Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1092 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 2161 Week
» 2161 Month
» 69023 Year
» 1734399 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

144


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
56050 25/04/1957 Darlington 63.90
56051 25/04/1957 Darlington 63.90
56052 03/05/1957 Darlington 63.87
56053 03/05/1957 Darlington 63.87
56054 15/05/1957 Darlington 63.84
56055 15/05/1957 Darlington 63.84
56056 21/05/1957 Darlington 63.82
56057 29/04/1957 Darlington 63.88
56058 29/04/1957 Darlington 63.88
56059 22/05/1957 Darlington 63.82
56060 22/05/1957 Darlington 63.82
56061 21/05/1957 Darlington 63.82
56062 28/05/1957 Sunderland 63.81
56063 28/05/1957 Sunderland 04/10/1987 Neville Hill 30.42 63.81
56064 06/06/1957 Sunderland 63.78
56065 06/06/1957 Sunderland 63.78
56066 26/06/1957 Sunderland 63.73
56067 02/07/1957 Sunderland 63.71
56068 02/07/1957 Sunderland 63.71
56069 09/07/1957 Sunderland 63.69
56070 23/07/1957 Sunderland 63.65
56071 31/07/1957 Sunderland 63.63
56072 31/07/1957 Sunderland 63.63
56073 21/08/1957 Sunderland 63.57
56074 13/06/1957 Sunderland 63.76
56075 13/06/1957 Sunderland 63.76
56076 20/06/1957 Sunderland 63.74
56077 25/06/1957 Sunderland 63.73
56078 09/07/1957 Sunderland 63.69
56079 16/07/1957 Sunderland 63.67
56080 16/07/1957 Sunderland 63.67
56081 23/07/1957 Sunderland 63.65
56082 21/08/1957 Sunderland 63.57
56083 27/08/1957 Sunderland 63.56
56084 27/08/1957 Sunderland 63.56
56085 03/09/1957 Sunderland 63.54
56086 05/12/1957 Darlington 63.28
56087 05/12/1957 Darlington 63.28
56088 11/12/1957 Darlington 63.27
56089 11/12/1957 Darlington 63.27
56218 03/09/1957 63.54
56219 10/09/1957 63.52
56220 10/09/1957 63.52
56332
56333
56334
56335
56336
56337
56338
56339
56340
56341
56342
56343
56344
56345
56346
56347
56348
56349 04/10/1987 Neville Hill
56350
56351
56352
56353
56354
56355
56356
56357
56358
56359
56360
56361
56362 31/07/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.63
56363 31/07/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.63
56364 08/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.61
56365 08/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.61
56366 29/08/1958 Hull Springhead 62.55
56367 29/08/1958 Hull Springhead 62.55
56368 11/09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.52
56369 11/09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.52
56370 11/09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.52
56371 18/09/1958 Hull Springhead 62.50
56372 18/09/1958 Hull Springhead 62.50
56373 25/09/1958 Hull Springhead 62.48
56374 25/09/1958 Hull Springhead 62.48
56375 02/10/1958 62.46
56376 02/10/1958 62.46
56377 10/10/1958 62.44
56378 10/10/1958 62.44
56379 16/10/1958 62.42
56380 16/10/1958 62.42
56381 23/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.40
56382
56383
56384
56385
56386
56387
56388
56389
56390
56391
56392
56393
56394
56395 09/03/1974
56396
56397
56398
56399
56400
56401
56402
56403
56404
56405
56406
56407
56408
56409
56410
56411