Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 86 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5561 Week
» 5561 Month
» 72423 Year
» 1737799 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

143


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
56094 18/05/1957 64A St Margarets (New) 18/05/1957
56095 18/05/1957 64A St Margarets (New) 18/05/1957
56096 04/06/1957 64A St Margarets (New) 04/06/1957
56097
56098
56099
56100
56101
56102
56103
56104
56105
56106
56107
56108
56109
56110
56111
56112
56113
56300
56301
56302
56303
56304 20/03/1966
56305 W Withdrawn 29/11/1966 29/11/1966
56306      
56307      
56308      
56309      
56310      
56311      
56312      
56313      
56314      
56315       11/10/1973
56316      
56317       11/10/1973
56318      
56319