Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 3667 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13961 Week
» 149366 Month
» 609307 Year
» 5048744 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)

SR Maunsell "E1A" Class 4-4-0


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
E1A 1019 31019 07/1908 BAT
70A
72B
72B
73A
W
Stewarts Lane
Nine Elms
Salisbury
Salisbury
Stewarts Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1959
18/07/1959
05/04/1960
06/05/1960
29/04/1961
29/04/1961
E1A 1067 31067 08/1908 BAT
BAT
70A
72B
72B
73A
W
Stewarts Lane
Stewarts Lane
Nine Elms
Salisbury
Salisbury
Stewarts Lane
Withdrawn
12/1935
01/01/1948
14/06/1959
18/07/1959
05/04/1960
06/05/1960
11/11/1961
11/11/1961
E1A 1160 31160 07/1907 BAT
BA
W
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/08/1948
02/1951
02/1951
E1A 1163 31163 04/1909 BAT
BA
W
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/08/1948
05/1949
05/1949
E1A 1165 31165 12/1907 BAT
BA
73A
73B
73A
73B
W
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/08/1948
20/05/1950
05/02/1951
14/02/1953
26/05/1953
02/05/1959
02/05/1959
E1A 1179 31179 11/1908 BA
BAT
BA
W
74A
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
Ashford
12/1935
01/01/1948
01/08/1948
10/1950
08/12/1950
10/1950
E1A 1497 31497 09/1907 BAT
BA
73B
73A
73B
70A
72B
72B
73B
W
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Bricklayers Arms (Re-instd)
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Nine Elms
Salisbury
Salisbury
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1949
17/06/1950
08/12/1950
05/02/1951
14/06/1959
18/07/1959
05/04/1960
06/05/1960
22/10/1960
22/10/1960
E1A 1504 31504 12/1905 BAT
BAT
BAT
W
Stewarts Lane
Stewarts Lane
Stewarts Lane
Withdrawn
12/1935
01/01/1948
28/05/1949
15/02/1958
15/02/1958
E1A 1506 31506 12/1905 BAT
W
Stewarts Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1958
09/1958
E1A 1507 31507 09/1908 BAT
BA
70A
72B
72B
73B
W
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Nine Elms
Salisbury
Salisbury
Bricklayers Arms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/05/1949
14/06/1959
18/07/1959
05/04/1960
06/05/1960
22/07/1961
22/07/1961
E1A 1511 31511 12/1905 BAT
BA
74A
W
Stewarts Lane
Bricklayers Arms
Ashford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1949
08/12/1950
30/12/1950
30/12/1950