SR Bulleid "WCBB" Class 4-6-2
Class | SR | BR | BR (TOPS) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebuilt | 21C101 | 34001 | 06/1945 | EXJ 73B 73A 70A 70D 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1957 10/02/1961 26/05/1961 14/09/1964 18/01/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C102 | 34002 | 06/1945 | EXJ 70D 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/09/1964 18/01/1965 02/04/1967 |
02/04/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C103 | 34003 | 06/1945 | EXJ 72A 72D 72D 72A 72A 73B 72B W |
Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Bricklayers Arms Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/05/1950 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 09/09/1950 09/10/1950 08/10/1957 10/02/1961 20/09/1964 |
20/09/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 21C104 | 34004 | 06/1945 | EXJ 73B 73A 71A 70F W |
Exmouth Junction Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1958 10/02/1961 26/05/1961 10/10/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C105 | 34005 | 07/1945 | EXJ 70A 70A 73A 73B 72B 70F W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Salisbury Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 12/06/1957 14/01/1958 10/02/1961 10/10/1965 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C106 | 34006 | 08/1945 | EXJ 70A 70A 70E W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 14/09/1964 19/03/1967 |
19/03/1967 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C107 | 34007 | 08/1945 | EXJ 70A 70A 70E W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 14/09/1964 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 | |
Rebuilt | 21C108 | 34008 | 09/1945 | EXJ 70A 70A 75A 71A 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Brighton Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 13/10/1958 24/09/1962 27/06/1966 25/06/1967 |
25/06/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C109 | 34009 | 15/09/1945 | EXJ 70A 70A 70D 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 14/09/1964 27/06/1966 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 | |
Rebuilt | 21C110 | 34010 | 09/1945 | EXJ 70A 70A 70D W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 14/09/1964 07/03/1965 |
07/03/1965 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C111 | 34011 | 10/1945 | EXJ PLY 70A 70A 72A W |
Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Nine Elms Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 11/03/1959 30/11/1963 |
30/11/1963 | |
Rebuilt | 21C112 | 34012 | 10/1945 | EXJ PLY 72A 72B 72A 70A 70A 73B 75A 70E 70F W |
Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Bricklayers Arms Brighton Salisbury Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 20/03/1951 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 24/02/1958 02/07/1962 16/09/1963 10/10/1965 11/12/1966 |
11/12/1966 | |
Rebuilt | 21C113 | 34013 | 10/1945 | EXJ PLY 72A 73B 75A 70E W |
Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Bricklayers Arms Brighton Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 12/05/1951 08/10/1957 02/07/1962 16/09/1963 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C114 | 34014 | 11/1945 | EXJ 73B 75A 70E W |
Exmouth Junction Bricklayers Arms Brighton Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1958 02/07/1962 16/09/1963 21/03/1965 |
21/03/1965 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C115 | 34015 | 11/1945 | EXJ 72B 72A 72A 70E W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/02/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 06/09/1964 16/04/1967 |
16/04/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C116 | 34016 | 11/1945 | EXJ 74B 73B 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1958 14/06/1959 26/05/1961 14/06/1964 |
14/06/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 21C117 | 34017 | 12/1945 | EXJ 73A 73B 74B 73B 70A 70D 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1954 08/10/1957 24/02/1958 14/06/1959 17/01/1961 06/01/1964 27/06/1966 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 | |
Rebuilt | 21C118 | 34018 | 12/1945 | EXJ 70A 70A 70D 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 06/01/1964 27/06/1966 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C119 | 34019 | 12/1945 | EXJ ELH EXJ 70A 70A 75A 70E 70B 70D 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Brighton Salisbury Feltham Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 06/10/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 13/10/1958 16/09/1963 14/09/1964 20/11/1964 27/06/1966 19/03/1967 |
19/03/1967 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C120 | 34020 | 12/1945 | EXJ 70A 70A 72A W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 28/05/1962 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 21C121 | 34021 | 01/1946 | EXJ PLY 72A 72A 72A 74B 73B 71B 71A 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Bournemouth Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 14/01/1958 14/06/1959 10/02/1961 24/09/1962 18/01/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C122 | 34022 | 01/1946 | 9E SAL 72A 74B 73B 71A W |
Nine Elms Salisbury Exmouth Junction Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 12/05/1951 14/01/1958 14/06/1959 26/05/1961 25/04/1965 |
25/04/1965 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C123 | 34023 | 02/1946 | 9E SAL 72A 70D 70A W |
Nine Elms Salisbury Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 12/05/1951 06/09/1964 15/05/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C124 | 34024 | 02/1946 | EXJ SAL EXJ 70F W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/08/1949 26/09/1949 03/11/1963 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C125 | 34025 | 03/1946 | EXJ 73B 74B 73B 71A 70F W |
Exmouth Junction Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1957 24/02/1958 14/06/1959 26/05/1961 10/10/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C126 | 34026 | 04/1946 | EXJ 74B 73B 72B W |
Exmouth Junction Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1958 14/06/1959 24/11/1960 18/09/1966 |
18/09/1966 | |
Rebuilt | 21C127 | 34027 | 04/1946 | EXJ 73B 74B 73B 75A 70E W |
Exmouth Junction Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Brighton Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1957 24/02/1958 14/06/1959 26/05/1961 16/09/1963 09/08/1964 |
09/08/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 21C128 | 34028 | 04/1946 | EXJ 72B 72A 72A 71B 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/02/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 11/03/1959 24/09/1962 31/05/1964 |
31/05/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 21C129 | 34029 | 05/1946 | EXJ 70A 71B W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/03/1959 14/06/1959 13/09/1964 |
13/09/1964 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C130 | 34030 | 05/1946 | RAM BAT EXJ W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 06/10/1948 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 21C131 | 34031 | 06/1946 | RAM BAT EXJ 70A 70A 72A 72A 72A 72A 70A 70D W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 12/12/1949 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 12/05/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 11/03/1959 14/09/1964 07/02/1965 |
07/02/1965 | |
Rebuilt | 21C132 | 34032 | 06/1946 | RAM BAT SAL 72A 72B 72B 72D 72A 70E W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Salisbury Exmouth Junction Salisbury Salisbury Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 08/01/1949 22/04/1950 09/09/1950 09/10/1950 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 03/11/1963 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C133 | 34033 | 06/1946 | BAT BTN BAT BTN EXJ 72B 73A 73A 72A 72D 72D 72A 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Brighton Stewarts Lane Brighton Exmouth Junction Salisbury Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 08/01/1949 12/12/1949 31/12/1949 22/04/1950 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 12/05/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 06/12/1951 06/09/1964 19/12/1965 |
19/12/1965 | |
Rebuilt | 21C134 | 34034 | 07/1946 | BAT BTN SAL 73A 72A 73A 72A 72D 72D 72A 71A 70A W |
Stewarts Lane Brighton Salisbury Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 13/11/1948 09/09/1950 07/10/1950 09/10/1950 31/10/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 19/03/1952 09/11/1961 27/06/1966 02/07/1967 |
02/07/1967 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C135 | 34035 | 07/1946 | BAT BTN BTN 72B 72B 73A 75A 73A 75A 72D 72D 72D 72A W |
Stewarts Lane Brighton Brighton Salisbury Salisbury Stewarts Lane Brighton Stewarts Lane Brighton Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1948 04/02/1950 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 09/09/1950 07/10/1950 09/10/1950 31/10/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 14/01/1958 01/06/1963 |
08/06/1963 | |
Rebuilt | 21C136 | 34036 | 07/1946 | BAT ELH BTN ELH BTN 72D 72D 72D 72A 70E 70D 70A W |
Stewarts Lane Eastleigh Brighton Eastleigh Brighton Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Salisbury Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 06/10/1948 13/11/1948 04/02/1950 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 14/01/1958 03/11/1963 14/09/1964 27/06/1966 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C137 | 34037 | 08/1946 | BAT BTN 75A 72D 72A 74B 73B 71B 71A 70A 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Brighton Brighton Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Bournemouth Eastleigh Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 05/02/1951 12/05/1951 14/01/1958 24/02/1958 14/06/1959 10/02/1961 24/09/1962 27/06/1966 15/05/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C138 | 34038 | 09/1946 | BAT BTN 75A 72D 72A 75A 71A 70A W |
Stewarts Lane Brighton Brighton Plymouth Friary Exmouth Junction Brighton Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 05/02/1951 12/05/1951 14/01/1958 24/11/1960 09/11/1961 18/01/1965 12/06/1966 |
12/06/1966 | |
Rebuilt | 21C139 | 34039 | 09/1946 | BAT BTN 30A 75A 71B 71A W |
Stewarts Lane Brighton Stratford Brighton Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 19/05/1951 30/06/1952 11/03/1959 24/09/1962 09/05/1965 |
09/05/1965 | |
Rebuilt | 21C140 | 34040 | 09/1946 | BAT BTN 71G 71B 71G 71A 71B W |
Stewarts Lane Brighton Bath Green Park (S&D) Bournemouth Bath Green Park (S&D) Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 30/06/1952 06/11/1954 15/06/1956 02/07/1967 |
02/07/1967 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C141 | 34041 | 09/1946 | EXJ BTN 71G 71B 71G 71A 71B 70D W |
Exmouth Junction Brighton Bath Green Park (S&D) Bournemouth Bath Green Park (S&D) Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 06/12/1951 06/11/1954 15/06/1956 14/09/1964 23/01/1966 |
23/01/1966 | |
Rebuilt | 21C142 | 34042 | 10/1946 | EXJ SAL 71G 71B 71G 71A 71B 70D W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Bath Green Park (S&D) Bournemouth Bath Green Park (S&D) Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 06/12/1951 06/11/1954 15/06/1956 14/09/1964 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C143 | 34043 | 10/1946 | EXJ SAL 71G 71B W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Bath Green Park (S&D) Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 12/05/1951 30/06/1952 29/06/1963 |
08/06/1963 | |
Rebuilt | 21C144 | 34044 | 10/1946 | EXJ 71G 71B W |
Exmouth Junction Bath Green Park (S&D) Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 06/12/1951 21/05/1967 |
21/05/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C145 | 34045 | 10/1946 | EXJ 72B 75A 70A 71B W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Brighton Nine Elms Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 13/10/1958 11/03/1959 28/06/1964 |
28/06/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 21C146 | 34046 | 11/1946 | EXJ 72B 75A 71B W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Brighton Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 11/03/1959 10/10/1965 |
10/10/1965 | |
Rebuilt | 21C147 | 34047 | 11/1946 | EXJ SAL EXJ 72B 75A 70A 71B W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Salisbury Brighton Nine Elms Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 01/04/1948 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 13/10/1958 14/06/1959 25/06/1967 |
25/06/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C148 | 34048 | 11/1946 | SAL EXJ 72B 72B 75A 71B 72B W |
Salisbury Exmouth Junction Salisbury Salisbury Brighton Bournemouth Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 05/02/1951 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 11/03/1959 10/03/1960 13/03/1966 |
13/03/1966 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C149 | 34049 | 12/1946 | SAL 9E 72A 72A 72B W |
Salisbury Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 12/05/1951 12/1963 |
07/12/1963 | |
Rebuilt | 21C150 | 34050 | 12/1946 | SAL 9E 72A 72A 72B 73B 70A 70D W |
Salisbury Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Bricklayers Arms Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 24/11/1960 09/11/1961 14/09/1964 29/08/1965 |
29/08/1965 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C151 | 34051 | 12/1946 | SAL 9E 72A 72A 72B W |
Salisbury Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 10/1965 |
10/1965 | |
Rebuilt | 21C152 | 34052 | 12/1946 | SAL 9E 72A 72A 72B W |
Salisbury Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C153 | 34053 | 01/1947 | SAL BAT 9E 72A 72A 72B 71B W |
Salisbury Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 04/02/1950 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 27/06/1951 10/03/1960 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C154 | 34054 | 01/1947 | BAT 9E 72A 72A 72B 83D W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 30/06/1952 03/11/1963 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C155 | 34055 | 02/1947 | BAT BAT SAL 9E 72A 72A 72B 75A W |
Stewarts Lane Stewarts Lane Salisbury Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/08/1949 26/09/1949 04/02/1950 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 30/06/1952 10/03/1960 09/1963 |
22/06/1963 | |
Rebuilt | 21C156 | 34056 | 02/1947 | DOV BAT 9E 72A 72A 72B 72A 70E W |
Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1949 12/12/1949 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 06/11/1954 11/12/1954 03/11/1963 07/05/1967 |
07/05/1967 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C157 | 34057 | 03/1947 | DOV BAT 9E 72A 72A 30A SR SR 72A 72B 72A 75A 70E W |
Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Stratford To Southern Region To Southern Region Exmouth Junction Salisbury Exmouth Junction Brighton Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 12/12/1949 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 19/05/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 30/06/1952 06/11/1954 11/12/1954 24/11/1960 16/09/1963 07/05/1967 |
07/05/1967 | |
Rebuilt | 21C158 | 34058 | 03/1947 | 9E BAT 9E 72A 72A 70D W |
Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/08/1949 26/09/1949 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 03/11/1963 11/10/1964 |
11/10/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 21C159 | 34059 | 04/1947 | 9E 72A 72A 72B W |
Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 10/10/1955 29/05/1966 |
29/05/1966 | |
Rebuilt | 21C160 | 34060 | 04/1947 | 9E 72A 70A 70D W |
Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 03/11/1963 14/09/1964 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C161 | 34061 | 04/1947 | 9E 72A 73H 73F 71A 83D 70D W |
Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Dover Marine Ashford Eastleigh Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 24/11/1960 26/05/1961 09/11/1961 03/11/1963 14/06/1964 16/08/1964 |
16/08/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 21C162 | 34062 | 05/1947 | RAM 70A 72A W |
Ramsgate Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 27/06/1951 08/1964 |
13/07/1964 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C163 | 34063 | 05/1947 | RAM BAT 70A 72A 75A 70E W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Brighton Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 22/04/1950 11/03/1959 27/05/1963 16/09/1963 15/08/1965 |
15/08/1965 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C164 | 34064 | 07/1947 | 9E BAT 70A 72A 70A 70D 70E W |
Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Eastleigh Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 22/04/1950 14/06/1959 28/05/1962 06/01/1964 25/10/1965 22/05/1966 |
22/05/1966 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C165 | 34065 | 07/1947 | RAM BAT 70A 30A SR SR 70A 73A 70A 72A W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Stratford To Southern Region To Southern Region Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 22/04/1950 19/05/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 30/06/1952 18/06/1954 21/06/1955 14/06/1959 13/04/1964 |
08/04/1964 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C166 | 34066 | 09/1947 | RAM BAT 72A 70E W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1949 10/02/1961 06/09/1964 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C167 | 34067 | 97067 | 09/1947 | RAM BAT 72B W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1949 26/05/1961 16/11/1963 |
16/11/1963 |
Air Smoothed | 21C168 | 34068 | 10/1947 | RAM BAT 72B W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1949 26/05/1961 12/1963 |
07/12/1963 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C169 | 34069 | 10/1947 | RAM BAT 72A W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1949 19/03/1954 30/11/1963 |
23/11/1963 | |
Air Smoothed | 21C170 | 34070 | 11/1947 | RAM BAT 74C 73F 72A W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Ashford Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1949 21/06/1955 26/05/1961 09/11/1961 10/08/1964 |
10/08/1964 | |
Rebuilt | 34071 | 04/1948 | BAT 74C 70A 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
12/12/1949 21/06/1955 17/01/1961 14/09/1964 30/04/1967 |
30/04/1967 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34072 | 04/1948 | 72A 70D W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
24/02/1958 14/06/1964 25/10/1964 |
25/10/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34073 | 05/1948 | DOV 70A 70D W |
Dover Marine Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
08/01/1949 26/05/1961 06/01/1964 28/06/1964 |
28/06/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34074 | 05/1948 | BAT 74C 73A 74C 73A 74C 72A W |
Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/08/1948 09/09/1950 07/10/1950 09/10/1950 31/10/1950 05/02/1951 24/02/1958 01/06/1963 |
15/06/1963 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34075 | 06/1948 | BAT 74C 73A 74C 73A 74C 74B 72A W |
Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Ramsgate Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/08/1948 09/09/1950 07/10/1950 09/10/1950 31/10/1950 05/02/1951 30/06/1952 08/10/1957 13/04/1964 |
08/04/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34076 | 06/1948 | BAT 74B SR 74B 72A 70D 70E W |
Stewarts Lane Ramsgate To Southern Region Ramsgate Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/08/1948 12/05/1951 19/04/1952 30/06/1952 08/10/1957 06/09/1964 25/10/1965 09/01/1966 |
09/01/1966 | ||
Rebuilt | 34077 | 07/1948 | BAT RAM 73A 70A 70B 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
08/01/1949 12/12/1949 14/01/1958 26/05/1961 14/09/1964 20/11/1964 26/03/1967 |
26/03/1967 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34078 | 07/1948 | 73B 72A W |
Bricklayers Arms Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
14/06/1959 10/02/1961 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34079 | 07/1948 | 72A 70D W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
24/02/1958 06/09/1964 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34080 | 08/1948 | W | Withdrawn | 14/09/1964 | 07/09/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34081 | 09/1948 | 72A 70D W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
08/10/1957 14/06/1964 16/08/1964 |
16/08/1964 | ||
Rebuilt | 34082 | 09/1948 | 73A 74C 70A 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
14/01/1958 22/03/1958 26/05/1961 14/09/1964 24/04/1966 |
24/04/1966 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34083 | 10/1948 | 74B 74C 73F 72A W |
Ramsgate Dover Marine Ashford Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
12/05/1951 24/02/1958 26/05/1961 09/11/1961 08/1964 |
13/07/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34084 | 11/1948 | 74B 73A 74C 72A 71B 83D 70D W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Dover Marine Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
12/05/1951 24/02/1958 22/03/1958 24/11/1960 27/05/1963 03/11/1963 06/09/1964 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | ||
Rebuilt | 34085 | 11/1948 | 74B 74C 73A 71B W |
Ramsgate Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Bournemouth Withdrawn |
12/05/1951 24/02/1958 22/03/1958 17/01/1961 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34086 | 12/1948 | 72A 74C 73A 72A 70D W |
Exmouth Junction Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
08/10/1957 24/02/1958 22/03/1958 26/05/1961 06/09/1964 19/06/1966 |
19/06/1966 | ||
Rebuilt | 34087 | 12/1948 | 73A 70A 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
12/05/1951 26/05/1961 14/09/1964 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | ||
Rebuilt | 34088 | 12/1948 | 73A 70A 75A 70A 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Brighton Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
12/05/1951 26/05/1961 24/06/1963 22/07/1963 14/09/1964 19/03/1967 |
19/03/1967 | ||
Rebuilt | 34089 | 12/1948 | 73A 30A 73A 70E W |
Stewarts Lane Stratford Stewarts Lane Salisbury Withdrawn |
12/05/1951 16/02/1952 30/06/1952 16/09/1963 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | ||
Rebuilt | 34090 | 02/1949 | 73A 70A 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
12/05/1951 12/06/1957 14/09/1964 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34091 | 09/1949 | 72B W |
Salisbury Withdrawn |
26/05/1961 20/09/1964 |
20/09/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34092 | 09/1949 | 72B W |
Salisbury Withdrawn |
26/05/1961 29/11/1964 |
29/11/1964 | ||
Rebuilt | 34093 | 10/1949 | BM 70A 70D W |
Bournemouth Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
10/1949 06/06/1958 14/09/1964 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34094 | 10/1949 | BM 70A W |
Bournemouth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
10/1949 24/02/1958 30/08/1964 |
30/08/1964 | ||
Rebuilt | 34095 | 10/1949 | RAM BM BM 70A 70D W |
Ramsgate Bournemouth Bournemouth Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
10/1949 10/1949 12/12/1949 27/01/1956 14/09/1964 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | ||
Rebuilt | 34096 | 11/1949 | RAM W |
Ramsgate Withdrawn |
11/1949 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | ||
Rebuilt | 34097 | 11/1949 | RAM 71B 75A 72A 71A W |
Ramsgate Bournemouth Brighton Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
11/1949 24/02/1958 11/03/1959 24/11/1960 28/05/1962 10/04/1966 |
10/04/1966 | ||
Rebuilt | 34098 | 12/1949 | RAM 71B 75A 72A 71A W |
Ramsgate Bournemouth Brighton Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
12/1949 24/02/1958 11/03/1959 24/11/1960 28/05/1962 25/06/1967 |
25/06/1967 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34099 | 12/1949 | RAM 72B 74B 71B 75A 72B W |
Ramsgate Salisbury Ramsgate Bournemouth Brighton Salisbury Withdrawn |
12/1949 11/12/1952 08/01/1953 24/02/1958 11/03/1959 10/03/1960 08/11/1964 |
08/11/1964 | ||
Rebuilt | 34100 | 12/1949 | RAM 73A 74B 73A 70E W |
Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Ramsgate Stewarts Lane Salisbury Withdrawn |
12/1949 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 24/02/1958 16/09/1963 02/07/1967 |
02/07/1967 | ||
Rebuilt | 34101 | 02/1950 | 73B 75A 70A 70D W |
Bricklayers Arms Brighton Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
26/05/1961 02/07/1962 24/06/1963 14/09/1964 17/07/1966 |
17/07/1966 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34102 | 03/1950 | 71B 70D W |
Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
24/02/1958 14/09/1964 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34103 | 02/1950 | 74C 71B 70D W |
Dover Marine Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
17/11/1956 17/01/1961 14/09/1964 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 | ||
Rebuilt | 34104 | 04/1950 | 74C 72A 71A W |
Dover Marine Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
17/11/1956 24/02/1958 09/11/1961 25/06/1967 |
25/06/1967 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34105 | 03/1950 | 70D W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
14/09/1964 04/10/1964 |
04/10/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34106 | 03/1950 | 72A W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
24/02/1958 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34107 | 04/1950 | 72A W |
Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
14/06/1959 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | ||
Rebuilt | 34108 | 04/1950 | 72A 70E W |
Exmouth Junction Salisbury Withdrawn |
24/02/1958 03/11/1963 25/06/1967 |
25/06/1967 | ||
Rebuilt | 34109 | 05/1950 | 72A 72A W |
Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
24/02/1958 23/08/1961 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | ||
Air Smoothed | 34110 | 01/1951 | 71B 72A W |
Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/1951 11/03/1959 30/11/1963 |
16/11/1963 |