Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 47 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3372 Week
» 3372 Month
» 70234 Year
» 1735610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

144


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
56050 25/04/1957 51A Darlington (New) 25/04/1957
56051 25/04/1957 51A Darlington (New) 25/04/1957
56052 03/05/1957 51A Darlington (New) 03/05/1957
56053 03/05/1957 51A Darlington (New) 03/05/1957
56054 15/05/1957 51A Darlington (New) 15/05/1957
56055 15/05/1957 51A Darlington (New) 15/05/1957
56056 21/05/1957 51A
NH
Darlington (New)
Newton Heath
21/05/1957
04/10/1987
56057 29/04/1957 51A Darlington (New) 29/04/1957
56058 29/04/1957 51A Darlington (New) 29/04/1957
56059 22/05/1957 51A Darlington (New) 22/05/1957
56060 22/05/1957 51A Darlington (New) 22/05/1957
56061 21/05/1957 51A
TS
Darlington (New)
Tyseley
21/05/1957
04/10/1987
56062 28/05/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 28/05/1957
56063 28/05/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 28/05/1957 04/10/1987
56064 06/06/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 06/06/1957
56065 06/06/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 06/06/1957
56066 26/06/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 26/06/1957
56067 02/07/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 02/07/1957
56068 02/07/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 02/07/1957
56069 09/07/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 09/07/1957
56070 23/07/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 23/07/1957
56071 31/07/1957 54A
NH
Sunderland (New)
Newton Heath
31/07/1957
04/10/1987
56072 31/07/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 31/07/1957
56073 21/08/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 21/08/1957
56074 13/06/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 13/06/1957
56075 13/06/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 13/06/1957
56076 20/06/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 20/06/1957
56077 25/06/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 25/06/1957
56078 09/07/1957 54A
BY
Sunderland (New)
Bletchley
09/07/1957
16/03/1988
56079 16/07/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 16/07/1957
56080 16/07/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 16/07/1957
56081 23/07/1957 54A
NH
Sunderland (New)
Newton Heath
23/07/1957
04/10/1987
56082 21/08/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 21/08/1957
56083 27/08/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 27/08/1957
56084 27/08/1957 54A Sunderland (New) 27/08/1957
56085 03/09/1957 54A
NH
Sunderland (New)
Newton Heath
03/09/1957
04/10/1987
56086 05/12/1957 51A Darlington (New) 05/12/1957
56087 05/12/1957 51A Darlington (New) 05/12/1957
56088 11/12/1957 51A Darlington (New) 11/12/1957
56089 11/12/1957 51A Darlington (New) 11/12/1957
56218 03/09/1957   (New) 03/09/1957
56219 10/09/1957   (New) 10/09/1957
56220 10/09/1957   (New) 10/09/1957
56332 TS Tyseley 14/05/1988
56333
56334
56335
56336
56337
56338
56339
56340
56341
56342
56343
56344
56345
56346
56347
56348
56349 04/10/1987
56350
56351
56352
56353
56354
56355
56356
56357
56358 TS Tyseley 10/05/1988
56359
56360
56361
56362 31/07/1958 56G
TS
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Tyseley
31/07/1958
14/05/1988
56363 31/07/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 31/07/1958
56364 08/08/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 08/08/1958
56365 08/08/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 08/08/1958
56366 29/08/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 29/08/1958
56367 29/08/1958 53C
NH
Hull Springhead (New)
Newton Heath
29/08/1958
04/10/1987
56368 11/09/1958 56G
NC
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Norwich Thorpe
11/09/1958
04/10/1987
56369 11/09/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 11/09/1958
56370 11/09/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 11/09/1958
56371 18/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/09/1958
56372 18/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/09/1958
56373 25/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/09/1958
56374 25/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/09/1958
56375 02/10/1958 TS (New)
Tyseley
02/10/1958
04/10/1987
56376 02/10/1958   (New) 02/10/1958
56377 10/10/1958   (New) 10/10/1958
56378 10/10/1958   (New) 10/10/1958
56379 16/10/1958   (New) 16/10/1958
56380 16/10/1958   (New) 16/10/1958
56381 23/10/1958 53C
TS
Hull Springhead (New)
Tyseley
23/10/1958
04/10/1987
56382
56383
56384
56385
56386
56387
56388
56389
56390
56391
56392
56393
56394
56395 09/03/1974
56396
56397
56398     23/08/1987
56399
56400
56401     23/09/1987
56402      
56403      
56404      
56405      
56406      
56407      
56408      
56409      
56410      
56411