45 1Co-Co1
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (45/1) | BR (45/0) | BR (Dept) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D11 | 45122 | 01/10/1960 | DE | Camden | 27/04/1987 | 26.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 11/02/1994 | 33.39 | ||||
D18 | 45121 | 31/12/1960 | DE | Derby | 19/11/1987 | 26.92 | Cut | Thomas Hill Ltd (Derby Litchurch Lane Works) | 13/09/1993 | 32.72 | ||||
D22 | 45132 | 30/03/1961 | DE | Derby | 11/05/1987 | 26.17 | Prs | Preserved | 62.84 | |||||
D28 | 45124 | 04/05/1961 | DE | Derby | 22/01/1988 | 26.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 14/02/1992 | 30.80 | ||||
D32 | 45126 | 12/06/1961 | DE | Derby | 27/04/1987 | 25.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 18/06/1992 | 31.04 | ||||
D34 | 45119 | 29/06/1961 | DE | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 12/04/1994 | 32.81 | ||||
D35 | 45117 | 30/06/1961 | DE | Derby | 12/05/1986 | 24.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 03/1987 | 25.72 | ||||
D40 | 45133 | 26/07/1961 | DE | Derby | 10/05/1987 | 25.83 | Prs | Preserved | 29.25 | |||||
D41 | 45147 | 29/07/1961 | DE | Derby | 04/01/1985 | 23.5 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Patricroft) | 03/1985 | 23.64 | ||||
D43 | 45107 | 28/08/1961 | DE | Cricklewood East | 27/07/1988 | 26.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 21/03/1990 | 28.58 | ||||
D47 | 45116 | 30/09/1961 | DE | Cricklewood East | 22/12/1986 | 25.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/1988 | 26.98 | ||||
D51 | 45102 | 05/06/1962 | CW | Derby | 09/09/1986 | 24.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 10/1988 | 26.38 | ||||
D52 | 45123 | 07/06/1962 | CW | Derby | 22/07/1987 | 25.08 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 26.19 | ||||
D55 | 45144 | 10/09/1962 | CW | Derby | 21/12/1987 | 25.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 07/1988 | 25.86 | ROYAL SIGNALS | |||
D56 | 45137 | 23/11/1962 | CW | Cricklewood East | 15/06/1987 | 24.58 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/1994 | 31.33 | ||||
D59 | 45104 | 06/02/1962 | CW | Derby | 13/04/1988 | 26.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 17/02/1992 | 30.05 | ||||
D61 | 45112 | 08/03/1962 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.17 | Prs | Preserved | 61.90 | ROYAL ARMY ORDNANCE CORPS | ||||
D62 | 45143 | 15/03/1962 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 13/03/1994 | 32.02 | 5TH ROYAL INNISKILLING DRAGOON GUARDS | |||
D65 | 45111 | 13/04/1962 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 08/07/1992 | 30.26 | GRENADIER GUARDSMAN | |||
D66 | 45146 | 17/04/1962 | CW | Derby | 07/04/1987 | 25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 05/05/1992 | 30.07 | ||||
D67 | 45118 | 03/05/1962 | CW | Derby | 08/05/1987 | 25 | Prs | Preserved | 61.74 | ROYAL ARTILLERYMAN | ||||
D73 | 45110 | 25/11/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 27/07/1988 | 27.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 13/06/1990 | 29.57 | ||||
D77 | 45004 | 10/12/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 08/12/1985 | 25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 21/12/1988 | 28.05 | ROYAL IRISH FUSILIER | |||
D78 | 45150 | 45054 | 12/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 04/02/1988 | 27.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 16/12/1991 | 31.03 | |||
D80 | 45113 | 17/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 02/08/1988 | 27.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 28/03/1990 | 29.30 | ||||
D81 | 45115 | 21/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 13/06/1988 | 27.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 16/06/1990 | 29.50 | ||||
D82 | 45141 | 31/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 04/08/1988 | 27.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/1992 | 31.22 | ||||
D83 | 45142 | 31/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 18/06/1987 | 26.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 06/03/1994 | 33.20 | ||||
D85 | 45109 | 06/02/1961 | CW | Derby | 27/01/1986 | 24.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 30/11/1986 | 25.83 | ||||
D86 | 45105 | 09/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 10/05/1987 | 26.17 | Prs | Preserved | 62.89 | |||||
D87 | 45127 | 24/02/1961 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 26.25 | Cut | J&S Metals (at Crewe Works) | 29/04/1994 | 33.20 | ||||
D88 | 45136 | 02/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 26.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 08/04/1992 | 31.12 | ||||
D92 | 45138 | 25/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 22/12/1986 | 25.75 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 14/04/1994 | 33.08 | ||||
D96 | 45101 | 18/04/1961 | CW | Derby | 13/11/1986 | 25.58 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 30/09/1988 | 27.47 | ||||
D99 | 45135 | 03/05/1961 | CW | Derby | 09/03/1987 | 25.83 | Prs | Preserved | 62.74 | 3RD CARABINIER | ||||
D102 | 45140 | 18/05/1961 | CW | Derby | 29/03/1988 | 26.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 22/11/1991 | 30.53 | ||||
D106 | 45106 | 15/06/1961 | CW | Derby | 20/02/1989 | 27.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/04/1992 | 30.90 | ||||
D107 | 45120 | 20/07/1961 | CW | Derby | 24/03/1987 | 25.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 19/05/1993 | 31.85 | ||||
D109 | 45139 | 30/06/1961 | CW | Derby | 27/04/1987 | 25.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/03/1994 | 32.70 | ||||
D111 | 45129 | 04/08/1961 | CW | Derby | 15/06/1987 | 25.83 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 12/1988 | 27.38 | ||||
D113 | 45128 | 14/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 22/04/1989 | 27.58 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/1992 | 30.52 | ||||
D116 | 45103 | 01/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 02/08/1988 | 26.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 24/08/1990 | 29.00 | ||||
D117 | 45130 | 09/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 10/05/1987 | 25.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/06/1993 | 31.75 | ||||
D120 | 45108 | 30/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 04/08/1987 | 25.92 | Prs | Preserved | 62.33 | |||||
D123 | 45125 | 28/10/1961 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.58 | Prs | Preserved | 62.25 | |||||
D124 | 45131 | 21/10/1961 | CW | Derby | 03/09/1986 | 24.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 26.82 | ||||
D126 | 45134 | 09/11/1961 | CW | Derby | 17/09/1987 | 25.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 05/1994 | 32.53 | ||||
D128 | 45145 | 18/11/1961 | CW | Derby | 23/02/1988 | 26.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 09/02/1992 | 30.25 | ||||
D130 | 45148 | 04/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 11/02/1987 | 25.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 23/06/1992 | 30.57 | ||||
D135 | 45149 | 30/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 14/09/1987 | 25.75 | Prs | Preserved | 62.08 |