LYR/LMS Aspinall "1153" Class 0-4-0ST
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1924 | Condemned | 11238 | COND | ||||
01/1924 | Condemned | 11220 | COND | ||||
08/1926 | Condemned | 11208 | COND | ||||
09/1926 | Condemned | 11201 | COND | ||||
04/1930 | Condemned | 11210 | COND | ||||
06/1930 | Condemned | 11242 | COND | ||||
07/1930 | Condemned | 11219 | COND | ||||
08/1930 | Condemned | 11214 | COND | ||||
1931 | Condemned | 11245 | COND | ||||
06/1931 | Condemned | 11203 | COND | ||||
06/1931 | Condemned | 11209 | COND | ||||
06/1931 | Condemned | 11226 | COND | ||||
07/1931 | Condemned | 11252 | COND | ||||
08/1931 | Condemned | 11254 | COND | ||||
09/1931 | Condemned | 11243 | COND | ||||
09/1931 | Condemned | 11248 | COND | ||||
10/1931 | Condemned | 11233 | COND | ||||
12/1931 | Condemned | 11247 | COND | ||||
08/1932 | Condemned | 11211 | COND | ||||
08/1932 | Condemned | 11250 | COND | ||||
11/1932 | Condemned | 11228 | COND | ||||
12/1932 | Condemned | 11225 | COND | ||||
04/1933 | Condemned | 11251 | COND | ||||
05/1933 | Condemned | 11223 | COND | ||||
01/1934 | Condemned | 11256 | COND | ||||
05/1934 | Condemned | 11213 | COND | ||||
05/1934 | Condemned | 11236 | COND | ||||
06/1934 | Condemned | 11224 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 11255 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 11205 | COND | ||||
11/1935 | Condemned | 11239 | COND | ||||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 11253 | 23F | Walton on the Hill | |||
03/1936 | Condemned | 11249 | COND | ||||
11/04/1936 | Reallocation | 11227 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
10/1937 | Condemned | 11257 | COND | ||||
04/1938 | Condemned | 11215 | COND | ||||
22/06/1946 | Reallocation | 11230 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11202 | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11204 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11206 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11207 | 25C | Goole | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11212 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11216 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11217 | 17B | Burton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11218 | 10B | Preston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11221 | 5B | Crewe South | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11222 | 26A | Newton Heath | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11227 | 23A | Bank Hall | 23A | Bank Hall | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11229 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11230 | 23A | Bank Hall | 26B | Agecroft | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11231 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11232 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11234 | 26A | Newton Heath | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11235 | 17B | Burton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11237 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11240 | 26B | Agecroft | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11241 | 25C | Goole | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11244 | 25C | Goole | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11246 | 23A | Bank Hall | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 11253 | 23F | Walton on the Hill | 23A | Bank Hall | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 51204 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 5B | Crewe South | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 51235 | 17B | Burton | 17A | Derby | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 51240 | 26B | Agecroft | 26B | Agecroft | |
11/02/1950 | Reallocation | 51234 | 26A | Newton Heath | 27A | Polmadie | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 51222 | 26A | Newton Heath | 25C | Goole | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 51218 | 10B | Preston | 3E | Monument Lane | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 51218 | 3E | Monument Lane | 5B | Crewe South | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 51221 | 5B | Crewe South | 5B | Crewe South | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 51206 | 23A | Bank Hall | 26B | Agecroft | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 51206 | 26B | Agecroft | 27A | Bank Hall | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 51217 | 17B | Burton | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 51207 | 25C | Goole | 26B | Agecroft | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 51202 | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 51217 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 17B | Burton | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 51202 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 51217 | 17B | Burton | 17B | Burton | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 51218 | 5B | Crewe South | 10B | Preston | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 51218 | 10B | Preston | 5B | Crewe South | |
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 51217 | 17B | Burton | 17A | Derby | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 51240 | 26B | Agecroft | 25A | Wakefield | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 51240 | 25A | Wakefield | 25C | Goole | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 51217 | 17A | Derby | 21C | Bromsgrove | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 51204 | 5B | Crewe South | 8D | Widnes | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 51217 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 17A | Derby | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 51221 | 5B | Crewe South | 6H | Bangor | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 51241 | 25C | Goole | 26B | Agecroft | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 51235 | 17A | Derby | 50A | York (North) | |
08/12/1956 | Condemned | 51216 | 23A | Bank Hall | COND | ||
24/04/1957 | Condemned | 51240 | 25C | Goole | COND | ||
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 51241 | 26B | Agecroft | 53E | Goole | |
24/08/1957 | Condemned | 51212 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | COND | ||
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 51217 | 17A | Derby | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
19/10/1957 | Condemned | 51234 | 27A | Polmadie | COND | ||
25/01/1958 | Condemned | 51202 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | COND | ||
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 51221 | 6H | Bangor | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
10/1958 | Condemned | 51235 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 51232 | 23A | Bank Hall | 17A | Derby | |
12/1958 | Condemned | 51230 | 26B | Agecroft | COND | ||
06/12/1958 | Reallocation | 51204 | 8D | Widnes | 26B | Agecroft | |
13/12/1958 | Reallocation | 51218 | 5B | Crewe South | 27A | Bank Hall | |
14/02/1959 | Reallocation | 51232 | 17A | Derby | 27A | Bank Hall | |
28/02/1959 | Reallocation | 51218 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8D | Widnes | |
07/1959 | Condemned | 51231 | 23A | Bank Hall | COND | ||
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 51218 | 8D | Widnes | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
07/01/1960 | Condemned | 51221 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | COND | ||
09/1960 | Condemned | 51227 | 23A | Bank Hall | COND | ||
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 51229 | 23A | Bank Hall | 26B | Agecroft | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 51237 | 23A | Bank Hall | 26B | Agecroft | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 51232 | 27A | Bank Hall | 24K | Preston | |
07/01/1961 | Reallocation | 51232 | 24K | Preston | 27A | Bank Hall | |
21/01/1961 | Condemned | 51229 | 26B | Agecroft | COND | ||
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 51253 | 23A | Bank Hall | 24K | Preston | |
25/03/1961 | Reallocation | 51253 | 24K | Preston | 27A | Bank Hall | |
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 51246 | 23A | Bank Hall | COND | ||
03/11/1961 | Condemned | 51217 | 98W | COND | |||
18/01/1962 | Condemned | 51241 | 53E | Goole | COND | ||
06/03/1962 | Condemned | 51222 | 25C | Goole | COND | ||
06/03/1962 | Condemned | 51244 | 25C | Goole | COND | ||
17/03/1962 | Condemned | 51207 | 26B | Agecroft | COND | ||
26/05/1962 | Reallocation | 51206 | 27A | Bank Hall | 26B | Agecroft | |
09/06/1962 | Reallocation | 51253 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
25/08/1962 | Reallocation | 51232 | 27A | Bank Hall | 26B | Agecroft | |
08/09/1962 | Condemned | 51204 | 26B | Agecroft | COND | ||
15/09/1962 | Condemned | 51206 | 26B | Agecroft | COND | ||
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 51218 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
25/05/1963 | Condemned | 51237 | 26B | Agecroft | COND | ||
22/06/1963 | Condemned | 51253 | 8C | Speke Junction | COND | ||
07/1963 | Condemned | 51232 | 26B | Agecroft | COND | ||
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 51218 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 51218 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | COND |