45 1Co-Co1
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 49 | 07/10/1961 | THE MANCHESTER REGIMENT | 09/10/1965 | 14/12/1980 | ||
45 | 50 | 22/05/1962 | KING'S SHROPSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY | 05/1965 | 08/1988 | ||
45 | 53 | 25/06/1962 | ROYAL TANK REGIMENT | 24/09/1964 | 08/06/1988 | ||
45 | 55 | 10/09/1962 | ROYAL SIGNALS | 17/07/1965 | Also mentioned as 30th June in SLS 1965/9 | 21/12/1987 | |
45 | 55 | 10/09/1962 | ROYAL SIGNALS | 17/07/1965 | Also mentioned as 30th June in SLS 1965/9 | 21/12/1987 | |
45 | 58 | 30/01/1962 | THE KING'S OWN ROYAL BORDER REGIMENT | 05/10/1963 | 12/09/1984 | ||
45 | 60 | 15/02/1962 | LYTHAM ST. ANNES | 11/1964 | 07/1988 | ||
45 | 61 | 08/03/1962 | ROYAL ARMY ORDNANCE CORPS | 06/11/1965 | Also noted as 14/9/65 SLS 1966/1 | 07/05/1987 | |
45 | 61 | 08/03/1962 | ROYAL ARMY ORDNANCE CORPS | 06/11/1965 | Also noted as 14/9/65 SLS 1966/1 | 07/05/1987 | |
45 | 62 | 15/03/1962 | 5TH ROYAL INNISKILLING DRAGOON GUARDS | 11/1964 | 07/05/1987 | ||
45 | 62 | 15/03/1962 | 5TH ROYAL INNISKILLING DRAGOON GUARDS | 11/1964 | 07/05/1987 | ||
45 | 63 | 29/03/1962 | ROYAL INNISKILLING FUSILIER | 03/1966 | 15/06/1987 | ||
45 | 64 | 09/04/1962 | COLDSTREAM GUARDSMAN | 29/04/1965 | 08/05/1983 | ||
45 | 65 | 13/04/1962 | GRENADIER GUARDSMAN | 23/05/1964 | 07/05/1987 | ||
45 | 65 | 13/04/1962 | GRENADIER GUARDSMAN | 23/05/1964 | 07/05/1987 | ||
45 | 67 | 03/05/1962 | ROYAL ARTILLERYMAN | 03/1966 | 08/05/1987 | ||
45 | 67 | 03/05/1962 | ROYAL ARTILLERYMAN | 03/1966 | 08/05/1987 | ||
45 | 68 | 05/10/1960 | ROYAL FUSILIER | 21/01/1967 | 08/1988 | 02/08/1988 | |
45 | 70 | 12/11/1960 | THE ROYAL MARINES | 07/12/1964 | 24/06/1985 | ||
45 | 71 | 25/11/1960 | THE STAFFORDSHIRE REGIMENT (THE PRINCE OF WALES'S) | 20/05/1966 | 27/10/1987 | ||
45 | 77 | 10/12/1960 | ROYAL IRISH FUSILIER | 11/09/1965 | 08/12/1985 | ||
45 | 77 | 10/12/1960 | ROYAL IRISH FUSILIER | 11/09/1965 | 08/12/1985 | ||
45 | 84 | 31/12/1960 | ROYAL CORPS OF TRANSPORT | 16/06/1966 | A regiment founded in 1965 to take over the duties performed by the abolished Royal Army Service | 04/1985 | 11/04/1985 |
45 | 89 | 22/03/1961 | HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY | 09/06/1965 | 14/09/1986 | ||
45 | 98 | 26/04/1961 | ROYAL ENGINEER | 20/12/1966 | 03/1986 | 03/03/1986 | |
45 | 99 | 03/05/1961 | 3RD CARABINIER | 12/1965 | 09/03/1987 | ||
45 | 99 | 03/05/1961 | 3RD CARABINIER | 12/1965 | 09/03/1987 | ||
45 | 100 | 08/05/1961 | SHERWOOD FORESTER | 09/09/1961 | 08/12/1985 | ||
45 | 137 | 30/12/1961 | THE CHESHIRE REGIMENT | 12/06/1966 | 10/03/1986 |