Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 559 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1467 Week
» 12612 Month
» 112397 Year
» 1777773 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

HR/LMS Drummond "K" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
02/1936 Condemned 17701       COND  
23/03/1946 Condemned 17696 98W     COND  
12/1946 Condemned 17700       COND  
12/1946 Condemned 17704       COND  
21/07/1947 Condemned 17703 98W     COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17695     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17697     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 17698     30A Corkerhill  
03/01/1948 Reallocation 17697 30D Ayr 30D Ayr  
23/10/1948 Reallocation 17702     30C Ardrossan  
12/02/1949 Condemned 17699 98W     COND  
11/06/1949 Condemned 17693 98W     COND  
22/10/1949 Condemned 17702 30C Ardrossan   COND  
04/02/1950 Condemned 17694 98W     COND  
20/01/1951 Reallocation 17695 30A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
20/01/1951 Reallocation 17698 30A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
17/02/1951 Condemned 57697 98W     COND  
06/12/1951 Condemned 57698 98W     COND  
25/01/1952 Condemned 57695 98W     COND