Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 625 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 625 Week
» 8237 Month
» 75099 Year
» 1740475 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

143


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
56094 18/05/1957 St Margarets 63.85
56095 18/05/1957 St Margarets 63.85
56096 04/06/1957 St Margarets 63.80
56097
56098
56099
56100
56101
56102
56103
56104
56105
56106
56107
56108
56109
56110
56111
56112
56113
56300
56301
56302
56303
56304 20/03/1966
56305 29/11/1966
56306
56307
56308
56309
56310
56311
56312
56313
56314
56315 11/10/1973 Norwich Thorpe
56316
56317 11/10/1973 Norwich Thorpe
56318
56319