LYR/LMS Barton Wright "568" Class 0-6-0
Class | LYR | LMS (1924) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 528 | 11335 | 08/1876 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 529 | 11332 | 08/1876 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 | |
25 | 530 | 11332 | 02/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |
25 | 531 | 11316 | 51316 | 03/1877 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1959 |
24/01/1959 |
25 | 532 | 11330 | 03/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 533 | 11308 | 03/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1939 | 03/1939 | |
25 | 534 | 11307 | 51307 | 03/1877 | 23A 27B 27A 26A W |
Bank Hall Aintree Bank Hall Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 23/02/1957 23/11/1957 |
23/11/1957 |
25 | 535 | 11318 | 51318 | 04/1877 | 8A 8C W |
Edge Hill Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
25 | 536 | 11315 | 04/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 537 | 11321 | 51321 | 07/1877 | 24F W |
Fleetwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/02/1958 |
08/02/1958 |
25 | 538 | 11313 | 51313 | 07/1877 | 6C 8A W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 27/10/1956 |
27/10/1956 |
25 | 539 | 11317 | 07/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 540 | 11331 | 08/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1926 | 10/1926 | |
25 | 541 | 11328 | 08/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1936 | 05/1936 | |
25 | 542 | 11309 | 08/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 543 | 11303 | 08/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 544 | 11343 | 51343 | 02/1878 | 23B 26A W |
Aintree Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1957 30/01/1960 |
30/01/1960 |
25 | 545 | 11354 | 02/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1928 | 04/1928 | |
25 | 546 | 11350 | 02/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 547 | 11361 | 51361 | 02/1878 | 24A 25C W |
Accrington Goole Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/07/1949 27/10/1956 |
27/10/1956 |
25 | 548 | 11351 | 02/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 549 | 11358 | 51358 | 02/1878 | 25A 26A 25D W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 04/09/1948 23/10/1959 |
23/10/1959 |
25 | 550 | 11326 | 06/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 551 | 11337 | 06/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 552 | 11324 | 06/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1963 | 10/1963 | |
25 | 553 | 11305 | 51305 | 06/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1964 | 12/1964 |
25 | 554 | 11314 | 06/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1939 | 03/1939 | |
25 | 555 | 11336 | 51336 | 07/1877 | 24D 24B 26A 24F W |
Lower Darwen Rose Grove Newton Heath Fleetwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1949 11/09/1954 22/02/1958 05/11/1960 |
05/11/1960 |
25 | 556 | 11311 | 08/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1928 | 04/1928 | |
25 | 557 | 11329 | 08/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1932 | 11/1932 | |
25 | 558 | 11304 | 51304 | 08/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1961 | 12/1961 |
25 | 559 | 11325 | 51325 | 08/1877 | 23A 23D W |
Bank Hall Wigan Central (L&Y) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
25 | 560 | 11312 | 09/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 11/1933 | |
25 | 561 | 11319 | 51319 | 09/1877 | 10E 9G W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1958 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
25 | 562 | 11338 | 51338 | 10/1877 | 26D 26A 26A 28B 26A 26A 27E 17B 26A W |
Bury Newton Heath Newton Heath Fleetwood Newton Heath Newton Heath Walton on the Hill Burton Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1949 14/01/1950 11/08/1951 29/09/1951 06/10/1951 01/12/1951 29/12/1956 23/02/1957 20/07/1957 |
20/07/1957 |
25 | 563 | 11323 | 51323 | 10/1877 | 25C W |
Goole Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/05/1956 |
05/05/1956 |
25 | 564 | 11327 | 10/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1947 | 08/11/1947 | |
25 | 565 | 11306 | 10/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 | |
25 | 566 | 11320 | 51320 | 11/1877 | 25D W |
Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 |
10/04/1948 |
25 | 567 | 11310 | 11/1877 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 240 | 11359 | 08/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 | |
25 | 242 | 11366 | 08/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1946 | 01/1946 | |
25 | 257 | 11370 | 09/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 238 | 11363 | 09/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1934 | 09/1934 | |
25 | 143 | 11364 | 09/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1939 | 02/1939 | |
25 | 124 | 11362 | 10/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 245 | 11346 | 10/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 | |
25 | 277 | 11356 | 10/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1932 | 10/1932 | |
25 | 236 | 11345 | 51345 | 12/1878 | 24C W |
Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1956 |
06/10/1956 |
25 | 256 | 11369 | 12/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1939 | 04/1939 | |
25 | 280 | 11357 | 02/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 250 | 11360 | 03/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1938 | 10/1938 | |
25 | 311 | 11365 | 03/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1938 | 03/1938 | |
25 | 249 | 11342 | 51342 | 04/1879 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/09/1948 |
18/09/1948 |
25 | 248 | 11347 | 05/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1939 | 05/1939 | |
25 | 131 | 11368 | 51368 | 05/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1963 | 10/1963 |
25 | 153 | 11372 | 06/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1932 | 08/1932 | |
25 | 268 | 11349 | 06/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 314 | 11344 | 08/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 258 | 11355 | 09/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |
25 | 615 | 11428 | 02/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1928 | 04/1928 | |
25 | 663 | 11489 | 51489 | 02/1880 | 26D W |
Bury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/02/1954 |
10/02/1954 |
25 | 175 | 11425 | 51425 | 03/1880 | 26A 27C 27A W |
Newton Heath Southport Bank Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/09/1953 23/04/1955 07/1956 |
07/1956 |
25 | 324 | 11426 | 03/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 | |
25 | 621 | 11440 | 04/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1934 | 10/1934 | |
25 | 266 | 11411 | 05/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 144 | 11410 | 51410 | 06/1880 | 24B 24A 24A W |
Rose Grove Accrington Accrington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 30/10/1948 03/04/1954 |
03/04/1954 |
25 | 292 | 11458 | 51458 | 06/1880 | 25C 26D 26A 26A W |
Goole Bury Newton Heath Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 17/12/1949 14/01/1950 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
25 | 284 | 11415 | 51415 | 08/1880 | 25A 20F 24D 26A W |
Wakefield Skipton Lower Darwen Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 30/04/1949 18/05/1957 25/10/1958 |
25/10/1958 |
25 | 293 | 11501 | 08/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 303 | 11387 | 10/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 306 | 11385 | 10/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 11/1933 | |
25 | 254 | 11481 | 51481 | 01/1881 | 26D 28B 28B 27A 26A W |
Bury Fleetwood Fleetwood Bank Hall Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/08/1950 09/09/1950 24/03/1956 23/03/1957 26/10/1957 |
26/10/1957 |
25 | 304 | 11418 | 01/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1947 | 12/1947 | |
25 | 307 | 11383 | 02/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1932 | 09/1932 | |
25 | 308 | 11455 | 03/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 309 | 11406 | 05/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1936 | 05/1936 | |
25 | 313 | 11416 | 06/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1928 | 05/1928 | |
25 | 322 | 11444 | 51444 | 07/1881 | 8C 8C 99C W |
Speke Junction Speke Junction Crewe Works Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 11/12/1948 09/1961 |
09/1961 |
25 | 305 | 11511 | 51511 | 09/1881 | 26C W |
Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1955 |
01/10/1955 |
25 | 122 | 11353 | 51353 | 10/1878 | 8A W |
Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1957 |
07/1957 |
25 | 128 | 11352 | 10/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1938 | 04/1938 | |
25 | 164 | 11371 | 51371 | 10/1878 | 23A 26A 27A 24A 26A W |
Bank Hall Newton Heath Bank Hall Accrington Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1957 23/03/1957 10/08/1957 28/12/1957 25/03/1961 |
25/03/1961 |
25 | 168 | 11341 | 11/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1928 | 10/1928 | |
25 | 172 | 11339 | 11/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1927 | 06/1927 | |
25 | 174 | 11334 | 11/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1926 | 10/1926 | |
25 | 178 | 11333 | 11/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1926 | 10/1926 | |
25 | 180 | 11340 | 11/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1928 | 03/1928 | |
25 | 182 | 11367 | 12/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 165 | 11348 | 51348 | 10/1878 | 26C 24F 25E 25E W |
Bolton Fleetwood Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1949 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 05/09/1953 |
05/09/1953 |
25 | 126 | 11389 | 12/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 132 | 11378 | 12/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 11/1933 | |
25 | 133 | 11414 | 12/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 136 | 11379 | 51379 | 12/1879 | 26A 25C W |
Newton Heath Goole Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/03/1950 09/04/1955 |
09/04/1955 |
25 | 137 | 11375 | 51375 | 01/1880 | 23A 23A W |
Bank Hall Bank Hall Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 18/09/1954 |
18/09/1954 |
25 | 138 | 11381 | 51381 | 01/1880 | 25E 26A W |
Sowerby Bridge Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 23/11/1957 |
23/11/1957 |
25 | 140 | 11417 | 01/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |
25 | 148 | 11408 | 51408 | 02/1880 | 25B 26C 26B W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Bolton Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 18/11/1961 17/02/1962 |
17/02/1962 |
25 | 149 | 11437 | 02/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1939 | 09/1939 | |
25 | 163 | 11373 | 03/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 166 | 11419 | 51419 | 05/1880 | 26D 24D 24F W |
Bury Lower Darwen Fleetwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1955 26/02/1955 23/09/1961 |
23/09/1961 |
25 | 167 | 11395 | 05/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |
25 | 170 | 11377 | 06/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 171 | 11420 | 06/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 | |
25 | 173 | 11394 | 51394 | 06/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1960 | 05/1960 |
25 | 176 | 11382 | 06/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 177 | 11392 | 06/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 179 | 11384 | 08/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 181 | 11376 | 51376 | 09/1880 | 24F 26D 26D 26C W |
Fleetwood Bury Bury Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/08/1950 09/09/1950 29/01/1955 16/04/1955 |
16/04/1955 |
25 | 194 | 11474 | 51474 | 09/1880 | 26B 23D 24A 27D 24A W |
Agecroft Wigan Central (L&Y) Accrington Wigan Central (L&Y) Accrington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1949 24/04/1954 14/08/1954 23/02/1957 08/06/1957 |
08/06/1957 |
25 | 196 | 11438 | 51438 | 09/1880 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
25 | 197 | 11405 | 51405 | 09/1880 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 |
11/12/1948 |
25 | 204 | 11308 | 09/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1939 | 03/1939 | |
25 | 207 | 11374 | 09/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1926 | 10/1926 | |
25 | 222 | 11386 | 10/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 568 | 11521 | 51521 | 08/1880 | 25C W |
Goole Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1956 |
20/10/1956 |
25 | 569 | 11485 | 08/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 | |
25 | 570 | 11525 | 09/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1934 | 10/1934 | |
25 | 571 | 11427 | 51427 | 09/1880 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 |
20/11/1948 |
25 | 572 | 11459 | 09/1880 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 02/1938 |
02/1938 | |
25 | 573 | 11409 | 09/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 574 | 11397 | 51397 | 09/1880 | 8C 10E 27B 6E 10D W |
Speke Junction Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Aintree Wrexham Rhosddu Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1948 03/11/1956 26/01/1957 23/02/1957 21/03/1959 |
21/03/1959 |
25 | 575 | 11398 | 10/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 576 | 11518 | 10/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1926 | 10/1926 | |
25 | 577 | 11478 | 10/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |
25 | 578 | 11471 | 51471 | 10/1880 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/10/1954 |
16/10/1954 |
25 | 579 | 11500 | 51500 | 10/1880 | 25A 26B W |
Wakefield Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 16/02/1957 |
16/02/1957 |
25 | 580 | 11462 | 51462 | 10/1880 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/10/1956 |
27/10/1956 |
25 | 581 | 11466 | 11/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 | |
25 | 582 | 11431 | 11/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 12/1933 | |
25 | 583 | 11423 | 51423 | 03/1881 | 24C 28B 24C W |
Lostock Hall Fleetwood Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 24/02/1951 12/1958 |
12/1958 |
25 | 584 | 11424 | 51424 | 04/1881 | 26A 25D W |
Newton Heath Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 02/10/1958 |
02/10/1958 |
25 | 585 | 11486 | 51486 | 04/1881 | 26A 26D 26C W |
Newton Heath Bury Bolton Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 29/01/1955 09/1960 |
09/1960 |
25 | 586 | 11497 | 51497 | 04/1881 | 24B 24A 26A W |
Rose Grove Accrington Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1954 28/12/1957 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
25 | 587 | 11472 | 51472 | 04/1881 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1955 |
23/04/1955 |
25 | 588 | 11445 | 51445 | 04/1881 | 8A W |
Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1960 |
18/06/1960 |
25 | 589 | 11460 | 51460 | 05/1881 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1954 |
10/1954 |
25 | 590 | 11508 | 05/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1946 | 03/1946 | |
25 | 591 | 11442 | 05/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 592 | 11470 | 51470 | 05/1881 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1955 |
08/10/1955 |
25 | 593 | 11509 | 02/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1939 | 10/1939 | |
25 | 594 | 11452 | 03/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1939 | 01/1939 | |
25 | 595 | 11530 | 51530 | 03/1881 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1955 |
26/11/1955 |
25 | 596 | 11446 | 51446 | 03/1881 | 99C W |
Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/03/1962 |
10/03/1962 |
25 | 597 | 11432 | 51432 | 03/1881 | 25C W |
Goole Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/08/1957 |
16/08/1957 |
25 | 598 | 11412 | 51412 | 03/1881 | 99C W |
Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/09/1962 |
01/09/1962 |
25 | 599 | 11421 | 03/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1939 | 12/1939 | |
25 | 600 | 11473 | 04/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 747 | 11413 | 51413 | 04/1881 | 23B 26B W |
Aintree Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1957 12/08/1961 |
12/08/1961 |
25 | 748 | 11447 | 51447 | 04/1881 | 25B 25D 26A W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Mirfield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 24/01/1953 26/01/1957 |
26/01/1957 |
25 | 749 | 11430 | 05/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 | |
25 | 750 | 11520 | 05/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1938 | 06/1938 | |
25 | 751 | 11513 | 51513 | 05/1881 | 26C W |
Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/05/1956 |
05/05/1956 |
25 | 752 | 11456 | 05/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |
25 | 753 | 11435 | 05/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1939 | 01/1939 | |
25 | 754 | 11433 | 06/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | |
25 | 755 | 11399 | 06/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 756 | 11468 | 51468 | 06/1881 | 25A 25B W |
Wakefield Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |
25 | 757 | 11493 | 06/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 11/1933 | |
25 | 758 | 11454 | 06/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 759 | 11403 | 09/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 | |
25 | 760 | 11495 | 51495 | 09/1881 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
25 | 761 | 11526 | 51526 | 09/1881 | 24C W |
Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/09/1957 |
21/09/1957 |
25 | 762 | 11396 | 51396 | 09/1881 | 23A W |
Bank Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1956 |
25/02/1956 |
25 | 763 | 11464 | 51464 | 10/1881 | 26B 24A W |
Agecroft Accrington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 06/10/1956 |
06/10/1956 |
25 | 764 | 11499 | 51499 | 10/1881 | 24D 26B W |
Lower Darwen Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1956 06/1957 |
06/1957 |
25 | 765 | 11469 | 51469 | 11/1881 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
25 | 766 | 11449 | 11/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1928 | 03/1928 | |
25 | 767 | 11436 | 51436 | 11/1881 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1955 |
12/03/1955 |
25 | 768 | 11401 | 11/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1939 | 05/1939 | |
25 | 769 | 11422 | 12/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1939 | 08/1939 | |
25 | 770 | 11402 | 12/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 | |
25 | 771 | 11483 | 01/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 | |
25 | 772 | 11492 | 51492 | 01/1882 | 24B W |
Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 |
07/1949 |
25 | 773 | 11443 | 51443 | 01/1882 | 25C W |
Goole Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
25 | 774 | 11467 | 51467 | 01/1882 | 24D W |
Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 |
13/11/1948 |
25 | 775 | 11391 | 02/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 | |
25 | 776 | 11388 | 02/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1939 | 12/1939 | |
25 | 777 | 11465 | 02/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1939 | 01/1939 | |
25 | 778 | 11429 | 51429 | 02/1882 | 25E 25F 26A 99H 26C 99H W |
Sowerby Bridge Low Moor Newton Heath Horwich Works Bolton Horwich Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 06/05/1950 23/02/1952 18/05/1957 05/10/1957 06/05/1961 |
06/05/1961 |
25 | 779 | 11450 | 02/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1934 | 10/1934 | |
25 | 780 | 11407 | 02/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1942 | 02/1942 | |
25 | 781 | 11512 | 51512 | 02/1882 | 26B 39A W |
Agecroft Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1956 12/07/1958 |
12/07/1958 |
25 | 782 | 11457 | 51457 | 02/1883 | 25A 26A 24C 26A W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Lostock Hall Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 05/10/1957 04/10/1958 21/03/1959 |
21/03/1959 |
25 | 783 | 11390 | 51390 | 03/1882 | 25A 26B 24A 24A 26A W |
Wakefield Agecroft Accrington Accrington Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 05/11/1955 07/07/1956 |
07/07/1956 |
25 | 784 | 11451 | 03/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 11/1933 | |
25 | 785 | 11393 | 03/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |
25 | 786 | 11507 | 03/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 11/1933 | |
25 | 787 | 11503 | 51503 | 03/1882 | 25A 24D 25C W |
Wakefield Lower Darwen Goole Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 16/05/1953 11/04/1957 |
11/04/1957 |
25 | 788 | 11484 | 51484 | 04/1882 | 25A 20F 13B 39A W |
Wakefield Skipton Belle Vue Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 04/03/1950 21/04/1956 13/06/1959 |
13/06/1959 |
25 | 793 | 11439 | 51439 | 12/1882 | 8A 8C W |
Edge Hill Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/07/1949 16/06/1956 |
16/06/1956 |
25 | 794 | 11531 | 12/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 795 | 11434 | 12/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1946 | 04/1946 | |
25 | 796 | 11517 | 12/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1937 | 02/1937 | |
25 | 797 | 11487 | 51487 | 12/1882 | 26D W |
Bury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 |
23/10/1948 |
25 | 798 | 11441 | 51441 | 01/1883 | 6C 10E 8A W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 02/07/1960 18/03/1961 |
18/03/1961 |
25 | 799 | 11404 | 51404 | 01/1883 | 26A 25F 56D W |
Newton Heath Low Moor Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1950 11/10/1958 19/03/1959 |
19/03/1959 |
25 | 800 | 11527 | 01/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1928 | 03/1928 | |
25 | 801 | 11453 | 51453 | 01/1883 | 25D W |
Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1958 |
09/1958 |
25 | 802 | 11524 | 51524 | 02/1883 | 25B 24F W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Fleetwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 10/09/1960 |
10/09/1960 |
25 | 803 | 11475 | 51475 | 03/1883 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1949 |
11/1949 |
25 | 804 | 11463 | 03/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1939 | 06/1939 | |
25 | 805 | 11532 | 03/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1938 | 02/1938 | |
25 | 806 | 11528 | 03/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1939 | 02/1939 | |
25 | 807 | 11400 | 51400 | 03/1883 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 |
12/11/1949 |
25 | 808 | 11448 | 04/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1946 | 06/1946 | |
25 | 809 | 11514 | 51514 | 04/1883 | 24F W |
Fleetwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1953 |
21/11/1953 |
25 | 810 | 11510 | 51510 | 04/1883 | 26A 26G 26G W |
Newton Heath Belle Vue Belle Vue Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1951 11/08/1951 10/1955 |
10/1955 |
25 | 811 | 11461 | 04/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 812 | 11490 | 51490 | 04/1883 | 23C W |
Southport Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/08/1953 |
15/08/1953 |
25 | 843 | 11482 | 51482 | 03/1885 | 25E W |
Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 |
25 | 844 | 11519 | 51519 | 03/1885 | 26C W |
Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/09/1954 |
18/09/1954 |
25 | 845 | 11488 | 51488 | 03/1885 | 24F 26A 25E 26A W |
Fleetwood Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Newton Heath Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 06/05/1950 03/12/1955 10/03/1956 |
10/03/1956 |
25 | 846 | 11496 | 51496 | 03/1885 | 26A 99H 26A 26B W |
Newton Heath Horwich Works Newton Heath Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1953 18/04/1953 18/05/1957 18/03/1961 |
18/03/1961 |
25 | 847 | 11477 | 51477 | 03/1885 | 24F W |
Fleetwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1955 |
13/08/1955 |
25 | 848 | 11506 | 51506 | 04/1885 | 24D W |
Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/05/1957 |
18/05/1957 |
25 | 849 | 11529 | 04/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |
25 | 850 | 11522 | 04/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 12/1933 | |
25 | 851 | 11498 | 51498 | 04/1885 | 24F 24D 26C W |
Fleetwood Lower Darwen Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1955 18/05/1957 26/11/1960 |
26/11/1960 |
25 | 852 | 11491 | 51491 | 04/1885 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 |
23/03/1957 |
25 | 853 | 11476 | 04/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 854 | 11502 | 04/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1939 | 09/1939 | |
25 | 855 | 11479 | 51479 | 04/1885 | 25E 25C W |
Sowerby Bridge Goole Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 06/10/1956 |
06/10/1956 |
25 | 856 | 11523 | 04/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 | |
25 | 857 | 11480 | 05/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | |
25 | 858 | 11494 | 05/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1938 | 11/1938 | |
25 | 859 | 11504 | 51504 | 05/1885 | 26D 26F 39A W |
Bury Belle Vue Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 21/04/1956 24/08/1956 |
24/08/1956 |
25 | 860 | 11516 | 51516 | 05/1885 | 25C W |
Goole Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1956 |
20/10/1956 |
25 | 861 | 11515 | 05/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 | |
25 | 862 | 11505 | 05/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1938 | 05/1938 | |
25 | 928 | 12015 | 08/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1934 | 12/1934 | |
25 | 929 | 12016 | 52016 | 08/1887 | 10B 10C W |
Preston Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/01/1949 20/10/1956 |
20/10/1956 |
25 | 930 | 12017 | 09/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 931 | 12018 | 09/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 12/1933 | |
25 | 932 | 12019 | 52019 | 09/1887 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/09/1949 |
03/09/1949 |
25 | 933 | 12020 | 09/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 934 | 12021 | 52021 | 09/1887 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1955 |
27/08/1955 |
25 | 935 | 12022 | 52022 | 09/1887 | 10A 10C W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1949 30/09/1950 |
30/09/1950 |
25 | 936 | 12023 | 52023 | 10/1886 | 10A 10A 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 02/10/1948 08/04/1950 |
08/04/1950 |
25 | 937 | 12024 | 52024 | 10/1887 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1954 |
22/05/1954 |
25 | 938 | 12025 | 10/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1946 | 05/1946 | |
25 | 939 | 12026 | 10/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1946 | 02/1946 | |
25 | 940 | 12027 | 10/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1935 | 04/1935 | |
25 | 941 | 12028 | 11/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 12/1933 | |
25 | 942 | 12029 | 11/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 943 | 12030 | 52030 | 11/1887 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/10/1952 |
25/10/1952 |
25 | 944 | 12031 | 52031 | 11/1887 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1954 |
12/1954 |
25 | 945 | 12032 | 11/1887 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1948 |
10/01/1948 | |
25 | 946 | 12033 | 12/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |
25 | 947 | 12034 | 52034 | 12/1887 | 10B 10C W |
Preston Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 08/1951 |
08/1951 |
25 | 948 | 12035 | 07/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 949 | 12036 | 52036 | 07/1887 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 |
13/11/1948 |
25 | 950 | 12037 | 52037 | 07/1887 | 25C 25A W |
Goole Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 23/08/1952 |
23/08/1952 |
25 | 951 | 12038 | 07/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1947 | 10/1947 | |
25 | 952 | 12039 | 07/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1946 | 06/1946 | |
25 | 953 | 12040 | 08/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 954 | 12041 | 52041 | 08/1887 | 25C 25A W |
Goole Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1950 14/10/1950 |
14/10/1950 |
25 | 955 | 12042 | 08/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1935 | 04/1935 | |
25 | 956 | 12043 | 52043 | 08/1887 | 25C 25A W |
Goole Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 29/08/1953 |
29/08/1953 |
25 | 957 | 12044 | 52044 | 08/1887 | 25C 25A W |
Goole Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1950 07/1959 |
07/1959 |
25 | 958 | 12045 | 52045 | 08/1887 | 10A 10C W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 13/08/1955 |
13/08/1955 |
25 | 959 | 12046 | 08/1887 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 |
07/02/1948 | |
25 | 960 | 12047 | 52047 | 08/1887 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/01/1950 |
21/01/1950 |
25 | 961 | 12048 | 09/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1932 | 10/1932 | |
25 | 962 | 12049 | 52049 | 09/1887 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 |
09/10/1948 |
25 | 963 | 12050 | 09/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1935 | 04/1935 | |
25 | 964 | 12051 | 52051 | 09/1887 | 10B 10A W |
Preston Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 04/02/1956 |
04/02/1956 |
25 | 965 | 12052 | 09/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 966 | 12053 | 52053 | 09/1887 | 10A 10A 25A 25A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Wakefield Wakefield Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 04/10/1952 01/11/1952 07/03/1955 |
07/03/1955 |
25 | 967 | 12054 | 10/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 968 | 12055 | 10/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 969 | 12056 | 52056 | 10/1887 | 25C 25A W |
Goole Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 18/08/1951 |
18/08/1951 |
25 | 970 | 12057 | 11/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 971 | 12058 | 11/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1932 | 08/1932 | |
25 | 972 | 12059 | 52059 | 11/1887 | 8C 10C W |
Speke Junction Patricroft Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 26/05/1951 |
26/05/1951 |
25 | 973 | 12060 | 12/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 974 | 12061 | 12/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | |
25 | 975 | 12062 | 12/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 | |
25 | 976 | 12063 | 52063 | 12/1887 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/09/1948 |
04/09/1948 |
25 | 977 | 12064 | 52064 | 12/1887 | 10A 10B 10C W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 06/11/1948 02/12/1950 |
02/12/1950 |