Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 101 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3614 Week
» 23907 Month
» 201811 Year
» 1867187 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "E1A" Class 4-4-0


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1019 31019 07/1908 29/04/1961 52.75 52.95
1067 31067 08/1908 11/11/1961 53.25 53.37
1160 31160 07/1907 02/1951 43.58 43.78
1163 31163 04/1909 05/1949 40.08
1165 31165 12/1907 02/05/1959 51.42 51.45
1179 31179 11/1908 10/1950 41.92 42.36
1497 31497 09/1907 22/10/1960 53.08 53.21
1504 31504 12/1905 15/02/1958 52.17 52.28
1506 31506 12/1905 09/1958 52.75 52.87
1507 31507 09/1908 22/07/1961 52.83 52.95
1511 31511 12/1905 30/12/1950 45 45.20