SR Wainwright "E" Class 4-4-0
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
E | 1036 | 31036 | 12/1908 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/03/1951 |
10/03/1951 |
E | 1157 | 31157 | 12/1907 | HOR HOR BA 73E W |
Horsham Horsham Bricklayers Arms Faversham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 06/10/1948 22/04/1950 03/1951 |
03/1951 |
E | 1159 | 31159 | 11/1908 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1951 |
12/1951 |
E | 1166 | 31166 | 07/1907 | BA 73E 74D W |
Bricklayers Arms Faversham Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1952 29/10/1953 21/05/1955 |
21/05/1955 |
E | 1175 | 31175 | 08/1908 | BA BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 10/1951 |
10/1951 |
E | 1176 | 31176 | 12/1907 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1951 |
10/1951 |
E | 1273 | 31273 | 02/1906 | HOR HOR RED BA FAV W |
Horsham Horsham Redhill Bricklayers Arms Faversham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 01/06/1948 13/11/1948 30/06/1949 12/1951 |
12/1951 |
E | 1275 | 31275 | 02/1906 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1951 |
03/1951 |
E | 1315 | 31315 | 04/1909 | BA 73E W |
Bricklayers Arms Faversham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1952 20/03/1954 |
20/03/1954 |
E | 1491 | 31491 | 07/1907 | BA 70E 75B 73B W |
Bricklayers Arms Reading (S.R.) Redhill Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 06/12/1951 11/12/1952 02/1953 |
02/1953 |
E | 1514 | 31514 | 12/1907 | BAT BA W |
Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 12/1951 |
12/1951 |
E | 1515 | 31515 | 09/1907 | BAT RDG W |
Stewarts Lane Reading (S.R.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 21/07/1951 |
21/07/1951 |
E | 1516 | 31516 | 04/1908 | BAT BA AFD GIL 74A W |
Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Ashford Gillingham (Kent) Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 28/05/1949 04/02/1950 05/02/1951 06/10/1951 |
06/10/1951 |
E | 1547 | 31547 | 09/1908 | BA BA BA 74A W |
Bricklayers Arms Bricklayers Arms Bricklayers Arms Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/08/1948 04/02/1950 08/12/1950 02/1951 |
02/1951 |
E | 1587 | 31587 | 02/1907 | RED RED HIT W |
Redhill Redhill Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1948 03/05/1949 28/07/1951 |
28/07/1951 |