27/06/1951
Reallocation
31505
FAV
Faversham
74A
Ashford
27/06/1951
Reallocation
31735
74D
Tonbridge
74A
Ashford
06/10/1951
Reallocation
31739
73B
Bricklayers Arms
74D
Tonbridge
08/10/1951
Reallocation
31739
74D
Tonbridge
74D
Tonbridge
06/12/1951
Reallocation
31509
73E
Faversham
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
06/12/1951
Reallocation
31545
73E
Faversham
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
19/03/1952
Reallocation
31735
74A
Ashford
74A
Ashford
30/06/1952
Reallocation
31505
74A
Ashford
73E
Faversham
11/12/1952
Reallocation
31247
DOV
Dover Marine
73E
Faversham
11/12/1952
Reallocation
31727
74D
Tonbridge
73B
Bricklayers Arms
11/12/1952
Reallocation
31735
74A
Ashford
73B
Bricklayers Arms
11/12/1952
Reallocation
31739
74D
Tonbridge
73B
Bricklayers Arms
14/02/1953
Reallocation
31735
73B
Bricklayers Arms
75B
Redhill
14/02/1953
Reallocation
31739
73B
Bricklayers Arms
75B
Redhill
14/02/1953
Reallocation
31743
BAT
Stewarts Lane
73B
Bricklayers Arms
14/02/1953
Reallocation
31749
BAT
Stewarts Lane
75B
Redhill
26/05/1953
Reallocation
31509
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
73A
Stewarts Lane
26/05/1953
Reallocation
31545
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
73A
Stewarts Lane
20/07/1953
Reallocation
31505
73E
Faversham
73E
Faversham
20/07/1953
Reallocation
31509
73A
Stewarts Lane
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
20/07/1953
Reallocation
31545
73A
Stewarts Lane
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
20/07/1953
Reallocation
31735
75B
Redhill
73B
Bricklayers Arms
20/07/1953
Reallocation
31739
75B
Redhill
73B
Bricklayers Arms
20/07/1953
Reallocation
31743
73B
Bricklayers Arms
73A
Stewarts Lane
20/07/1953
Reallocation
31749
75B
Redhill
73A
Stewarts Lane
01/10/1953
Reallocation
31470
DOV
Dover Marine
73E
Faversham
18/06/1954
Reallocation
31505
73E
Faversham
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
21/06/1955
Reallocation
31505
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
73E
Faversham
21/06/1955
Reallocation
31509
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
73E
Faversham
21/06/1955
Reallocation
31545
73D
Gillingham (Kent)
73A
Stewarts Lane
10/10/1955
Reallocation
31246
74C
Dover Marine
74D
Tonbridge
10/10/1955
Reallocation
31505
73E
Faversham
74A
Ashford
01/11/1955
Reallocation
31505
74A
Ashford
73E
Faversham
19/12/1955
Reallocation
31470
73E
Faversham
74D
Tonbridge
19/12/1955
Reallocation
31487
73E
Faversham
74D
Tonbridge
19/12/1955
Reallocation
31489
FAV
Faversham
74D
Tonbridge
19/12/1955
Reallocation
31492
73E
Faversham
74D
Tonbridge
17/11/1956
Reallocation
31246
74D
Tonbridge
74A
Ashford
17/11/1956
Reallocation
31727
73B
Bricklayers Arms
74A
Ashford
17/12/1956
Reallocation
31145
74C
Dover Marine
70C
Guildford
17/12/1956
Reallocation
31247
73E
Faversham
70C
Guildford
24/02/1958
Reallocation
31145
70C
Guildford
73B
Bricklayers Arms
24/02/1958
Reallocation
31247
70C
Guildford
73B
Bricklayers Arms
13/10/1958
Reallocation
31145
73B
Bricklayers Arms
73A
Stewarts Lane
06/1959
Condemned
31470
74D
Tonbridge
COND
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31145
73A
Stewarts Lane
70A
Nine Elms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31246
74A
Ashford
70A
Nine Elms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31247
73B
Bricklayers Arms
70A
Nine Elms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31494
73E
Faversham
70A
Nine Elms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31505
73E
Faversham
70A
Nine Elms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31509
73E
Faversham
70A
Nine Elms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31545
73A
Stewarts Lane
70A
Nine Elms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31727
74A
Ashford
70A
Nine Elms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31735
73B
Bricklayers Arms
70A
Nine Elms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31743
73A
Stewarts Lane
73B
Bricklayers Arms
14/06/1959
Reallocation
31749
73A
Stewarts Lane
73B
Bricklayers Arms
19/08/1959
Reallocation
31735
70A
Nine Elms
71A
Eastleigh
09/1959
Condemned
31741
73B
Bricklayers Arms
COND
23/01/1960
Condemned
31492
74D
Tonbridge
COND
02/1960
Condemned
31743
73B
Bricklayers Arms
COND
07/05/1960
Condemned
31509
70A
Nine Elms
COND
08/07/1960
Reallocation
31487
74D
Tonbridge
73B
Bricklayers Arms
08/07/1960
Reallocation
31489
74D
Tonbridge
73B
Bricklayers Arms
08/1960
Condemned
31494
70A
Nine Elms
COND
25/02/1961
Condemned
31487
73B
Bricklayers Arms
COND
11/03/1961
Condemned
31246
70A
Nine Elms
COND
11/03/1961
Condemned
31545
70A
Nine Elms
COND
11/03/1961
Condemned
31727
70A
Nine Elms
COND
22/04/1961
Condemned
31735
71A
Eastleigh
COND
22/07/1961
Condemned
31247
70A
Nine Elms
COND
30/09/1961
Condemned
31505
70A
Nine Elms
COND
21/10/1961
Condemned
31145
70A
Nine Elms
COND
11/11/1961
Condemned
31489
73B
Bricklayers Arms
COND
11/11/1961
Condemned
31739
73B
Bricklayers Arms
COND
11/11/1961
Condemned
31749
73B
Bricklayers Arms
COND