Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 118 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4464 Week
» 4464 Month
» 71326 Year
» 1736702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

146


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
09/08/1957 To Service 56170   NEW 30A Stratford
29/10/1957 To Service 56171   NEW 30A Stratford
29/11/1957 To Service 56172   NEW 30A Stratford
16/04/1958 To Service 56173   NEW 30A Stratford
25/08/1958 To Service 56174   NEW 30A Stratford