SR Wainwright "F1" Class 4-4-0
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jumbos | 1002 | 31002 | 11/1886 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1948 |
06/1948 |
Jumbos | 1028 | 31028 | 12/1889 | HIT RDG W |
Hither Green Reading (S.R.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 05/1948 |
05/1948 |
Jumbos | 1031 | 31031 | 09/1894 | HIT RDG W |
Hither Green Reading (S.R.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 05/1948 |
05/1948 |
Jumbos | 1042 | 31042 | 03/1896 | RDG W |
Reading (S.R.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1948 |
02/1948 |
Jumbos | 1078 | 31078 | 12/1886 | RDG W |
Reading (S.R.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
Jumbos | 1105 | 31105 | 03/1896 | GIL RDG W |
Gillingham (Kent) Reading (S.R.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
Jumbos | 1151 | 31151 | 10/1899 | RAM RDG W |
Ramsgate Reading (S.R.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 12/03/1949 |
12/03/1949 |
Jumbos | 1215 | 31215 | 10/1891 | GIL W |
Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1948 |
05/1948 |
Jumbos | 1231 | 31231 | 10/1893 | FAV RDG W |
Faversham Reading (S.R.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |