Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 536 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 536 Week
» 8148 Month
» 75010 Year
» 1740386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

146


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
56170 09/08/1957 30A Stratford (New) 09/08/1957
56171 29/10/1957 30A Stratford (New) 29/10/1957
56172 29/11/1957 30A Stratford (New) 29/11/1957
56173 16/04/1958 30A Stratford (New) 16/04/1958
56174 25/08/1958 30A Stratford (New) 25/08/1958