Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 525 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1433 Week
» 12578 Month
» 112363 Year
» 1777739 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

HR/LMS Drummond "K" Class 0-6-0


HR HR (Renum) LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
134 17693 57693 02/1900 11/06/1949 Corkerhill 49.33
135 17694 57694 02/1900 04/02/1950 Corkerhill 50
136 17695 57695 02/1900 25/01/1952 Hurlford 51.92
137 17696 02/1900 23/03/1946 46.08
138 17697 57697 02/1900 17/02/1951 Ayr 51
139 17698 57698 02/1900 06/12/1951 Hurlford 51.83
18 17699 57699 08/1902 12/02/1949 Corkerhill 46.5
19 17700 08/1902 12/1946 44.33
20 17701 08/1902 02/1936 33.5
21 17702 57702 08/1902 22/10/1949 47.17
36 17703 07/1907 21/07/1947 40
55 37 17704 07/1907 12/1946 39.42