Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 982 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 7499 Week
» 7499 Month
» 74361 Year
» 1739737 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

146


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
56170 09/08/1957 Stratford 63.62
56171 29/10/1957 Stratford 63.40
56172 29/11/1957 Stratford 63.31
56173 16/04/1958 Stratford 62.93
56174 25/08/1958 Stratford 62.58