Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 802 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18605 Week
» 71621 Month
» 191148 Year
» 3218001 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
45 1Co-Co1
Old Number |
Company |
Old Num Type |
New Number |
Company |
Subtype |
New Num Type |
|
Date |
Notes |
D96 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45101 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
31/03/1973 |
|
D51 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45102 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
05/04/1973 |
|
D116 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45103 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
12/04/1973 |
|
D59 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45104 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
25/04/1973 |
|
D13 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45001 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
28/04/1973 |
|
D86 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45105 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
28/04/1973 |
|
D106 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45106 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
16/05/1973 |
|
D43 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45107 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
25/05/1973 |
|
D29 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45002 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
01/06/1973 |
|
D120 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45108 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
15/06/1973 |
|
D133 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45003 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
29/06/1973 |
|
D85 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45109 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
06/07/1973 |
|
D73 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45110 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
12/07/1973 |
|
D65 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45111 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
17/08/1973 |
|
D61 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45112 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
31/08/1973 |
|
D77 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45004 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
05/09/1973 |
|
D94 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45114 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
14/09/1973 |
|
D80 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45113 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
10/10/1973 |
|
D81 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45115 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
16/10/1973 |
|
D47 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45116 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
31/10/1973 |
|
D89 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45006 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
03/11/1973 |
|
D79 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45005 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
05/11/1973 |
|
D90 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45008 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
20/11/1973 |
|
D119 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45007 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
29/11/1973 |
|
D35 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45117 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
05/12/1973 |
|
D112 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45010 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
18/12/1973 |
|
D37 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45009 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
19/12/1973 |
|
D67 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45118 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
20/12/1973 |
|
D34 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45119 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
31/01/1974 |
|
D12 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45011 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D107 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45120 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
13/02/1974 |
|
D18 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45121 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
28/02/1974 |
|
D14 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45015 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D20 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45013 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D137 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45014 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D108 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45012 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/03/1974 |
|
D11 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45122 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
23/03/1974 |
|
D16 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45016 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D123 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45125 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1974 |
|
D52 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45123 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
06/04/1974 |
|
D28 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45124 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
11/04/1974 |
|
D23 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45017 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D32 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45126 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
11/05/1974 |
|
D87 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45127 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
18/05/1974 |
|
D113 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45128 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
01/06/1974 |
|
D111 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45129 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
08/06/1974 |
|
D117 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45130 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
15/06/1974 |
|
D124 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45131 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
24/06/1974 |
|
D22 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45132 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
03/07/1974 |
|
D40 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45133 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
16/07/1974 |
|
D126 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45134 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
14/08/1974 |
|
D15 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45018 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
9w/e |
31/08/1974 |
|
D26 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45020 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
9w/e |
31/08/1974 |
|
D33 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45019 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
9w/e |
31/08/1974 |
|
D99 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45135 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
03/09/1974 |
|
D88 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45136 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
13/09/1974 |
|
D56 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45137 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
24/09/1974 |
|
D92 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45138 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
12/10/1974 |
|
D109 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45139 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
21/10/1974 |
|
D25 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45021 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
5w/e |
26/10/1974 |
|
D102 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45140 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
30/10/1974 |
|
D60 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45022 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
11/1974 |
|
D82 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45141 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
08/11/1974 |
|
D83 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45142 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
18/11/1974 |
|
D62 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45143 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
25/11/1974 |
|
D57 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45042 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D55 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45144 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
02/12/1974 |
|
D128 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45145 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
17/12/1974 |
|
D66 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45146 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
22/12/1974 |
|
D39 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45033 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D46 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45037 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D50 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45040 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D54 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45023 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D69 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45047 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D74 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45051 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D75 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45052 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D84 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45055 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D93 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45057 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D97 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45058 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D98 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45059 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D100 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45060 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D103 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45062 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D104 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45063 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D105 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45064 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D110 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45065 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D115 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45067 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D121 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45069 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D122 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45070 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D127 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45072 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D131 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45074 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D134 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45076 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D136 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45077 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D78 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45054 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D41 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45147 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
11/01/1975 |
|
D130 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45148 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
23/01/1975 |
|
D19 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45025 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D21 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45026 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D24 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45027 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D27 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45028 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D31 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45030 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D38 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45032 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D42 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45034 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D44 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45035 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D58 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45043 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D64 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45045 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D68 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45046 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D72 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45050 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D76 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45053 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D114 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45066 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D129 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45073 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D132 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45075 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
02/1975 |
|
D135 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45149 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
17/02/1975 |
|
D48 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45038 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
03/1975 |
|
D63 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45044 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
03/1975 |
|
D71 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45049 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
03/1975 |
|
D91 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45056 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
03/1975 |
|
D17 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45024 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D30 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45029 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D49 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45039 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D70 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45048 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D36 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45031 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
05/1975 |
|
D45 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45036 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
05/1975 |
|
D53 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45041 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
05/1975 |
|
D95 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45054 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
09/05/1975 |
|
D118 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45068 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
on |
03/06/1975 |
|
D101 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45061 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
07/1975 |
|
45054 |
BR |
TOPS |
45150 |
BR |
45/1 |
TOPS |
on |
10/07/1975 |
|
D125 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
45071 |
BR |
45/0 |
TOPS |
|
12/1975 |
|
45040 |
BR |
TOPS |
97412 |
BR |
Dept |
Departmental |
m/e |
09/1987 |
|
45029 |
BR |
TOPS |
97410 |
BR |
Dept |
Departmental |
m/e |
09/1987 |
|
45034 |
BR |
TOPS |
97411 |
BR |
Dept |
Departmental |
m/e |
09/1987 |
|
45022 |
BR |
TOPS |
97409 |
BR |
Dept |
Departmental |
m/e |
09/1987 |
|
45066 |
BR |
TOPS |
97413 |
BR |
Dept |
Departmental |
m/e |
09/1987 |
|