Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 37 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3362 Week
» 3362 Month
» 70224 Year
» 1735600 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

144


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
25/04/1957 To Service 56050   NEW 51A Darlington
25/04/1957 To Service 56051   NEW 51A Darlington
29/04/1957 To Service 56057   NEW 51A Darlington
29/04/1957 To Service 56058   NEW 51A Darlington
03/05/1957 To Service 56052   NEW 51A Darlington
03/05/1957 To Service 56053   NEW 51A Darlington
15/05/1957 To Service 56054   NEW 51A Darlington
15/05/1957 To Service 56055   NEW 51A Darlington
21/05/1957 To Service 56056   NEW 51A Darlington
21/05/1957 To Service 56061   NEW 51A Darlington
22/05/1957 To Service 56059   NEW 51A Darlington
22/05/1957 To Service 56060   NEW 51A Darlington
28/05/1957 To Service 56062   NEW 54A Sunderland
28/05/1957 To Service 56063   NEW 54A Sunderland
06/06/1957 To Service 56064   NEW 54A Sunderland
06/06/1957 To Service 56065   NEW 54A Sunderland
13/06/1957 To Service 56074   NEW 54A Sunderland
13/06/1957 To Service 56075   NEW 54A Sunderland
20/06/1957 To Service 56076   NEW 54A Sunderland
25/06/1957 To Service 56077   NEW 54A Sunderland
26/06/1957 To Service 56066   NEW 54A Sunderland
02/07/1957 To Service 56067   NEW 54A Sunderland
02/07/1957 To Service 56068   NEW 54A Sunderland
09/07/1957 To Service 56069   NEW 54A Sunderland
09/07/1957 To Service 56078   NEW 54A Sunderland
16/07/1957 To Service 56079   NEW 54A Sunderland
16/07/1957 To Service 56080   NEW 54A Sunderland
23/07/1957 To Service 56070   NEW 54A Sunderland
23/07/1957 To Service 56081   NEW 54A Sunderland
31/07/1957 To Service 56071   NEW 54A Sunderland
31/07/1957 To Service 56072   NEW 54A Sunderland
21/08/1957 To Service 56073   NEW 54A Sunderland
21/08/1957 To Service 56082   NEW 54A Sunderland
27/08/1957 To Service 56083   NEW 54A Sunderland
27/08/1957 To Service 56084   NEW 54A Sunderland
03/09/1957 To Service 56085   NEW 54A Sunderland
05/12/1957 To Service 56086   NEW 51A Darlington
05/12/1957 To Service 56087   NEW 51A Darlington
11/12/1957 To Service 56088   NEW 51A Darlington
11/12/1957 To Service 56089   NEW 51A Darlington
31/07/1958 To Service 56362   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
31/07/1958 To Service 56363   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
08/08/1958 To Service 56364   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
08/08/1958 To Service 56365   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
29/08/1958 To Service 56366   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
29/08/1958 To Service 56367   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
11/09/1958 To Service 56368   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
11/09/1958 To Service 56369   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
11/09/1958 To Service 56370   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
18/09/1958 To Service 56371   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
18/09/1958 To Service 56372   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/09/1958 To Service 56373   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/09/1958 To Service 56374   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
23/10/1958 To Service 56381   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
09/03/1974 Condemned 56395       COND
04/10/1987 Reallocation 56056 51A Darlington NH Newton Heath
04/10/1987 Reallocation 56061 51A Darlington TS Tyseley
04/10/1987 Condemned 56063 54A Sunderland   COND
04/10/1987 Reallocation 56071 54A Sunderland NH Newton Heath
04/10/1987 Reallocation 56081 54A Sunderland NH Newton Heath
04/10/1987 Reallocation 56085 54A Sunderland NH Newton Heath
04/10/1987 Condemned 56349       COND
04/10/1987 Reallocation 56367 53C Hull Springhead NH Newton Heath
04/10/1987 Reallocation 56368 56G Bradford Hammerton Street NC Norwich Thorpe
04/10/1987 Reallocation 56375 SGosfo   TS Tyseley
04/10/1987 Reallocation 56381 53C Hull Springhead TS Tyseley
16/03/1988 Reallocation 56078 54A Sunderland BY Bletchley
14/05/1988 Reallocation 56362 56G Bradford Hammerton Street TS Tyseley