Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1075 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 2144 Week
» 2144 Month
» 69006 Year
» 1734382 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

143


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
18/05/1957 To Service 56094   NEW 64A St Margarets
18/05/1957 To Service 56095   NEW 64A St Margarets
04/06/1957 To Service 56096   NEW 64A St Margarets
20/03/1966 Condemned 56304       COND
29/11/1966 Condemned 56305       COND
11/10/1973 Condemned 56315       COND
11/10/1973 Condemned 56317       COND