47 Co-Co
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sun 08/11/1964 | D1536, D1536, D1557 |
41A, 41A, 41A |
A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Mon 11/01/1965 | D1734 | 82A | D1734 was the the head of the 03:56 Saltney - Pontypool Road Class 5 freight, consisting of 46 wagons, 775 tons in tow. At the top of the 1 in 100 downhill gradient at Coton Hill, the driver failed to obey a stop sign and his train careered out of control down the hill entering the 'Up' goods loop at speed, crashed through the trap points at the yard exit then, despite an emergency brake application which reduced the speed to about 20mph, derailed and continued for a further 72 yards, having crashed through Coton Hill (South) signal box, demolishing it entirely. The driver was badly injured but the signalman was, unfortunately, killed. The MoT report can be seen here. |
|||
Sun 21/03/1965 | D1617, D1617, D1807, D1811, D1817, D1818, D1821, D1822, D1824 |
D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16 |
A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed |
John Thickitt - depot visit | ||
Sun 14/08/1966 | D1695 | WL | Stabled around the turntable at Old Oak Common | The Early Years of London Diesels | ||
Sat 03/09/1966 | D1572 | 41A | Last day of through services on the Great Central main line: Worked the Poole-Newcastle service via the Great Central mainline | Last Years of the Great Central Mainline (Robert Robotham) | ||
Sat 29/04/1967 | D1631, D1633, D1845, D1846, D1847, D1850, D1852, D1855, D1857 |
WL, WL, WL, WL, WL, WL, WL, WL, WL |
Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing |
John Thickitt | ||
Sun 05/11/1967 | D1836 | ML | Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point. | RCTS 1/1968 | ||
Wed 31/01/1968 | D1728, D1728, D1728 |
WL, WL, WL |
Worked the up "Midday Scot"
Worked the up "Midday Scot" Worked the up "Midday Scot" |
RCTS 4/1968 | ||
Thu 01/02/1968 | D1736 | WL | Worked the up "Midday Scot" | RCTS 4/1968 | ||
Thu 01/02/1968 | D1729 | WL | 13:50 arrival at Glasgow from Manchester | RCTS 4/1968 | ||
Wed 28/02/1968 | D1525 | 34G | Worked the down "Thames-Clyde" express into Glasgow. | RCTS 4/1968 | ||
Mon 01/04/1968 | D1703 | 41A | On Haymarket depot | RCTS 6/1968 | ||
Sat 06/04/1968 | D1110 | 55B | Worked a railtour in conjunction with 70013 'Oliver Cromwell' - D1110 worked over the Waverley route and then south over the Settle and Carlisle as far as Hellifield. Worked the return from Carnforth. | RCTS 6/1968 | ||
Sat 13/04/1968 | D1825, D1845 |
ML, WL |
Polmadie depot: Stabled on Polmadie depot Polmadie depot: Stabled on Polmadie depot |
RCTS 6/1968 | ||
Tue 27/08/1968 | D1851, D1853 |
D05, D05 |
Perth depot: Around the area - On the shed Perth depot: Around the area - On the shed |
RO 12/1968 | ||
Wed 28/08/1968 | D1918, D1942 |
86A, D02 |
Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed |
RO 11/1968 | ||
Tue 10/09/1968 | D1974, D1974 |
64B, 64B |
D1974 ran low on fuel while working the 10:20 Edinburgh - Aberdeen at barry Links. D6100 in blue took over for the rest of the run. D1974 ran low on fuel while working the 10:20 Edinburgh - Aberdeen at barry Links. D6100 in blue took over for the rest of the run. |
RO 11/1968 | ||
Wed 02/10/1968 | D1971 | 64B | 1F50 | D6129 arrived at Waverley from Bonar Bridge with a 3 coach special conveying Sheik Zaid of Abu Dhabi. The occupants had been on a shooting party. The train was taken on to Kings Cross by D1971 (1F50) | RO 12/1968 | |
Sun 05/01/1969 | D1959 | D05 | Crewe North depot: Stabled in depot | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 18/05/1969 | D1582, D1582 |
51L, 51L |
Port Clarence - Ardeer chemical train (for nylon plant) Port Clarence - Ardeer chemical train (for nylon plant) |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 21/06/1969 | D1840 | D05 | Hornsey depot: On shed | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 22/06/1969 | D1105, D1522 |
34G, 41A |
Hornsey depot: On shed Hornsey depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 22/06/1969 | D1789 | 51L | Port Clarence - Ardeer chemical train (for nylon plant) | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 29/06/1969 | D1609, D1609, D1609, D1611, D1611, D1611, D1613, D1641, D1641, D1661, D1661, D1661, D1679, D1687, D1716, D1911, D1913, D1928, D1928, D1928 |
82A, 82A, 82A, 87E, 87E, 87E, 87E, 81A, 81A, 87E, 87E, 87E, 81A, D02, D02, 86A, 86A, 82A, 82A, 82A |
Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed Old Oak Common depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 29/06/1969 | D1102, D1506, D1762, D1762, D1968, D1995, D1996 |
52A, 40B, 34G, 34G, 64B, 34G, 34G |
Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed Finsbury Park depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 29/06/1969 | D1103, D1552, D1871, D1969, D1969, D1971, D1989, D1998 |
34G, 40B, 34G, 52A, 52A, 52A, 52A, 34G |
At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Tue 01/07/1969 | D1679 | 81A | D846 failed near Reading while working the 17:15 Paddington - Worcester. D1679 recued the train and took the emsemble as far as Oxford where the Warship was removed. | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 12/07/1969 | D1801 | 41A | Gloucester depot: On shed | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 12/07/1969 | D1789 | 51L | Dalry - About to take out an oil train | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 12/07/1969 | D1789 | 51L | Port Clarence - Ardeer chemical train (for nylon plant) | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 13/07/1969 | D1521, D1548, D1843, D1844, D1865, D1966, D1966, D1966, D1980 |
41A, D05, D05, D05, 34G, D05, D05, D05, 41A |
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. |
RO 10/1969 | ||
Fri 18/07/1969 | D1827 | D16 | Bathgate: On shed - Waiting on a car train | RO 9/1969 | ||
Tue 22/07/1969 | D1622, D1622 |
D05, D05 |
Newton Abbot Depot visit: On Newton Abbot depot Newton Abbot Depot visit: On Newton Abbot depot |
RO 10/1969 | ||
Tue 22/07/1969 | D1785 | 51L | Departed Kings Cross light engine at 14:56 | RO 9/1969 | ||
Tue 22/07/1969 | D1795 | 30A | 15:00 Kings Cross - Newcastle | RO 9/1969 | ||
Tue 22/07/1969 | D1998, D1999 |
34G, 34G |
Arrived at Kings Cross Arrived at Kings Cross |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Tue 22/07/1969 | D1840 | D05 | 1A23 | 10:55 Scarborough - Kings Cross (1A23) | RO 9/1969 | |
Thu 24/07/1969 | D1565 | 40B | 13:10 Glasgow Queen Street - Aberdeen | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 26/07/1969 | D1643, D1643 |
87E, 87E |
Allerton shed: Open Day Allerton shed: Open Day |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 26/07/1969 | D1643, D1643 |
87E, 87E |
D1643 hauled steam locomotives 7029 'Clun Castle', 5428 'Eric Treacy' and 5593 'Kolhapur' away from Allerton depot at 18:45 D1643 hauled steam locomotives 7029 'Clun Castle', 5428 'Eric Treacy' and 5593 'Kolhapur' away from Allerton depot at 18:45 |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 27/07/1969 | D1504, D1872 |
40B, 34G |
Crewe Works visit: Test roads Crewe Works visit: Test roads |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 27/07/1969 | D1501, D1503, D1505, D1506, D1507, D1508, D1510, D1517, D1620, D1620, D1623, D1623, D1640, D1640, D1640, D1646, D1646, D1673, D1673, D1751, D1751, D1769, D1769, D1828, D1861, D1867, D1921, D1921 |
40B, 40B, 40B, 40B, 40B, 40B, 41A, 41A, D05, D05, D16, D16, 81A, 81A, 81A, 87E, 87E, 82A, 82A, D02, D02, 51L, 51L, D16, D02, 34G, 86A, 86A |
Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 27/07/1969 | D1908 | 86A | Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop - collision damage | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 27/07/1969 | D1617, D1617 |
D05, D05 |
Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop yard - collision damage Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop yard - collision damage |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 27/07/1969 | D1835, D1960 |
D05, D05 |
Crewe Works visit: Sidings (Arrivals) Crewe Works visit: Sidings (Arrivals) |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 27/07/1969 | D1702 | 41A | Crewe Works visit: Stored | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 27/07/1969 | D1669, D1669 |
87E, 87E |
Crewe Works visit: Sidings opposite station - ex works and in blue Crewe Works visit: Sidings opposite station - ex works and in blue |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Thu 31/07/1969 | D1556 | 40B | 13:10 Glasgow Queen Street - Aberdeen | RO 9/1969 | ||
Thu 11/09/1969 | D1530 | 30A | Worked a Norwich-Liverpool Street express | Railway World Dec 1969 | ||
Sat 13/03/1971 | D1562 | 30A | Class 47 No D1562 had been temporarily uprated and was working the 19:30 Liverpool Street - Norwich when, near Haughley Junction north of Stowmarket, there was an explosion in the engine room. D1562 subsequently caught fire and was severely damaged. The force of the explosion caused the bulkhead door to fly off and strike the driver, breaking his arm. After periods of storage at Ipswich and Crewe Works, the locomotive was condemned and scrapped - it's cabs were retained as spares for future use. |
|||
Mon 27/12/1971 | D1543, D1554, D1554, D1605, D1605, D1618, D1618, D1618, D1619, D1619, D1624, D1624, D1628, D1628, D1628, D1677, D1677, D1677, D1696, D1721, D1835, D1848, D1850, D1852, D1858, D1877, D1952 |
55B, D05, D05, 82A, 82A, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D02, D02, D02, 87A, 87A, 87A, D02, D02, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, 40B, D05 |
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot |
RO 517 | ||
Tue 28/12/1971 | D1830, D1838, D1849, D1853, D1944 |
D16, D05, D05, D05, D05 |
Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot |
RO 517 | ||
Sat 01/01/1972 | D1951, D1951, D1951 |
D05, D05, D05 |
Stabled at Edge Hill depot: Stabled on Edge Hill depot Stabled at Edge Hill depot: Stabled on Edge Hill depot Stabled at Edge Hill depot: Stabled on Edge Hill depot |
RO 517 | ||
Sun 09/01/1972 | D1666, D1666, D1666, D1903 |
87A, 87A, 87A, 86A |
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point |
RO 3/1972 | ||
Sun 30/01/1972 | D1506, D1508, D1512, D1515, D1539, D1570, D1591, D1591, D1615, D1615, D1623, D1623, D1627, D1627, D1638, D1641, D1641, D1686, D1688, D1693, D1697, D1710, D1719, D1719, D1719, D1720, D1720, D1720, D1747, D1747, D1803, D1836, D1839, D1857, D1888, D1893, D1939, D1960, D1997 |
34G, 34G, 34G, 55A, 40B, 41A, 86A, 86A, 87A, 87A, D02, D02, D02, D02, 81A, 82A, 82A, 86A, 86A, D02, D02, D02, D02, D02, D02, 86A, 86A, 86A, 86A, 86A, D16, D05, D05, D05, 40B, 55G, D02, D16, 52A |
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Test roads Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Test roads Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Test roads Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Severe collision damage. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Test roads Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. |
RO 4/1972 | ||
Sun 06/02/1972 | D1624, D1624, D1696, D1715, D1733, D1733, D1733, D1763, D1763, D1805, D1808, D1810, D1826, D1829, D1830, D1832, D1844, D1855, D1860, D1953 |
D05, D05, D02, 87A, D02, D02, D02, D02, D02, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D05, D16, D01, D05 |
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed |
RO 4/1972 | ||
Sun 22/06/1975 | 47078, 47078 |
LE, LE |
Old Oak Common shed: On shed - With nameplate Old Oak Common shed: On shed - With nameplate |
|||
Thu 08/07/1976 | 47515 | D05 | On Old Oak Common depot - Stabled round turntable. | |||
Sun 27/02/1977 | 47601, 47601, 47601 |
TI, TI, TI |
On Tinsley depot - Stabled On Tinsley depot - Stabled On Tinsley depot - Stabled |
|||
Tue 04/05/1982 | 47522 | GD | While working the 13:35 Glasgow Queen Street - Aberdeen, this locomotive was in a serious collision with a tractor at a level crossing at Forteviot, just south west of Perth. The locomotive was recovered and rebuilt at considerable cost (thought to be about £200,000), partly due to the fact that it was an ETH fitted engine and the cost of equipping another loco with ETH as a replacement was not desirable. Amazingly, there were no fatalaties. |