45/1 |
D11
|
45122
|
|
|
01/10/1960 |
27/04/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
03/1974 |
45/0 |
D12
|
|
45011
|
|
15/10/1960 |
31/05/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
18/10/1968 |
45/0 |
D14
|
|
45015
|
|
24/11/1960 |
03/03/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
01/03/1969 |
45/0 |
D15
|
|
45018
|
|
09/12/1960 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
23/05/1969 |
45/0 |
D16
|
|
45016
|
|
15/12/1960 |
18/11/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/03/1969 |
45/0 |
D17
|
|
45024
|
|
23/12/1960 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
27/06/1969 |
45/1 |
D18
|
45121
|
|
|
31/12/1960 |
19/11/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
02/1974 |
45/0 |
D19
|
|
45025
|
|
31/12/1960 |
10/05/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
24/10/1969 |
45/0 |
D20
|
|
45013
|
|
24/02/1961 |
27/04/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
13/03/1971 |
45/1 |
D22
|
45132
|
|
|
30/03/1961 |
11/05/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
07/1974 |
45/0 |
D23
|
|
45017
|
|
08/04/1961 |
01/08/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
27/08/1971 |
45/0 |
D24
|
|
45027
|
|
15/04/1961 |
31/05/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
27/09/1969 |
45/0 |
D25
|
|
45021
|
|
15/04/1961 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
06/06/1969 |
45/0 |
D26
|
|
45020
|
|
22/04/1961 |
08/12/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/04/1969 |
45/0 |
D27
|
|
45028
|
|
29/04/1961 |
14/12/1980 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
03/1978 |
45/1 |
D28
|
45124
|
|
|
04/05/1961 |
22/01/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/10/1968 |
45/0 |
D29
|
|
45002
|
|
13/05/1961 |
16/09/1984 |
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
08/1976 |
45/0 |
D30
|
|
45029
|
97410
|
20/05/1961 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
28/08/1969 |
45/0 |
D31
|
|
45030
|
|
03/06/1961 |
30/11/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
13/06/1969 |
45/1 |
D32
|
45126
|
|
|
12/06/1961 |
27/04/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
05/1974 |
45/0 |
D33
|
|
45019
|
|
19/06/1961 |
04/09/1985 |
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
45/1 |
D34
|
45119
|
|
|
29/06/1961 |
07/05/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
01/1974 |
45/1 |
D35
|
45117
|
|
|
30/06/1961 |
12/05/1986 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
12/1973 |
45/0 |
D36
|
|
45031
|
|
06/07/1961 |
31/05/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D38
|
|
45032
|
|
13/07/1961 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D39
|
|
45033
|
|
20/07/1961 |
04/02/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
01/1976 |
45/1 |
D40
|
45133
|
|
|
26/07/1961 |
10/05/1987 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
03/1978 |
45/1 |
D41
|
45147
|
|
|
29/07/1961 |
04/01/1985 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
01/1975 |
45/0 |
D42
|
|
45034
|
97411
|
19/08/1961 |
07/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
14/11/1975 |
45/1 |
D43
|
45107
|
|
|
28/08/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
05/1973 |
45/0 |
D44
|
|
45035
|
|
02/09/1961 |
31/05/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/10/1975 |
45/0 |
D45
|
|
45036
|
|
08/09/1961 |
11/05/1986 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
22/06/1981 |
45/0 |
D46
|
|
45037
|
|
02/10/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
12/1978 |
45/1 |
D47
|
45116
|
|
|
30/09/1961 |
22/12/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
31/10/1973 |
45/0 |
D48
|
|
45038
|
|
02/10/1961 |
05/06/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
15/03/1975 |
45/0 |
D49
|
|
45039
|
|
07/10/1961 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/04/1975 |
45/0 |
D50
|
|
45040
|
97412
|
22/05/1962 |
08/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
27/11/1975 |
45/1 |
D51
|
45102
|
|
|
05/06/1962 |
09/09/1986 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
04/1973 |
45/1 |
D52
|
45123
|
|
|
07/06/1962 |
22/07/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
04/1974 |
45/0 |
D53
|
|
45041
|
|
25/06/1962 |
08/06/1988 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
07/1981 |
45/0 |
D54
|
|
45023
|
|
08/08/1962 |
12/09/1984 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1979 |
45/1 |
D55
|
45144
|
|
|
10/09/1962 |
21/12/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
12/1974 |
45/1 |
D56
|
45137
|
|
|
23/11/1962 |
15/06/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D57
|
|
45042
|
|
29/06/1963 |
29/04/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
45/0 |
D58
|
|
45043
|
|
30/01/1962 |
12/09/1984 |
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
04/1976 |
45/1 |
D59
|
45104
|
|
|
06/02/1962 |
13/04/1988 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1978 |
45/0 |
D60
|
|
45022
|
97409
|
15/02/1962 |
07/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/1968 |
45/1 |
D61
|
45112
|
|
|
08/03/1962 |
07/05/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
08/1973 |
45/1 |
D62
|
45143
|
|
|
15/03/1962 |
07/05/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D63
|
|
45044
|
|
29/03/1962 |
15/06/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D64
|
|
45045
|
|
09/04/1962 |
08/05/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
10/1976 |
45/1 |
D65
|
45111
|
|
|
13/04/1962 |
07/05/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
08/1973 |
45/1 |
D66
|
45146
|
|
|
17/04/1962 |
07/04/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/1 |
D67
|
45118
|
|
|
03/05/1962 |
08/05/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
12/1973 |
45/0 |
D68
|
|
45046
|
|
05/10/1960 |
02/08/1988 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
03/1979 |
45/0 |
D69
|
|
45047
|
|
18/10/1960 |
03/08/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/03/1975 |
45/0 |
D70
|
|
45048
|
|
12/11/1960 |
24/06/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D71
|
|
45049
|
|
25/11/1960 |
27/10/1987 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
45/0 |
D72
|
|
45050
|
|
19/11/1960 |
12/09/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/1 |
D73
|
45110
|
|
|
25/11/1960 |
27/07/1988 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
07/1973 |
45/0 |
D74
|
|
45051
|
|
05/12/1960 |
09/04/1987 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1979 |
45/0 |
D75
|
|
45052
|
|
02/12/1960 |
08/06/1988 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
45/0 |
D76
|
|
45053
|
|
30/11/1960 |
27/11/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
23/05/1975 |
45/1 |
D77
|
|
45004
|
|
10/12/1960 |
08/12/1985 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
02/1977 |
45/1 |
D78
|
45150
|
45054
|
|
12/12/1960 |
04/02/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D79
|
|
45005
|
|
15/12/1960 |
17/03/1986 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
02/1978 |
45/1 |
D80
|
45113
|
|
|
17/12/1960 |
02/08/1988 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
10/10/1973 |
45/1 |
D81
|
45115
|
|
|
21/12/1960 |
13/06/1988 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
16/10/1973 |
45/1 |
D82
|
45141
|
|
|
31/12/1960 |
04/08/1988 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
02/1979 |
45/1 |
D83
|
45142
|
|
|
31/12/1960 |
18/06/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/10/1971 |
45/0 |
D84
|
|
45055
|
|
31/12/1960 |
11/04/1985 |
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
08/1976 |
45/1 |
D85
|
45109
|
|
|
06/02/1961 |
27/01/1986 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
07/1973 |
45/1 |
D86
|
45105
|
|
|
09/03/1961 |
10/05/1987 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
45/1 |
D87
|
45127
|
|
|
24/02/1961 |
07/05/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
24/03/1971 |
45/1 |
D88
|
45136
|
|
|
02/03/1961 |
07/05/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
09/1974 |
45/0 |
D89
|
|
45006
|
|
22/03/1961 |
14/09/1986 |
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
08/1976 |
45/0 |
D90
|
|
45008
|
|
11/03/1961 |
14/12/1980 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
45/0 |
D91
|
|
45056
|
|
17/03/1961 |
29/11/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/1976 |
45/1 |
D92
|
45138
|
|
|
25/03/1961 |
22/12/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D93
|
|
45057
|
|
28/03/1961 |
21/01/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D94
|
45114
|
|
|
06/04/1961 |
17/02/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
09/1973 |
45/0 |
D95
|
|
45054
|
|
15/04/1961 |
21/01/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/11/1971 |
45/1 |
D96
|
45101
|
|
|
18/04/1961 |
13/11/1986 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
03/1973 |
45/0 |
D97
|
|
45058
|
|
22/04/1961 |
03/09/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D98
|
|
45059
|
|
26/04/1961 |
03/03/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
13/03/1973 |
45/1 |
D99
|
45135
|
|
|
03/05/1961 |
09/03/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D100
|
|
45060
|
|
08/05/1961 |
08/12/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/1975 |
45/0 |
D101
|
|
45061
|
|
20/05/1961 |
16/08/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/1 |
D102
|
45140
|
|
|
18/05/1961 |
29/03/1988 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
10/1974 |
45/0 |
D103
|
|
45062
|
|
30/05/1961 |
02/07/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D104
|
|
45063
|
|
01/06/1961 |
02/05/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D105
|
|
45064
|
|
09/06/1961 |
21/01/1985 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
04/1978 |
45/1 |
D106
|
45106
|
|
|
15/06/1961 |
20/02/1989 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/1 |
D107
|
45120
|
|
|
20/07/1961 |
24/03/1987 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
03/1973 |
45/0 |
D108
|
|
45012
|
|
28/07/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/1 |
D109
|
45139
|
|
|
30/06/1961 |
27/04/1987 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/0 |
D110
|
|
45065
|
|
25/07/1961 |
05/03/1985 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/1 |
D111
|
45129
|
|
|
04/08/1961 |
15/06/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/09/1971 |
45/0 |
D112
|
|
45010
|
|
08/08/1961 |
28/03/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/1968 |
45/1 |
D113
|
45128
|
|
|
14/09/1961 |
22/04/1989 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/09/1971 |
45/0 |
D114
|
|
45066
|
97413
|
19/09/1961 |
26/07/1988 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
01/1979 |
45/0 |
D115
|
|
45067
|
|
28/08/1961 |
31/07/1977 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/1 |
D116
|
45103
|
|
|
01/09/1961 |
02/08/1988 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/1 |
D117
|
45130
|
|
|
09/09/1961 |
10/05/1987 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/0 |
D118
|
|
45068
|
|
16/09/1961 |
28/01/1986 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/0 |
D119
|
|
45007
|
|
23/09/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/1 |
D120
|
45108
|
|
|
30/09/1961 |
04/08/1987 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/0 |
D121
|
|
45069
|
|
06/10/1961 |
08/07/1986 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
02/1979 |
45/0 |
D122
|
|
45070
|
|
11/10/1961 |
29/01/1987 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
03/1979 |
45/1 |
D123
|
45125
|
|
|
28/10/1961 |
07/05/1987 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/1 |
D124
|
45131
|
|
|
21/10/1961 |
03/09/1986 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/0 |
D125
|
|
45071
|
|
31/10/1961 |
12/07/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
31/12/1975 |
45/1 |
D126
|
45134
|
|
|
09/11/1961 |
17/09/1987 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
03/1973 |
45/0 |
D127
|
|
45072
|
|
15/11/1961 |
26/04/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
45/1 |
D128
|
45145
|
|
|
18/11/1961 |
23/02/1988 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
45/0 |
D129
|
|
45073
|
|
25/11/1961 |
18/10/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/1968 |
45/1 |
D130
|
45148
|
|
|
04/12/1961 |
11/02/1987 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
01/1975 |
45/0 |
D131
|
|
45074
|
|
09/12/1961 |
04/09/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
45/0 |
D132
|
|
45075
|
|
16/12/1961 |
24/01/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1978 |
45/0 |
D133
|
|
45003
|
|
21/12/1961 |
08/12/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
06/1973 |
45/0 |
D134
|
|
45076
|
|
30/12/1961 |
12/11/1986 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
45/1 |
D135
|
45149
|
|
|
30/12/1961 |
14/09/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1970 |
45/0 |
D136
|
|
45077
|
|
30/12/1961 |
11/05/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
20/02/1973 |
45/0 |
D137
|
|
45014
|
|
30/12/1961 |
10/03/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
30/09/1973 |