MR/LMS Fowler "4F" Class 0-6-0
Class | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4F | 4027 | 44027 | 11/1924 | 3B 3A 12F W |
Bushbury Bescot Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 17/08/1963 14/11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
4F | 4028 | 44028 | 11/1924 | 14A 16A 17D 20B W |
Cricklewood East Nottingham Rowsley Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 28/01/1956 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 |
4F | 4029 | 44029 | 12/1924 | 14A W |
Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1960 |
02/07/1960 |
4F | 4030 | 44030 | 12/1924 | 16A 15C W |
Nottingham Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/11/1961 04/1964 |
04/1964 |
4F | 4031 | 44031 | 12/1924 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1960 |
05/1960 |
4F | 4032 | 44032 | 12/1924 | 20H 6B 5D W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Mold Junction Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1954 03/12/1955 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4033 | 44033 | 12/1924 | 15A 14A 16A 16A W |
Wellingborough Cricklewood East Nottingham Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 |
4F | 4034 | 44034 | 12/1924 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1963 |
07/1963 |
4F | 4035 | 44035 | 01/1925 | 17B 22B 17B 22B 11B 2F W |
Burton Gloucester Barnwood Burton Gloucester Barnwood Workington Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 16/04/1949 28/05/1949 26/03/1960 05/12/1964 13/02/1965 |
13/02/1965 |
4F | 4036 | 44036 | 01/1925 | 19C 41B 41E W |
Canklow Sheffield Grimesthorpe Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/11/1958 07/05/1960 21/06/1962 |
21/06/1962 |
4F | 4037 | 44037 | 01/1925 | 20B 15A 18A 19C W |
Stourton Wellingborough Toton Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 29/11/1952 24/01/1953 09/1961 |
09/1961 |
4F | 4038 | 44038 | 01/1925 | 25E 24A 5B 24B 24B 27E 27E 21A 18A W |
Sowerby Bridge Accrington Crewe South Rose Grove Rose Grove Walton on the Hill Walton on the Hill Saltley Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 23/10/1948 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 13/10/1962 10/08/1963 11/04/1964 |
11/04/1964 |
4F | 4039 | 44039 | 01/1925 | 16A 19A 55F 56E 56A W |
Nottingham Sheffield Grimesthorpe Manningham Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1956 15/04/1961 13/04/1963 11/01/1964 06/1964 |
06/1964 |
4F | 4040 | 44040 | 01/1925 | 19E 26A 27E 21A 16B W |
Belle Vue Newton Heath Walton on the Hill Saltley Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1955 03/12/1955 13/10/1962 22/06/1963 28/11/1964 |
28/11/1964 |
4F | 4041 | 44041 | 02/1925 | 20F 8F 10G 8F 12A W |
Skipton Springs Branch (Wigan) Skipton Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/04/1963 30/11/1963 11/01/1964 04/04/1964 13/06/1964 |
13/06/1964 |
4F | 4042 | 44042 | 02/1925 | 25E 24D 25C 23B 25D 25C 25D 26G 17A 17C 16C W |
Sowerby Bridge Lower Darwen Goole Aintree Mirfield Goole Mirfield Belle Vue Derby Rowsley Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 13/11/1948 13/08/1949 31/12/1950 26/01/1952 19/04/1952 28/11/1953 21/04/1956 20/06/1959 09/05/1964 17/10/1964 |
17/10/1964 |
4F | 4043 | 44043 | 02/1925 | 18A 21D 21D 15D 14B 14C 18A 15E 16G 16E W |
Toton Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Bedford Kentish Town St Albans Toton Coalville Westhouses Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 21/02/1953 06/09/1958 10/01/1959 16/01/1960 01/08/1964 19/12/1964 13/03/1965 07/1965 |
07/1965 |
4F | 4044 | 44044 | 02/1925 | 20A 55B W |
Holbeck (MR) Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/03/1959 12/07/1965 |
12/07/1965 |
4F | 4045 | 44045 | 03/1925 | 22B 85B W |
Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/05/1964 09/11/1964 |
06/11/1964 |
4F | 4046 | 44046 | 03/1925 | 17B 17D W |
Burton Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4047 | 44047 | 03/1925 | 17B 18A 17B 16A 17A 18A 17A 21A 16A W |
Burton Toton Burton Nottingham Derby Toton Derby Saltley Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 03/12/1955 07/11/1959 16/09/1961 27/01/1962 10/03/1962 07/04/1962 12/01/1963 26/10/1963 |
26/10/1963 |
4F | 4048 | 44048 | 03/1925 | 17B 17A 5E 5F W |
Burton Derby Alsager Uttoxeter Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1955 09/12/1961 23/06/1962 08/1964 |
08/1964 |
4F | 4049 | 44049 | 03/1925 | 21A 17A 16G W |
Saltley Derby Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 07/12/1963 12/1964 |
12/1964 |
4F | 4050 | 44050 | 03/1925 | 17D W |
Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4051 | 44051 | 04/1925 | 14A 15B 18A 16D 16A 15E W |
Cricklewood East Kettering Toton Nottingham Toton Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1962 06/04/1963 09/11/1963 07/03/1964 01/08/1964 12/12/1964 |
12/12/1964 |
4F | 4052 | 44052 | 04/1925 | 14B W |
Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1960 |
18/06/1960 |
4F | 4053 | 44053 | 04/1925 | 18C 16B 18C 18C W |
Hasland Spital Bridge Hasland Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 23/03/1963 |
23/03/1963 |
4F | 4054 | 44054 | 05/1925 | 18C 16G W |
Hasland Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1964 19/12/1964 |
19/12/1964 |
4F | 4055 | 44055 | 05/1925 | 16A 22B 17B 20A 55F 56E W |
Nottingham Gloucester Barnwood Burton Holbeck (MR) Manningham Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 27/10/1951 29/01/1955 24/01/1959 15/12/1962 11/1963 |
11/1963 |
4F | 4056 | 44056 | 05/1925 | 23C 25D 55D W |
Southport Mirfield Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 27/03/1965 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 |
4F | 4057 | 44057 | 08/1925 | 3E 2E 21B 66A 65F 21B 9G 2F 2E 2F W |
Monument Lane Northampton Bescot Polmadie Grangemouth Bescot Gorton Bescot Saltley Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1960 11/04/1961 09/03/1963 16/03/1963 06/07/1963 14/09/1963 05/12/1964 17/07/1965 13/11/1965 13/11/1965 |
13/11/1965 |
4F | 4058 | 44058 | 08/1925 | 3D 2A 2A 6E 6E 1A W |
Aston Rugby Rugby Wrexham Rhosddu Wrexham Rhosddu Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 01/11/1958 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4059 | 44059 | 09/1925 | 9A 11B 9F 3E 9B 9D W |
Longsight Barrow in Furness Heaton Mersey Monument Lane Stockport Edgeley Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 26/03/1955 31/12/1955 19/05/1956 07/11/1959 08/1964 |
08/1964 |
4F | 4060 | 44060 | 09/1925 | 11A 12A 24L 12A W |
Carnforth Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 10/03/1962 16/06/1962 21/03/1964 |
21/03/1964 |
4F | 4061 | 44061 | 09/1925 | 3A 3D 4B 4B 9A 5E 8B 24G 9F 24G 12D W |
Bescot Aston Northampton Northampton Longsight Alsager Warrington Dallam Skipton Heaton Mersey Skipton Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 23/03/1957 07/11/1959 05/11/1960 12/01/1963 06/04/1963 27/04/1963 19/09/1964 12/06/1965 |
12/06/1965 |
4F | 4062 | 44062 | 09/1925 | 23C 25C 25D 25A 25D 56F 56A W |
Southport Goole Mirfield Wakefield Mirfield Low Moor Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 31/12/1950 30/01/1954 06/11/1954 21/09/1957 16/12/1961 09/1962 |
09/1962 |
4F | 4063 | 44063 | 09/1925 | 5E 5B 13D 5E 5E 8B 9M 10G 9L W |
Alsager Crewe South Shoeburyness Alsager Alsager Warrington Dallam Bury Skipton Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 31/12/1949 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 19/11/1960 20/06/1964 28/11/1964 01/05/1965 12/06/1965 |
12/06/1965 |
4F | 4064 | 44064 | 10/1925 | 12D 8E 8E 2A 5D W |
Workington Brunswick Brunswick Rugby Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 16/05/1953 23/05/1959 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4065 | 44065 | 10/1925 | 6B 12B 8C 12F W |
Mold Junction Carlisle Upperby Speke Junction Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 11/06/1960 17/09/1960 30/01/1965 |
30/01/1965 |
4F | 4066 | 44066 | 10/1925 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4067 | 44067 | 10/1925 | 5D 3B 5D 1C 1A 5F 3D 5E W |
Stoke Bushbury Stoke Watford Willesden Uttoxeter Aston Alsager Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1950 05/08/1950 23/02/1952 16/06/1956 23/02/1957 04/10/1958 22/11/1958 08/04/1961 |
08/04/1961 |
4F | 4068 | 44068 | 10/1925 | 5D W |
Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4069 | 44069 | 10/1925 | 3C 5D 9B 9A 8F W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Stoke Stockport Edgeley Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 07/10/1950 04/10/1952 22/03/1958 12/10/1963 |
12/10/1963 |
4F | 4070 | 44070 | 11/1925 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1962 |
26/06/1962 |
4F | 4071 | 44071 | 11/1925 | 19C 41E W |
Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1962 22/04/1963 |
22/04/1963 |
4F | 4072 | 44072 | 11/1925 | 2B 2C 2A 1E W |
Bletchley Northampton Rugby Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 13/10/1951 30/01/1954 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4073 | 44073 | 11/1925 | 6B W |
Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4074 | 44074 | 11/1925 | 9B 5D 66A 67B 5D W |
Stockport Edgeley Stoke Polmadie Hurlford Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 09/03/1963 16/03/1963 27/07/1963 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4075 | 44075 | 11/1925 | 12D 11A 5D 9B 5E 9B 6H 2E 8G W |
Workington Carnforth Stoke Stockport Edgeley Alsager Stockport Edgeley Bangor Northampton Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 22/03/1952 21/02/1953 20/12/1958 03/01/1959 07/11/1959 11/06/1960 18/03/1961 27/11/1965 |
27/11/1965 |
4F | 4076 | 44076 | 11/1925 | 2C 8F 8B 9L W |
Northampton Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1961 13/07/1963 02/05/1964 10/07/1965 |
10/07/1965 |
4F | 4077 | 44077 | 11/1925 | 3D 5D 5D W |
Aston Stoke Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/08/1950 09/09/1950 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4078 | 44078 | 11/1925 | 9A 3C 3A 9G 9E 17C 17A 9G W |
Longsight Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Rowsley Derby Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 14/06/1958 21/02/1959 09/05/1959 09/01/1960 14/01/1961 11/02/1961 18/04/1964 |
18/04/1964 |
4F | 4079 | 44079 | 11/1925 | 10D 5E 5B 5E 5B 5B 5E 5D W |
Plodder Lane Alsager Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Crewe South Alsager Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 17/04/1948 14/08/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 13/10/1951 23/06/1962 07/11/1964 |
07/11/1964 |
4F | 4080 | 44080 | 11/1925 | 9D 19D 19D 9E 17C 16C 15E W |
Buxton (LNWR) Heaton Mersey Heaton Mersey Trafford Park (LMS) Rowsley Derby Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 28/01/1956 09/01/1960 09/05/1964 30/05/1964 11/07/1964 |
11/07/1964 |
4F | 4081 | 44081 | 11/1925 | 12B 24L 12B W |
Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/11/1962 09/03/1963 25/09/1965 |
25/09/1965 |
4F | 4082 | 44082 | 09/1925 | 16C 18A 16B 19C W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1956 16/06/1956 11/08/1956 09/1961 |
09/1961 |
4F | 4083 | 44083 | 09/1925 | 11E 24L 9D W |
Tebay Carnforth Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 21/04/1962 14/12/1963 |
14/12/1963 |
4F | 4084 | 44084 | 10/1925 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4085 | 44085 | 10/1925 | 17C W |
Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/10/1963 |
12/10/1963 |
4F | 4086 | 44086 | 11/1925 | 12B 12B 12C 11B 11B 8G 12C W |
Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Durran Hill (Carlisle) Barrow in Furness Barrow in Furness Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 02/10/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 18/06/1960 21/08/1965 13/11/1965 |
13/11/1965 |
4F | 4087 | 44087 | 11/1925 | 17B 22B 17B 22B 19A 55D W |
Burton Gloucester Barnwood Burton Gloucester Barnwood Sheffield Grimesthorpe Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 16/04/1949 28/05/1949 23/03/1957 15/04/1961 27/02/1962 |
27/02/1962 |
4F | 4088 | 44088 | 11/1925 | 21A 18A 16B 18D W |
Saltley Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/10/1953 16/06/1956 05/10/1957 10/11/1961 |
10/11/1961 |
4F | 4089 | 44089 | 11/1925 | 18A 19C 19C W |
Toton Canklow Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 12/1963 |
12/1963 |
4F | 4090 | 44090 | 11/1925 | 19D 9A 9F W |
Heaton Mersey Longsight Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 09/08/1952 28/10/1961 |
28/10/1961 |
4F | 4091 | 44091 | 11/1925 | 18A 18A 21A 16B W |
Toton Toton Saltley Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/09/1958 06/12/1958 16/12/1961 08/02/1964 |
08/02/1964 |
4F | 4092 | 44092 | 11/1925 | 21A 9D W |
Saltley Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/04/1964 05/09/1964 |
05/09/1964 |
4F | 4093 | 44093 | 11/1925 | 5D W |
Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4094 | 44094 | 11/1925 | 20B 56E W |
Stourton Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/12/1962 03/05/1963 |
03/05/1963 |
4F | 4095 | 44095 | 11/1925 | 16A W |
Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4096 | 44096 | 11/1925 | 22C 26D 9G W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Bury Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1960 22/02/1964 10/1964 |
10/1964 |
4F | 4097 | 44097 | 11/1925 | 16B 41B 56A 55F W |
Spital Bridge Sheffield Grimesthorpe Wakefield Manningham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1960 15/04/1961 25/11/1961 02/06/1963 |
02/06/1963 |
4F | 4098 | 44098 | 11/1925 | 20D 55D W |
Normanton Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1962 05/12/1963 |
05/12/1963 |
4F | 4099 | 44099 | 12/1925 | 20D 55D W |
Normanton Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1962 15/02/1965 |
15/02/1965 |
4F | 4100 | 44100 | 12/1925 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/03/1963 |
30/03/1963 |
4F | 4101 | 44101 | 12/1925 | 17A 17D W |
Derby Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 05/1963 |
05/1963 |
4F | 4102 | 44102 | 12/1925 | 22D 82F W |
Templecombe (S&D) Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/11/1963 14/09/1964 |
01/09/1964 |
4F | 4103 | 44103 | 12/1925 | 17C W |
Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4104 | 44104 | 12/1925 | 19D 18D W |
Heaton Mersey Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 24/05/1962 |
24/05/1962 |
4F | 4105 | 44105 | 12/1925 | 25C 24D 27D 24G W |
Goole Lower Darwen Wigan Central (L&Y) Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 11/08/1951 05/10/1957 28/10/1961 |
28/10/1961 |
4F | 4106 | 44106 | 01/1926 | 18A W |
Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/02/1964 |
15/02/1964 |
4F | 4107 | 44107 | 12/1924 | 18C 20C 55B W |
Hasland Royston Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1954 07/11/1959 09/1961 |
09/1961 |
4F | 4108 | 44108 | 01/1925 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4109 | 44109 | 02/1925 | 17C W |
Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4110 | 44110 | 03/1925 | 19D 16B 16B 2E 2B 2E 21B 21D 8F 9D W |
Heaton Mersey Spital Bridge Spital Bridge Northampton Nuneaton Northampton Bescot Aston Springs Branch (Wigan) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 06/02/1960 07/05/1960 11/06/1960 11/04/1961 10/06/1961 14/07/1962 15/09/1962 04/1964 |
04/1964 |
4F | 4111 | 44111 | 03/1925 | 18A 19D 18D 19C W |
Toton Heaton Mersey Staveley (Barrow Hill) Canklow Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 21/02/1948 15/01/1949 09/1961 |
09/1961 |
4F | 4112 | 44112 | 03/1925 | 22A 21A 17A 17A 21A 17B 17B 21A 21A 17A 21A W |
Bristol Barrow Road Saltley Derby Derby Saltley Burton Burton Saltley Saltley Derby Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 17/03/1951 24/03/1951 28/04/1951 12/05/1951 19/05/1951 02/06/1951 16/06/1951 27/10/1951 11/04/1961 19/01/1963 |
19/01/1963 |
4F | 4113 | 44113 | 05/1925 | 16C 16A 17B 17C 16G W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Nottingham Burton Coalville Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/10/1949 27/02/1954 24/04/1954 19/12/1964 29/01/1966 |
29/01/1966 |
4F | 4114 | 44114 | 05/1925 | 19E 39A W |
Belle Vue Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1956 18/05/1963 |
18/05/1963 |
4F | 4115 | 44115 | 05/1925 | 3C 3E 5E 5D 8B W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Monument Lane Alsager Stoke Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 20/06/1959 12/12/1959 09/11/1963 10/07/1965 |
10/07/1965 |
4F | 4116 | 44116 | 05/1925 | 1A W |
Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4117 | 44117 | 06/1925 | 19D 16B 16B 9G 6B 1E 2A 8G W |
Heaton Mersey Spital Bridge Spital Bridge Northwich Mold Junction Bletchley Rugby Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 29/11/1952 31/10/1953 28/11/1959 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4118 | 44118 | 06/1925 | 11A 5D 5D 16A 16A 18B 18B 27F 18B 27E 15A 18A 17A 16G W |
Carnforth Stoke Stoke Nottingham Nottingham Westhouses Westhouses Brunswick Westhouses Walton on the Hill Wellingborough Toton Derby Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 27/01/1951 28/02/1951 26/05/1951 16/06/1951 22/04/1961 01/07/1961 15/09/1962 22/09/1962 08/12/1962 20/07/1963 05/12/1964 15/05/1965 |
15/05/1965 |
4F | 4119 | 44119 | 06/1925 | 10D 19E 19E 26A 24G 24D W |
Plodder Lane Belle Vue Belle Vue Newton Heath Skipton Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 21/04/1956 05/10/1957 23/01/1960 07/12/1963 |
07/12/1963 |
4F | 4120 | 44120 | 07/1925 | 10C 1B 11B 3D 5D 4B 3D 3D W |
Patricroft Camden Barrow in Furness Aston Stoke Northampton Aston Aston Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 22/06/1946 01/01/1948 14/02/1948 12/11/1949 23/02/1952 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4121 | 44121 | 07/1925 | 1B 12B 8F W |
Camden Carlisle Upperby Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 29/04/1961 16/01/1965 |
16/01/1965 |
4F | 4122 | 44122 | 07/1925 | 18D 18B 18D 15B 17C 18C W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Westhouses Staveley (Barrow Hill) Kettering Rowsley Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/02/1954 27/03/1954 29/12/1956 19/04/1958 06/09/1958 01/09/1962 |
01/09/1962 |
4F | 4123 | 44123 | 07/1925 | 15C 22B 22B 85B W |
Leicester Midland Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 04/05/1964 03/06/1965 |
03/06/1965 |
4F | 4124 | 44124 | 07/1925 | 17B 9G W |
Burton Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1962 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4125 | 44125 | 08/1925 | 10E 5E 5B 5E 5B 5B 5E 9D 12B 8F 24G 10H 10G W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Alsager Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Crewe South Alsager Buxton (LNWR) Carlisle Upperby Springs Branch (Wigan) Skipton Lower Darwen Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 12/06/1948 24/09/1949 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 20/10/1951 09/07/1960 15/10/1960 29/04/1961 12/01/1963 26/09/1964 24/10/1964 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 |
4F | 4126 | 44126 | 08/1925 | 11A 5E 5B 5E 5E 12A 5E 5D 6C 5D W |
Carnforth Alsager Crewe South Alsager Alsager Carlisle Upperby Alsager Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 17/04/1948 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 08/10/1955 09/12/1961 23/06/1962 29/06/1963 24/08/1963 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4127 | 44127 | 08/1925 | 19C 8E 8C 99C 8G W |
Canklow Brunswick Speke Junction Crewe Works Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 16/09/1961 30/09/1961 25/11/1961 16/01/1965 |
16/01/1965 |
4F | 4128 | 44128 | 08/1925 | 19C W |
Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4129 | 44129 | 08/1925 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/09/1962 |
27/09/1962 |
4F | 4130 | 44130 | 09/1925 | 18B W |
Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1964 |
12/12/1964 |
4F | 4131 | 44131 | 09/1925 | 16A 14A 16A 16A 18B 21A 9M W |
Nottingham Cricklewood East Nottingham Nottingham Westhouses Saltley Bury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 18/11/1961 07/04/1962 25/04/1964 14/11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
4F | 4132 | 44132 | 09/1925 | 16A W |
Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/08/1963 |
03/08/1963 |
4F | 4133 | 44133 | 09/1925 | 18A 18C 18A W |
Toton Hasland Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1957 07/11/1959 09/11/1963 |
09/11/1963 |
4F | 4134 | 44134 | 09/1925 | 17D 15E W |
Rowsley Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/05/1964 28/11/1964 |
28/11/1964 |
4F | 4135 | 44135 | 09/1925 | 22A 22B 22B 22A 82G 82E W |
Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Barnwood Bristol Barrow Road Templecombe (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 31/10/1953 21/03/1959 05/09/1959 04/1965 |
21/04/1965 |
4F | 4136 | 44136 | 10/1925 | 18B 18C W |
Westhouses Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1955 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4137 | 44137 | 10/1925 | 21A 5D 2E 99C W |
Saltley Stoke Saltley Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/09/1964 17/10/1964 05/12/1964 27/02/1965 |
27/02/1965 |
4F | 4138 | 44138 | 10/1925 | 21B 21A 9E 14B 16A 17A W |
Bournville Saltley Trafford Park (LMS) Kentish Town Nottingham Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 09/05/1959 18/06/1960 28/10/1961 18/11/1961 14/07/1962 |
14/07/1962 |
4F | 4139 | 44139 | 10/1925 | 21A 14A 14A 16A 16F 16D 16D 16E 2F W |
Saltley Cricklewood East Cricklewood East Nottingham Burton Nottingham Nottingham Kirkby in Ashfield Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1949 24/12/1949 03/11/1951 25/04/1964 23/05/1964 30/05/1964 08/08/1964 06/02/1965 21/08/1965 |
21/08/1965 |
4F | 4140 | 44140 | 10/1925 | 18A 16C 18A W |
Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Toton Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 28/01/1956 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4141 | 44141 | 11/1925 | 20C W |
Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1961 |
03/07/1961 |
4F | 4142 | 44142 | 11/1925 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4143 | 44143 | 11/1925 | 17B 14B 21A W |
Burton Kentish Town Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1955 04/10/1958 13/10/1962 |
13/10/1962 |
4F | 4144 | 44144 | 11/1925 | 19D 9A 9F W |
Heaton Mersey Longsight Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 04/10/1952 08/08/1959 |
08/08/1959 |
4F | 4145 | 44145 | 11/1925 | 21A 18A W |
Saltley Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/10/1951 21/02/1959 |
21/02/1959 |
4F | 4146 | 44146 | 11/1925 | 22D 71G W |
Templecombe (S&D) Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/07/1957 28/11/1964 |
13/11/1964 |
4F | 4147 | 44147 | 11/1925 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1961 |
09/1961 |
4F | 4146 | 44148 | 11/1925 | 17C W |
Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/05/1961 |
20/05/1961 |
4F | 4149 | 44149 | 11/1925 | 20G 24G W |
Hellifield Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 07/11/1964 |
07/11/1964 |
4F | 4150 | 44150 | 11/1925 | 18A 21A 18A 18B 15D W |
Toton Saltley Toton Westhouses Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/09/1948 13/08/1955 05/11/1955 28/03/1959 26/01/1963 |
26/01/1963 |
4F | 4151 | 44151 | 12/1925 | 20A 20E 20D 16A 16A 17A 9G W |
Holbeck (MR) Manningham Normanton Nottingham Nottingham Derby Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 30/10/1948 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 18/11/1961 12/05/1962 07/12/1963 |
07/12/1963 |
4F | 4152 | 44152 | 12/1925 | 16B 16B 31B W |
Spital Bridge Spital Bridge March Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 06/02/1960 09/1961 |
09/1961 |
4F | 4153 | 44153 | 12/1925 | 20D 20G 20D 20B 20B 56E W |
Normanton Hellifield Normanton Stourton Stourton Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 30/07/1949 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 15/12/1962 29/04/1963 |
29/04/1963 |
4F | 4154 | 44154 | 12/1925 | 18D 18A 27F 18B W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Toton Brunswick Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 04/10/1958 09/05/1959 07/04/1962 |
07/04/1962 |
4F | 4155 | 44155 | 12/1925 | 16B 9G 2F W |
Spital Bridge Northwich Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 05/12/1964 09/10/1965 |
09/10/1965 |
4F | 4156 | 44156 | 12/1925 | 27J 17B 17C 15A 15D 15C W |
Corkerhill Burton Coalville Wellingborough Coalville Kettering Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 20/08/1949 16/01/1960 01/12/1962 01/02/1964 22/02/1964 |
22/02/1964 |
4F | 4157 | 44157 | 12/1925 | 18A 2B 12C W |
Toton Nuneaton Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1956 12/07/1958 31/07/1965 |
31/07/1965 |
4F | 4158 | 44158 | 12/1925 | 16A 15C W |
Nottingham Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/11/1961 14/07/1962 |
14/07/1962 |
4F | 4159 | 44159 | 02/1926 | 30B 67A 67B 67D 67A 67B W |
Hurlford Corkerhill Hurlford Ardrossan Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 04/10/1952 08/06/1957 19/12/1959 18/11/1961 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4160 | 44160 | 02/1926 | 15A 15C 21A 9G 9E 12D W |
Wellingborough Leicester Midland Saltley Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/03/1950 19/06/1954 25/04/1964 05/12/1964 02/01/1965 11/12/1965 |
11/12/1965 |
4F | 4161 | 44161 | 02/1926 | 20C 18A W |
Royston Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4162 | 44162 | 02/1926 | 18C 18A W |
Hasland Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 14/12/1963 |
14/12/1963 |
4F | 4163 | 44163 | 02/1926 | 17D 16B 17D W |
Rowsley Spital Bridge Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 29/07/1950 09/07/1960 |
09/07/1960 |
4F | 4164 | 44164 | 02/1926 | 16A 17A 6B 9G W |
Nottingham Derby Mold Junction Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 08/08/1953 12/05/1962 20/07/1963 |
20/07/1963 |
4F | 4165 | 44165 | 02/1926 | 19A 21A 9L W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Saltley Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/03/1950 25/04/1964 08/1964 |
08/1964 |
4F | 4166 | 44166 | 02/1926 | 17B 17D 17C W |
Burton Rowsley Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1954 01/01/1955 27/01/1962 |
27/01/1962 |
4F | 4167 | 44167 | 03/1926 | 22B 82G W |
Gloucester Barnwood Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/12/1962 22/01/1964 |
22/01/1964 |
4F | 4168 | 44168 | 03/1926 | 17D 17B 21A 16A 16B W |
Rowsley Burton Saltley Nottingham Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 07/11/1959 12/01/1963 06/07/1963 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4169 | 44169 | 03/1926 | 22A 17A 15A 9G 9E 9L W |
Bristol Barrow Road Derby Wellingborough Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 04/03/1961 18/03/1961 08/08/1964 28/11/1964 28/08/1965 |
28/08/1965 |
4F | 4170 | 44170 | 03/1926 | 17B 20D 55H 55E W |
Burton Normanton Neville Hill Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 14/04/1962 28/12/1963 14/10/1965 |
14/10/1965 |
4F | 4171 | 44171 | 03/1926 | 17B 19A 20D 21A 14E 15A 15E W |
Burton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Normanton Saltley Bedford Wellingborough Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 18/04/1953 01/01/1955 16/12/1961 03/08/1963 23/11/1963 09/05/1964 |
09/05/1964 |
4F | 4172 | 44172 | 03/1926 | 17D 16C W |
Rowsley Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/05/1964 09/05/1964 |
09/05/1964 |
4F | 4173 | 44173 | 04/1926 | 19C 18B W |
Canklow Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4174 | 44174 | 04/1926 | 17D 19A 41D 41E W |
Rowsley Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 16/09/1961 16/06/1962 12/1963 |
12/1963 |
4F | 4175 | 44175 | 04/1926 | 22B 17B 22B 22B 17B 15C 15A W |
Gloucester Barnwood Burton Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Barnwood Burton Leicester Midland Wellingborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 01/12/1956 29/12/1956 26/01/1957 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4176 | 44176 | 04/1926 | 21A 17A W |
Saltley Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1956 06/07/1963 |
06/07/1963 |
4F | 4177 | 44177 | 12/1924 | 17A 17C 18B 27E 9G 9E W |
Derby Rowsley Westhouses Walton on the Hill Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 25/07/1959 15/09/1962 04/01/1964 10/10/1964 07/11/1964 |
07/11/1964 |
4F | 4178 | 44178 | 12/1924 | 19D 17C 18A 16G W |
Heaton Mersey Rowsley Toton Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 12/07/1958 05/10/1963 07/11/1964 |
07/11/1964 |
4F | 4179 | 44179 | 01/1925 | 20D 20B 20B 21A 21A 2F 2E 5D 2E W |
Normanton Stourton Stourton Saltley Saltley Bescot Saltley Stoke Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 28/12/1963 18/04/1964 15/08/1964 24/10/1964 05/12/1964 |
05/12/1964 |
4F | 4180 | 44180 | 02/1925 | 16A 17C 21A W |
Nottingham Coalville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 14/04/1962 11/04/1964 |
11/04/1964 |
4F | 4181 | 44181 | 02/1925 | 12A 8B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/11/1963 14/08/1965 |
14/08/1965 |
4F | 4182 | 44182 | 02/1925 | 18D 14A 15C 15A 15C W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Cricklewood East Leicester Midland Wellingborough Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1954 09/10/1954 21/05/1955 08/10/1960 12/09/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
4F | 4183 | 44183 | 03/1925 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/10/1963 |
26/10/1963 |
4F | 4184 | 44184 | 03/1925 | 21A 15C 21A 16A 15E W |
Saltley Leicester Midland Saltley Nottingham Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 06/09/1958 12/01/1963 21/09/1963 26/10/1963 |
26/10/1963 |
4F | 4185 | 44185 | 03/1925 | 21A 9G W |
Saltley Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/04/1964 14/11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
4F | 4186 | 44186 | 03/1925 | 21A 21D 2E 5B 5D 12H 12E W |
Saltley Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Northampton Crewe South Stoke Stranraer Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 21/02/1953 05/11/1955 15/08/1959 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 19/10/1963 |
19/10/1963 |
4F | 4187 | 44187 | 04/1925 | 18A 21A W |
Toton Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/09/1948 21/07/1962 |
21/07/1962 |
4F | 4188 | 44188 | 04/1925 | 18B 27E 9G 10G 2F W |
Westhouses Walton on the Hill Gorton Skipton Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 04/01/1964 03/10/1964 05/12/1964 13/11/1965 |
13/11/1965 |
4F | 4189 | 44189 | 04/1925 | 12A 68B 67A 67C 67B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Dumfries Corkerhill Ayr Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1955 27/10/1956 18/11/1961 08/09/1962 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4190 | 44190 | 05/1925 | 21A 18A 17C 16B 16A 9G W |
Saltley Toton Coalville Kirkby in Ashfield Nottingham Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/10/1953 08/10/1955 10/01/1959 20/06/1959 25/02/1961 07/09/1963 |
07/09/1963 |
4F | 4191 | 44191 | 05/1925 | 18B W |
Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1964 |
08/08/1964 |
4F | 4192 | 44192 | 06/1925 | 12D 11A 8G 27E 10H 9E 12D W |
Workington Carnforth Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Walton on the Hill Lower Darwen Trafford Park (LMS) Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 19/04/1958 22/06/1963 04/01/1964 22/02/1964 12/12/1964 24/04/1965 |
24/04/1965 |
4F | 4193 | 44193 | 06/1925 | 29A 66A 66B W |
Perth South Polmadie Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/12/1958 16/06/1962 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4194 | 44194 | 06/1925 | 31A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4195 | 44195 | 07/1925 | 17A 14A 14A 16A 9E 9G 8B W |
Derby Cricklewood East Cricklewood East Nottingham Trafford Park (LMS) Gorton Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1949 24/12/1949 03/11/1951 18/11/1961 12/05/1962 12/12/1964 06/03/1965 |
06/03/1965 |
4F | 4196 | 44196 | 07/1925 | 29A 66B 66A 66C 66B W |
Perth South Motherwell Polmadie Hamilton (West) Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 19/11/1949 19/01/1957 26/09/1959 08/01/1962 |
08/01/1962 |
4F | 4197 | 44197 | 10/1925 | 20F W |
Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4198 | 44198 | 10/1925 | 30B 67A 67B W |
Hurlford Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 18/11/1961 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4199 | 44199 | 10/1925 | 12A 68B 65B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Dumfries St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1951 22/12/1956 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4200 | 44200 | 10/1925 | 21A 18A 8G 12C W |
Saltley Toton Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/10/1951 02/11/1963 19/09/1964 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 |
4F | 4201 | 44201 | 10/1925 | 20H 21A 21A W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Saltley Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 12/09/1959 |
12/09/1959 |
4F | 4202 | 44202 | 10/1925 | 16C W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/09/1963 |
07/09/1963 |
4F | 4203 | 44203 | 11/1925 | 21A 21B 21A 17C 17A 15C 14E 16B 15C 15E 16G W |
Saltley Bournville Saltley Rowsley Derby Leicester Midland Bedford Kirkby in Ashfield Kettering Coalville Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/12/1957 22/11/1958 30/12/1961 06/01/1962 24/03/1962 07/04/1962 03/08/1963 14/09/1963 10/10/1964 19/12/1964 26/03/1966 |
26/03/1966 |
4F | 4204 | 44204 | 11/1925 | 21D 21A 18B 16A W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Saltley Westhouses Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 25/02/1956 14/06/1958 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4205 | 44205 | 11/1925 | 16C 14A 16C 18A 18D W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Cricklewood East Kirkby in Ashfield Toton Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 17/07/1954 28/01/1956 11/08/1956 03/03/1963 |
03/03/1963 |
4F | 4206 | 44206 | 11/1925 | 16C 19C W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1956 02/06/1961 |
02/06/1961 |
4F | 4207 | 44207 | 11/1925 | 21A 20A 55B W |
Saltley Holbeck (MR) Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 24/01/1959 11/11/1963 |
11/11/1963 |
4F | 4208 | 44208 | 11/1925 | 1A 8B 12A 5E 5D 6C 5D W |
Willesden Warrington Dallam Carlisle Kingmoor Alsager Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1960 15/10/1960 09/12/1961 07/04/1962 29/06/1963 14/09/1963 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4209 | 44209 | 11/1925 | 17D 21A 22B 82E W |
Rowsley Saltley Gloucester Barnwood Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/11/1951 29/12/1951 16/06/1962 01/06/1963 |
14/06/1963 |
4F | 4210 | 44210 | 11/1925 | 14A 14B 14B 14A 18A 15E 2F W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Kentish Town Cricklewood East Toton Coalville Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1949 24/12/1949 25/08/1962 16/02/1963 18/07/1964 05/12/1964 09/10/1965 |
09/10/1965 |
4F | 4211 | 44211 | 12/1925 | 19A 18B 21A 21A 10A 10G W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Westhouses Saltley Saltley Carnforth Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 25/04/1964 17/10/1964 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 |
4F | 4212 | 44212 | 12/1925 | 19A 41D 41E W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1961 26/05/1962 12/1963 |
12/1963 |
4F | 4213 | 44213 | 12/1925 | 21A 18A 16E W |
Saltley Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/02/1962 09/11/1963 06/1964 |
06/1964 |
4F | 4214 | 44214 | 12/1925 | 17A W 16G |
Derby Withdrawn Westhouses |
01/01/1948 12/1964 05/12/1964 |
12/1964 |
4F | 4215 | 44215 | 12/1925 | 16A 16A 16E W |
Nottingham Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/04/1964 08/08/1964 20/02/1965 |
20/02/1965 |
4F | 4216 | 44216 | 12/1925 | 20D W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1962 |
09/1962 |
4F | 4217 | 44217 | 01/1926 | 20D 15D 18A 18C W |
Normanton Bedford Toton Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1954 06/11/1954 26/01/1957 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4218 | 44218 | 01/1926 | 16B 16B 27E 17B 17A 21A 5B 5D 5B 16G W |
Spital Bridge Spital Bridge Walton on the Hill Burton Derby Saltley Crewe South Stoke Crewe South Westhouses Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 21/02/1953 03/02/1962 10/02/1962 07/04/1962 28/12/1963 22/08/1964 24/10/1964 02/01/1965 26/03/1966 |
26/03/1966 |
4F | 4219 | 44219 | 01/1926 | 3D 2E 8B W |
Aston Northampton Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1954 30/06/1962 30/11/1963 |
30/11/1963 |
4F | 4220 | 44220 | 01/1926 | 23B 25C 24D 27D 24G 9F 9G W |
Aintree Goole Lower Darwen Wigan Central (L&Y) Skipton Heaton Mersey Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 31/12/1950 11/08/1951 08/11/1958 04/05/1963 03/08/1963 26/09/1964 |
26/09/1964 |
4F | 4221 | 44221 | 01/1926 | 25C 24A 5B 24B 24B 27E 27E 27D 26A W |
Goole Accrington Crewe South Rose Grove Rose Grove Walton on the Hill Walton on the Hill Wigan Central (L&Y) Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 23/10/1948 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 28/11/1953 15/09/1962 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4222 | 44222 | 01/1926 | 20F 91E 27D 10G 10H 10G W |
Skipton To Eastern Region Wigan Central (L&Y) Skipton Lower Darwen Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1949 09/04/1960 18/04/1964 24/10/1964 07/11/1964 14/11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
4F | 4223 | 44223 | 01/1926 | 16A 91E W |
Nottingham To Eastern Region Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1949 09/11/1963 |
09/11/1963 |
4F | 4224 | 44224 | 01/1926 | 21A 17A 16C 18A W |
Saltley Derby Kirkby in Ashfield Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 21/05/1955 28/01/1956 03/02/1962 |
03/02/1962 |
4F | 4225 | 44225 | 02/1926 | 24D 27D W |
Lower Darwen Wigan Central (L&Y) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1951 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4226 | 44226 | 02/1926 | 17B 21A 21A W |
Burton Saltley Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/04/1951 19/05/1951 09/1964 |
09/1964 |
4F | 4227 | 44227 | 02/1926 | 20A 17C 21A W |
Holbeck (MR) Coalville Saltley Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 19/04/1952 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4228 | 44228 | 02/1926 | 13A 14B 14B 91E 14A 14E W |
Plaistow Kentish Town Kentish Town To Eastern Region Cricklewood East Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/03/1951 24/03/1951 19/05/1951 22/03/1952 18/11/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4229 | 44229 | 02/1926 | 22B 18B W |
Gloucester Barnwood Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 21/11/1964 |
21/11/1964 |
4F | 4230 | 44230 | 02/1926 | 16A 16D 16C 15A 21A W |
Nottingham Mansfield Kirkby in Ashfield Wellingborough Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1953 02/01/1954 30/01/1954 01/01/1955 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4231 | 44231 | 02/1926 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/06/1963 |
15/06/1963 |
4F | 4232 | 44232 | 03/1926 | 19C 19C 8E 8C 8B W |
Canklow Canklow Brunswick Speke Junction Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 23/03/1957 16/09/1961 04/11/1961 09/11/1963 |
09/11/1963 |
4F | 4233 | 44233 | 03/1926 | 18A 18B W |
Toton Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1955 28/11/1964 |
28/11/1964 |
4F | 4234 | 44234 | 03/1926 | 27A 29A 65F W |
Polmadie Perth South Grangemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 15/01/1949 11/04/1959 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4235 | 44235 | 03/1926 | 22B 22C 21A 91M 14B 15A 18A 16H 16G W |
Gloucester Barnwood Bath Green Park (S&D) Saltley To London Midland Region Kentish Town Wellingborough Toton Hasland Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/10/1949 26/01/1952 19/03/1952 14/02/1959 25/08/1962 08/12/1962 08/08/1964 24/10/1964 12/12/1964 |
12/12/1964 |
4F | 4236 | 44236 | 03/1926 | 19G 9F 9G W |
Trafford Park (LMS) Heaton Mersey Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1955 19/12/1959 17/10/1964 |
17/10/1964 |
4F | 4237 | 44237 | 03/1926 | 19D 19E 10D 10D 8B W |
Heaton Mersey Belle Vue Plodder Lane Plodder Lane Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 09/10/1954 19/10/1963 |
19/10/1963 |
4F | 4238 | 44238 | 03/1926 | 16B 20B 20B W |
Spital Bridge Stourton Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 16/12/1963 |
16/12/1963 |
4F | 4239 | 44239 | 04/1926 | 16B 2E 2B 2E 8B W |
Spital Bridge Northampton Nuneaton Northampton Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1960 07/05/1960 11/06/1960 30/06/1962 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4240 | 44240 | 04/1926 | 20D 24D 27D 10G W |
Normanton Lower Darwen Wigan Central (L&Y) Skipton Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 11/08/1951 18/04/1964 26/09/1964 |
26/09/1964 |
4F | 4241 | 44241 | 04/1926 | 18A 19C 20C 20C 20B 20B 17D 27E 17D 17B 9G 17A 16A W |
Toton Canklow Royston Royston Stourton Stourton Rowsley Walton on the Hill Rowsley Burton Gorton Derby Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 02/06/1951 16/06/1951 19/06/1954 26/01/1957 23/03/1957 10/01/1959 12/05/1962 17/11/1962 05/01/1963 20/07/1963 |
20/07/1963 |
4F | 4242 | 44242 | 04/1926 | 15A 16B 16B 15A 21D 21D 2E 5E 5D 9G W |
Wellingborough Spital Bridge Spital Bridge Wellingborough Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Northampton Alsager Stoke Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 20/08/1949 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 21/02/1953 15/04/1961 07/04/1962 09/11/1963 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4243 | 44243 | 04/1926 | 14A 14B 14B 15A 18A 17C 16C 16G W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Kentish Town Wellingborough Toton Rowsley Derby Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1949 24/12/1949 25/08/1962 16/02/1963 10/08/1963 09/05/1964 05/12/1964 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 |
4F | 4244 | 44244 | 04/1926 | 18C 18B 15C 15E W |
Hasland Westhouses Kettering Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1960 14/09/1963 01/02/1964 10/10/1964 |
10/10/1964 |
4F | 4245 | 44245 | 04/1926 | 20B 20G 19C W |
Stourton Hellifield Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 24/04/1954 17/05/1962 |
17/05/1962 |
4F | 4246 | 44246 | 05/1926 | 17D 17D 5D 8F W |
Rowsley Rowsley Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 16/05/1953 10/11/1962 12/12/1964 |
12/12/1964 |
4F | 4247 | 44247 | 05/1926 | 16A 16A 40A 40A 35C 2E 9D 9D W |
Nottingham Nottingham Lincoln Lincoln Spital Bridge Northampton Buxton (LNWR) Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/08/1949 16/05/1953 20/06/1953 19/09/1953 06/02/1960 18/08/1962 17/10/1964 04/12/1965 |
04/12/1965 |
4F | 4248 | 44248 | 05/1926 | 21A 15A 16A 16F 16E W |
Saltley Wellingborough Nottingham Burton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/12/1957 06/09/1958 07/03/1964 27/06/1964 26/09/1964 |
26/09/1964 |
4F | 4249 | 44249 | 06/1926 | 17D 17A 17A 15C 15A 18D W |
Rowsley Derby Derby Leicester Midland Wellingborough Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 11/12/1948 12/02/1949 12/03/1949 09/10/1954 08/11/1961 |
08/11/1961 |
4F | 4250 | 44250 | 06/1926 | 21A 14B 18A 16B 16B 18A 17D 17E 16E W |
Saltley Kentish Town Toton Spital Bridge Spital Bridge Toton Rowsley Heaton Mersey Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 08/02/1936 01/01/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 06/08/1949 05/11/1955 23/02/1957 08/02/1964 08/05/1965 |
08/05/1965 |
4F | 4251 | 44251 | 06/1926 | 29A 66A W |
Perth South Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/12/1958 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4252 | 44252 | 07/1926 | 17C 15C 16C 16B W |
Coalville Leicester Midland Mansfield Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1955 10/01/1959 09/04/1960 04/05/1963 |
04/05/1963 |
4F | 4253 | 44253 | 07/1926 | 31A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4254 | 44254 | 07/1926 | 31A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4255 | 44255 | 07/1926 | 31A 65J W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Fort William Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/01/1958 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4256 | 44256 | 07/1926 | 31A 66A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1959 30/04/1962 |
30/04/1962 |
4F | 4257 | 44257 | 07/1926 | 31A 64D 63A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Carstairs Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 04/03/1950 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4258 | 44258 | 08/1926 | 29A 60A W |
Perth South Inverness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/09/1961 21/05/1962 |
21/05/1962 |
4F | 4259 | 44259 | 08/1926 | 13C 14A 16A 15D W |
Tilbury Cricklewood East Nottingham Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 16/02/1963 06/07/1963 08/1964 |
08/1964 |
4F | 4260 | 44260 | 08/1926 | 17C 17C 15C 15E W |
Coalville Coalville Kettering Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 01/02/1964 19/09/1964 10/10/1964 |
10/10/1964 |
4F | 4261 | 44261 | 09/1926 | 19E 10D 10D 8B 9F 18C 18A 18C W |
Belle Vue Plodder Lane Plodder Lane Warrington Dallam Heaton Mersey Hasland Toton Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 09/10/1954 29/01/1955 30/04/1960 27/01/1962 10/03/1962 05/10/1963 |
05/10/1963 |
4F | 4262 | 44262 | 09/1926 | 17D W |
Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4263 | 44263 | 10/1926 | 17A 21A 10H 10G W |
Derby Saltley Lower Darwen Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/09/1948 25/04/1964 26/09/1964 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 |
4F | 4264 | 44264 | 10/1926 | 16A 22B 82E 82E 85B W |
Nottingham Gloucester Barnwood Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 08/09/1962 29/06/1963 13/06/1965 07/11/1965 |
26/10/1965 |
4F | 4265 | 44265 | 10/1926 | 17B 22B 17B 19A 41D 41E W |
Burton Gloucester Barnwood Burton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 16/04/1949 29/01/1955 16/09/1961 16/06/1962 12/1963 |
12/1963 |
4F | 4266 | 44266 | 10/1926 | 22A 22A 15D 8G W |
Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Bedford Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 03/11/1956 22/03/1958 04/10/1958 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 |
4F | 4267 | 44267 | 10/1926 | 16A 22C 22A 18D W |
Nottingham Bath Green Park (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 13/08/1949 03/10/1953 24/05/1962 |
24/05/1962 |
4F | 4268 | 44268 | 10/1926 | 16C W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/03/1963 |
02/03/1963 |
4F | 4269 | 44269 | 10/1926 | 22B 22A 22A 85B W |
Gloucester Barnwood Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 13/06/1965 03/12/1965 |
03/12/1965 |
4F | 4270 | 44270 | 11/1926 | 17B 14B 18A W |
Burton Kentish Town Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1954 16/01/1960 09/11/1963 |
09/11/1963 |
4F | 4271 | 44271 | 11/1926 | 19D 19E 19E 9A 9B 5D 5F 5D 9D W |
Heaton Mersey Belle Vue Belle Vue Longsight Stockport Edgeley Stoke Uttoxeter Stoke Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1949 24/12/1949 11/03/1950 04/10/1952 22/11/1958 17/10/1959 24/10/1959 10/11/1962 12/1965 |
12/1965 |
4F | 4272 | 44272 | 11/1926 | 22B 84D 85C 82G W |
Gloucester Barnwood Leamington Gloucester Barnwood Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/08/1961 09/09/1961 11/08/1962 29/06/1963 |
28/06/1963 |
4F | 4273 | 44273 | 11/1926 | 16B 31B W |
Spital Bridge March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
4F | 4274 | 44274 | 11/1926 | 18C 20C W |
Hasland Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1954 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 |
4F | 4275 | 44275 | 11/1926 | 16A 17D 17B 19A 9E 9G 9E 9G 9E W |
Nottingham Rowsley Burton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Trafford Park (LMS) Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 29/04/1950 18/04/1953 11/07/1953 09/05/1959 12/11/1960 19/05/1962 03/10/1964 24/10/1964 |
24/10/1964 |
4F | 4276 | 44276 | 12/1926 | 20F 20G 24G W |
Skipton Hellifield Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1949 22/06/1963 22/05/1965 |
22/05/1965 |
4F | 4277 | 44277 | 12/1926 | 20F W |
Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1965 |
22/05/1965 |
4F | 4278 | 44278 | 12/1926 | 15B 17C 15D 15A 18A 16G W |
Kettering Rowsley Coalville Wellingborough Toton Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/04/1958 06/09/1958 16/01/1960 08/12/1962 22/08/1964 22/01/1966 |
22/01/1966 |
4F | 4279 | 44279 | 12/1926 | 18B 17C W |
Westhouses Coalville Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 11/01/1964 |
11/01/1964 |
4F | 4280 | 44280 | 12/1926 | 20H 10E 10E 8F W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 22/03/1958 14/12/1963 |
14/12/1963 |
4F | 4281 | 44281 | 12/1926 | 27A 29A 67B 67B W |
Polmadie Perth South Hurlford Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 15/01/1949 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4282 | 44282 | 12/1926 | 20G 24G 24H 12A W |
Hellifield Skipton Hellifield Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/01/1960 15/09/1962 22/06/1963 13/07/1963 |
13/07/1963 |
4F | 4283 | 44283 | 12/1926 | 31B 66A 67B W |
Stirling Polmadie Hurlford Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 08/09/1962 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4284 | 44284 | 12/1926 | 19A 18B 18A 9G 16A 15C 16C W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Westhouses Toton Gorton Nottingham Leicester Midland Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1954 04/10/1958 13/08/1960 17/11/1962 20/07/1963 28/09/1963 01/08/1964 |
01/08/1964 |
4F | 4285 | 44285 | 12/1926 | 19A 18B W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1954 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4286 | 44286 | 12/1926 | 19D 16A W |
Heaton Mersey Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/02/1964 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4287 | 44287 | 12/1926 | 15A 15D 15A 15C 17A 15A 15B 17B 19A 19A 41D 41E W |
Wellingborough Bedford Wellingborough Leicester Midland Derby Wellingborough Kettering Burton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 11/02/1950 11/03/1950 29/12/1951 06/09/1952 04/10/1952 01/11/1952 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 16/09/1961 26/05/1962 12/1963 |
12/1963 |
4F | 4288 | 44288 | 01/1927 | 18C W |
Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1964 |
04/1964 |
4F | 4289 | 44289 | 01/1927 | 21B 21A 18A 18B 17A 21A 9F 15E W |
Bournville Saltley Toton Westhouses Derby Saltley Heaton Mersey Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 31/10/1953 04/10/1958 07/10/1961 07/04/1962 15/09/1962 15/02/1964 20/06/1964 |
20/06/1964 |
4F | 4290 | 44290 | 01/1927 | 20D 19C 19C 20C 20C W |
Normanton Canklow Canklow Royston Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 11/06/1964 |
11/06/1964 |
4F | 4291 | 44291 | 01/1927 | 24D 27D 26G 26A 27E W |
Lower Darwen Wigan Central (L&Y) Belle Vue Newton Heath Walton on the Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1951 30/01/1954 08/10/1955 31/12/1955 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4292 | 44292 | 01/1927 | 11E 2B 12C 11B W |
Tebay Nuneaton Carlisle Canal Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1957 12/07/1958 06/09/1958 10/08/1963 |
10/08/1963 |
4F | 4293 | 44293 | 01/1927 | 16B 22B 22B 8E W |
Spital Bridge Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Barnwood Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 23/03/1957 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4294 | 44294 | 02/1927 | 18C 14B 14A 18A 8B W |
Hasland Kentish Town Cricklewood East Toton Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/03/1959 25/08/1962 16/02/1963 09/11/1963 06/11/1965 |
06/11/1965 |
4F | 4295 | 44295 | 02/1927 | 17B 17A 17B 18A W |
Burton Derby Burton Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 25/04/1959 28/11/1959 01/02/1964 |
01/02/1964 |
4F | 4296 | 44296 | 02/1927 | 16B 22B 22B 22A 22B 82E W |
Spital Bridge Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Barnwood Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Barnwood Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 31/10/1953 16/06/1957 29/06/1963 27/01/1964 |
15/01/1964 |
4F | 4297 | 44297 | 02/1927 | 13A 14B 14A 15A 16A W |
Plaistow Kentish Town Cricklewood East Wellingborough Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1951 22/03/1952 15/09/1962 26/01/1963 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4298 | 44298 | 02/1927 | 14A 14B 14A 14A 14B W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Cricklewood East Cricklewood East Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 31/10/1953 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4299 | 44299 | 02/1927 | 20D 20F 18D 27E 17B 5E 5D W |
Normanton Skipton Staveley (Barrow Hill) Walton on the Hill Burton Alsager Stoke Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 17/09/1949 23/03/1957 04/06/1960 09/12/1961 23/06/1962 05/1963 |
05/1963 |
4F | 4300 | 44300 | 02/1927 | 5B 5E 5B 5B 5E 5E 10D 10A W |
Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Crewe South Alsager Alsager Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 26/11/1949 24/12/1949 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 11/08/1956 18/01/1964 04/12/1965 |
04/12/1965 |
4F | 4301 | 44301 | 03/1927 | 5E 5B 5E 5B 21D 8F W |
Alsager Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Aston Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 16/10/1948 04/03/1950 22/07/1961 14/07/1962 04/1964 |
04/1964 |
4F | 4302 | 44302 | 10/1926 | 3D 12F 24L 21B 8F W |
Aston Workington Carnforth Bescot Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/11/1960 17/06/1961 15/07/1961 17/08/1963 21/03/1964 |
21/03/1964 |
4F | 4303 | 44303 | 10/1926 | 9A 9A 10E 8F W |
Longsight Longsight Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 22/03/1958 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4304 | 44304 | 10/1926 | W5 W37 5B 20D 21A 14A 14A 17A S 17A 16A W |
Northampton Mold Junction Crewe South Normanton Saltley Cricklewood East Cricklewood East Derby Stored Derby (Re-instd) Nottingham Withdrawn |
21/09/1930 22/10/1930 09/05/1936 17/12/1938 29/04/1944 28/11/1949 03/12/1949 04/02/1953 09/11/1959 28/11/1959 03/12/1959 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4305 | 44305 | 10/1926 | 7B 24L 8G 12A W |
Bangor Carnforth Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 18/06/1960 25/11/1961 03/04/1965 |
03/04/1965 |
4F | 4306 | 44306 | 10/1926 | 11B 12C 12C 11A W |
Barrow in Furness Durran Hill (Carlisle) Durran Hill (Carlisle) Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 04/10/1952 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4307 | 44307 | 10/1926 | 5F 6B 6E 5D W |
Uttoxeter Mold Junction Wrexham Rhosddu Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 03/12/1955 01/11/1958 06/10/1962 |
06/10/1962 |
4F | 4308 | 44308 | 09/1926 | 9A 8E 5D 5D 1E 5D 6C 5D W |
Longsight Brunswick Stoke Stoke Bletchley Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 27/02/1960 21/05/1960 29/06/1963 14/09/1963 05/10/1963 |
05/10/1963 |
4F | 4309 | 44309 | 10/1926 | 9D 5D 6C 5D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 29/06/1963 20/07/1963 27/07/1963 |
27/07/1963 |
4F | 4310 | 44310 | 10/1926 | 5D 6H 10G 9L 10G 12D 12C W |
Stoke Bangor Skipton Buxton (LNWR) Skipton Workington Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/12/1963 02/01/1965 17/04/1965 01/05/1965 08/05/1965 03/01/1966 05/02/1966 |
05/02/1966 |
4F | 4311 | 44311 | 10/1926 | 26A 26B 26A 26D 9K 12C W |
Newton Heath Agecroft Newton Heath Bury Bolton Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 12/03/1949 17/06/1961 10/04/1965 27/11/1965 09/07/1966 |
09/07/1966 |
4F | 4312 | 44312 | 11/1927 | 30B W |
Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4313 | 44313 | 11/1927 | 16A 16C 16A W |
Nottingham Kirkby in Ashfield Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 11/07/1953 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4314 | 44314 | 12/1927 | 29A 63C 63B 63A 63C 63A W |
Perth South Forfar Stirling Perth South Forfar Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/04/1955 09/07/1955 06/08/1955 09/06/1956 22/11/1958 16/07/1962 |
16/07/1962 |
4F | 4315 | 44315 | 12/1927 | 12A 2A 5D 8G 9D W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Rugby Stoke Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1959 23/05/1959 20/02/1960 01/09/1962 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4316 | 44316 | 12/1927 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4317 | 44317 | 12/1927 | 21A 22A 22A 15D 8G W |
Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Bedford Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 27/03/1954 22/03/1958 04/10/1958 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4318 | 44318 | 01/1928 | 28B 63A 63C 63B 63C 63B 63C 63B 66A W |
Dalry Road Perth South Forfar Stirling Forfar Stirling Forfar Stirling Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1950 21/03/1953 11/07/1953 26/12/1953 07/08/1954 23/11/1957 12/04/1958 05/07/1958 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4319 | 44319 | 01/1928 | 30B 67A 67C W |
Hurlford Corkerhill Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/10/1958 13/02/1960 27/11/1961 |
27/11/1961 |
4F | 4320 | 44320 | 01/1928 | 31D W |
Grangemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4321 | 44321 | 01/1928 | 18B W |
Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1964 |
18/04/1964 |
4F | 4322 | 44322 | 01/1928 | 27F 29A 66A 66B 67A W |
Ayr Perth South Polmadie Motherwell Corkerhill Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 22/10/1949 05/07/1958 16/06/1962 08/09/1962 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4323 | 44323 | 01/1928 | 30B 67C 67A W |
Hurlford Ayr Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/04/1955 13/02/1960 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4324 | 44324 | 01/1928 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/11/1961 |
11/11/1961 |
4F | 4325 | 44325 | 02/1928 | 30B W |
Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4326 | 44326 | 02/1928 | 12A 12B 5D W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1958 22/08/1959 31/12/1959 |
31/12/1959 |
4F | 4327 | 44327 | 02/1928 | 17D 14E 17B W |
Rowsley Bedford Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1963 03/08/1963 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4328 | 44328 | 02/1928 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4329 | 44329 | 03/1928 | 30B 67A 67C W |
Hurlford Corkerhill Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 26/10/1957 16/07/1962 |
16/07/1962 |
4F | 4330 | 44330 | 03/1928 | 31B 67B 67C 67A W |
Stirling Hurlford Ayr Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1954 29/10/1955 19/12/1959 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
4F | 4331 | 44331 | 03/1928 | 31B 67B 67C 67B W |
Stirling Hurlford Ayr Hurlford Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
01/01/1948 07/08/1954 29/10/1955 08/09/1962 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4332 | 44332 | 10/1926 | 15A 14A W |
Wellingborough Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4333 | 44333 | 10/1926 | 21B 21A 15D 17A W |
Bournville Saltley Coalville Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1951 09/12/1961 21/07/1962 05/1964 |
05/1964 |
4F | 4334 | 44334 | 10/1926 | 19A 17D 17A 17C 16C 15E 16E W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Rowsley Derby Rowsley Derby Coalville Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1954 01/01/1955 14/01/1961 09/05/1964 27/06/1964 19/12/1964 19/06/1965 |
19/06/1965 |
4F | 4335 | 44335 | 10/1926 | 20D 20B W |
Normanton Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 25/02/1963 |
25/02/1963 |
4F | 4336 | 44336 | 10/1926 | 20D W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/12/1963 |
23/12/1963 |
4F | 4337 | 44337 | 10/1926 | 20D W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1964 |
05/1964 |
4F | 4338 | 44338 | 10/1926 | 20D W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1962 |
09/1962 |
4F | 4339 | 44339 | 10/1926 | 3C 5E 5D W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Alsager Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 24/01/1948 18/12/1965 |
18/12/1965 |
4F | 4340 | 44340 | 10/1926 | 9B 1A 2E 1C 21B W 55A |
Stockport Edgeley Willesden Northampton Watford Bescot Withdrawn Holbeck (MR) |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 10/09/1960 11/04/1961 23/06/1962 03/12/1962 08/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 |
4F | 4341 | 44341 | 12/1926 | 10D 5E 5B 5E 5B 5B 9G 8E 9G W |
Plodder Lane Alsager Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Crewe South Northwich Brunswick Northwich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 12/06/1948 24/09/1949 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 06/10/1951 25/02/1956 11/08/1956 16/02/1963 |
16/02/1963 |
4F | 4342 | 44342 | 12/1926 | 5B 5E 5B 5E 5D W |
Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Alsager Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 24/09/1949 29/10/1949 23/06/1962 26/10/1963 |
26/10/1963 |
4F | 4343 | 44343 | 01/1927 | 5D 1C 12C W |
Stoke Watford Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 10/08/1957 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4344 | 44344 | 01/1927 | 5B 5E 5B 5B 5D W |
Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Crewe South Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 15/08/1959 12/12/1964 |
12/12/1964 |
4F | 4345 | 44345 | 01/1927 | 3C 11D 24L 12E 9F W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Tebay Carnforth Barrow in Furness Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/08/1957 07/11/1959 16/09/1961 08/06/1963 21/12/1963 |
21/12/1963 |
4F | 4346 | 44346 | 01/1927 | 12B 12D W |
Carlisle Upperby Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1964 06/11/1965 |
06/11/1965 |
4F | 4347 | 44347 | 03/1927 | 11B 24D W |
Barrow in Furness Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/06/1963 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 |
4F | 4348 | 44348 | 04/1927 | 1A 13B 6K 1C 21B 8F 12D W |
Willesden Devons Road (Bow) Rhyl Watford Bescot Springs Branch (Wigan) Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1949 24/12/1949 10/08/1957 05/10/1957 23/06/1962 17/08/1963 21/03/1964 08/1964 |
08/1964 |
4F | 4349 | 44349 | 04/1927 | 5D 9A 5E 5D 8B W |
Stoke Longsight Alsager Stoke Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/10/1949 07/11/1959 23/06/1962 09/11/1963 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 |
4F | 4350 | 44350 | 04/1927 | 3D 9E 10D 12C W |
Aston Trafford Park (LMS) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1953 16/06/1956 21/08/1965 25/12/1965 |
25/12/1965 |
4F | 4351 | 44351 | 05/1927 | 11B W |
Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/04/1963 |
06/04/1963 |
4F | 4352 | 44352 | 05/1927 | 10D 3C 4A 5E 5D W |
Plodder Lane Ryecroft (Walsall) Shrewsbury Alsager Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 25/02/1950 20/12/1958 23/06/1962 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4353 | 44353 | 05/1927 | 5D 2E 5B 9E 9L W |
Stoke Northampton Crewe South Trafford Park (LMS) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 30/06/1962 07/03/1964 28/11/1964 13/02/1965 |
13/02/1965 |
4F | 4354 | 44354 | 05/1927 | 2A 4B 3D 3D 1A 5E 5D W |
Rugby Northampton Aston Aston Willesden Alsager Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1951 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 09/10/1954 03/11/1956 23/06/1962 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4355 | 44355 | 06/1927 | 19A 22C 22A 8F 6H 5F 16G W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Bath Green Park (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Springs Branch (Wigan) Bangor Uttoxeter Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1949 13/08/1949 24/10/1959 07/11/1959 27/02/1960 12/12/1964 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 |
4F | 4356 | 44356 | 06/1927 | 10D 8B 9E 8B 8G 12D W |
Plodder Lane Warrington Dallam Trafford Park (LMS) Warrington Dallam Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1954 22/02/1964 07/03/1964 03/10/1964 20/02/1965 06/11/1965 |
06/11/1965 |
4F | 4357 | 44357 | 01/1927 | 9A 5F W |
Longsight Uttoxeter Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4358 | 44358 | 01/1927 | 10E 5D 21B 9G 8B 9G 12D W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Stoke Bescot Gorton Warrington Dallam Gorton Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 15/07/1961 17/08/1963 05/12/1964 12/12/1964 23/01/1965 30/01/1965 |
30/01/1965 |
4F | 4359 | 44359 | 01/1927 | 5B 5E 5B 5E 5E 5B 8D 6B W |
Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Alsager Alsager Crewe South Widnes Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 29/10/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 13/10/1951 18/06/1960 24/09/1960 27/07/1963 |
27/07/1963 |
4F | 4360 | 44360 | 02/1927 | 9D 3C 3E 3E 3D 11D 12C W |
Buxton (LNWR) Ryecroft (Walsall) Monument Lane Monument Lane Aston Tebay Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 17/03/1951 24/03/1951 10/11/1951 23/03/1957 16/06/1957 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4361 | 44361 | 02/1927 | 11B 3E 9E 9F W |
Barrow in Furness Monument Lane Trafford Park (LMS) Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 29/01/1955 28/01/1956 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4362 | 44362 | 04/1927 | 15D 21A 18A 18B W |
Bedford Saltley Toton Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/04/1949 31/10/1953 04/10/1958 09/1964 |
09/1964 |
4F | 4363 | 44363 | 04/1927 | 5D 1C 5D 99C W |
Stoke Watford Stoke Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 05/10/1957 12/07/1958 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4364 | 44364 | 04/1927 | 12D 11A 11A 4A 4A 6E 84K 1E 1E 2E 9D W |
Workington Carnforth Carnforth Bletchley Bletchley Wrexham Rhosddu Wrexham Rhosddu Bletchley Bletchley Northampton Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 30/11/1957 22/02/1958 08/11/1958 31/01/1959 12/05/1962 02/06/1962 04/01/1964 |
04/01/1964 |
4F | 4365 | 44365 | 05/1927 | 9D 3E 12D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Monument Lane Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 12/06/1948 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4366 | 44366 | 05/1927 | 5D 2C 2B 6B 11B W |
Stoke Northampton Bletchley Mold Junction Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 08/01/1949 27/02/1954 28/01/1956 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4367 | 44367 | 06/1927 | 6B 6K 12E W |
Mold Junction Rhyl Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 06/10/1962 12/09/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
4F | 4368 | 44368 | 07/1927 | 11B 55B W |
Barrow in Furness Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/11/1957 09/1962 |
09/1962 |
4F | 4369 | 44369 | 07/1927 | 5D 17A W |
Stoke Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/10/1953 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
4F | 4370 | 44370 | 07/1927 | 1A 13B 1A 1A 1C 1A 1E 2E 5D 66A 67B 5D W |
Willesden Devons Road (Bow) Willesden Willesden Watford Willesden Bletchley Northampton Stoke Polmadie Hurlford Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1949 24/12/1949 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 19/04/1952 16/05/1953 30/11/1957 12/05/1962 18/08/1962 09/03/1963 16/03/1963 27/07/1963 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4371 | 44371 | 08/1927 | 19E 18A 18D W |
Belle Vue Toton Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 09/08/1952 06/1961 |
06/1961 |
4F | 4372 | 44372 | 09/1927 | 1A 1D 1D 1A 1D 1A W |
Willesden Devons Road (Bow) Devons Road (Bow) Willesden Devons Road (Bow) Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 18/04/1953 16/05/1953 11/07/1953 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4373 | 44373 | 10/1927 | 5D 99C W |
Stoke Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1958 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 |
4F | 4374 | 44374 | 10/1927 | 11A 11B 11A 5D 99C W |
Carnforth Barrow in Furness Carnforth Stoke Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 09/10/1948 22/03/1952 12/07/1958 02/03/1963 |
02/03/1963 |
4F | 4375 | 44375 | 11/1927 | 11A 5D 9G 9D W |
Carnforth Stoke Gorton Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 17/05/1958 22/08/1959 15/10/1960 |
15/10/1960 |
4F | 4376 | 44376 | 11/1927 | 18A 16F 16E W |
Toton Burton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1964 26/09/1964 19/12/1964 |
19/12/1964 |
4F | 4377 | 44377 | 12/1927 | 5D 5B 12D 2F 99C W |
Stoke Crewe South Workington Bescot Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/11/1960 08/08/1964 05/12/1964 08/05/1965 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 |
4F | 4378 | 44378 | 12/1927 | 5D 17A 17E 27F 9E W |
Stoke Derby Heaton Mersey Brunswick Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 22/02/1958 11/02/1961 16/09/1961 04/05/1963 |
04/05/1963 |
4F | 4379 | 44379 | 12/1927 | 10D 10E 10E 5D 9B 16C 9B 9F 16E W |
Plodder Lane Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Stoke Stockport Edgeley Kirkby in Ashfield Stockport Edgeley Heaton Mersey Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 09/04/1949 07/04/1951 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 05/09/1953 15/02/1964 26/09/1964 |
26/09/1964 |
4F | 4380 | 44380 | 01/1928 | 5D 17A 17B W |
Stoke Derby Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 05/12/1959 01/08/1964 |
01/08/1964 |
4F | 4381 | 44381 | 01/1928 | 1A 1D 14B 14A 18A 18C 16G 16H W |
Willesden Devons Road (Bow) Kentish Town Cricklewood East Toton Hasland Westhouses Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 22/03/1958 09/08/1958 04/08/1962 16/02/1963 06/04/1963 14/12/1963 02/05/1964 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4382 | 44382 | 09/1926 | 9D 9B W |
Buxton (LNWR) Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1954 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4383 | 44383 | 09/1926 | 5D W |
Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
4F | 4384 | 44384 | 09/1926 | 5E 5B 10D 10D 9F 8B W |
Alsager Crewe South Plodder Lane Plodder Lane Heaton Mersey Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 09/10/1954 29/01/1955 24/10/1964 |
24/10/1964 |
4F | 4385 | 44385 | 10/1926 | 12D 11A 5D 5B W |
Workington Carnforth Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 22/03/1952 05/11/1955 01/08/1959 |
01/08/1959 |
4F | 4386 | 44386 | 10/1926 | 10D 5E 5B 5E 5B 5B 5E 5E 5B 12F 12A 10A W |
Plodder Lane Alsager Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Crewe South Alsager Alsager Crewe South Workington Carlisle Kingmoor Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 16/10/1948 24/09/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 23/06/1962 10/11/1962 02/02/1963 16/11/1963 22/05/1965 |
22/05/1965 |
4F | 4387 | 44387 | 10/1926 | 5B 5E 5B 2C 11B 9F 18B W |
Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Northampton Barrow in Furness Heaton Mersey Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 15/05/1948 28/08/1948 07/10/1950 31/12/1955 30/04/1960 19/10/1963 |
19/10/1963 |
4F | 4388 | 44388 | 10/1926 | 5D 2A 2F 15A 18A W |
Stoke Rugby Market Harborough Wellingborough Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1955 05/11/1955 26/03/1960 30/04/1960 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
4F | 4389 | 44389 | 10/1926 | 7A 10G 9L 10G W |
Llandudno Junction Skipton Buxton (LNWR) Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1965 17/04/1965 01/05/1965 10/07/1965 |
10/07/1965 |
4F | 4390 | 44390 | 10/1926 | 12D 12B 12C 12D 24L 12F 10A 12D 12B 12D W |
Workington Carlisle Upperby Durran Hill (Carlisle) Workington Carnforth Workington Carnforth Workington Carlisle Upperby Workington Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 04/10/1952 17/07/1954 10/11/1962 09/03/1963 09/11/1963 16/11/1963 24/10/1964 14/08/1965 06/11/1965 |
06/11/1965 |
4F | 4391 | 44391 | 10/1926 | 5D 2E W |
Stoke Northampton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4392 | 44392 | 10/1926 | 2A 8E 8E 9E W |
Rugby Brunswick Brunswick Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 11/07/1953 20/06/1964 |
20/06/1964 |
4F | 4393 | 44393 | 10/1926 | 5D W |
Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1962 |
05/11/1962 |
4F | 4394 | 44394 | 10/1926 | 16D 16A 16A 17A 21A 9F 9B 9L 12C W |
Mansfield Nottingham Nottingham Derby Saltley Heaton Mersey Stockport Edgeley Buxton (LNWR) Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/09/1958 28/02/1959 18/11/1961 07/04/1962 15/09/1962 30/11/1963 18/09/1965 11/12/1965 02/07/1966 |
02/07/1966 |
4F | 4395 | 44395 | 10/1926 | 2A 5D 6C 5D 8F W |
Rugby Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/05/1959 29/06/1963 14/09/1963 09/11/1963 12/1963 |
12/1963 |
4F | 4396 | 44396 | 10/1926 | 1C 5D 8E 8E 9E W |
Watford Stoke Brunswick Brunswick Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1949 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 16/09/1961 06/1964 |
06/1964 |
4F | 4397 | 44397 | 12/1926 | 1A 14B 1A 1E W |
Willesden Kentish Town Willesden Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1949 24/03/1951 25/01/1958 31/03/1962 |
31/03/1962 |
4F | 4398 | 44398 | 12/1926 | 24D W |
Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1963 |
27/07/1963 |
4F | 4399 | 44399 | 12/1926 | 12D 11A 12B 9E W |
Workington Carnforth Carlisle Upperby Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 23/06/1962 25/05/1963 08/02/1964 |
08/02/1964 |
4F | 4400 | 44400 | 01/1927 | 20E 55E W |
Manningham Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/12/1963 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 |
4F | 4401 | 44401 | 01/1927 | 16A 16F 16E W |
Nottingham Burton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/03/1964 26/09/1964 19/06/1965 |
19/06/1965 |
4F | 4402 | 44402 | 01/1927 | 17A 17F W |
Derby Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1957 09/01/1965 |
09/01/1965 |
4F | 4403 | 44403 | 01/1927 | 15C 15C 15E W |
Leicester Midland Kettering Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/09/1963 01/02/1964 13/06/1964 |
13/06/1964 |
4F | 4404 | 44404 | 01/1927 | 20A 18D W |
Holbeck (MR) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1954 02/12/1962 |
02/12/1962 |
4F | 4405 | 44405 | 01/1927 | 20H 5D 5E 5B 99C W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Stoke Alsager Crewe South Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 09/08/1958 23/06/1962 02/03/1963 11/06/1966 |
11/06/1966 |
4F | 4406 | 44406 | 01/1927 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4407 | 44407 | 08/1927 | 19D W |
Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/09/1962 |
01/09/1962 |
4F | 4408 | 44408 | 08/1927 | 16A 14A 16A 20C 20D W |
Nottingham Cricklewood East Nottingham Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 17/07/1954 16/07/1955 10/09/1955 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 |
4F | 4409 | 44409 | 08/1927 | 17A 14B 18A W |
Derby Kentish Town Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/04/1959 16/01/1960 09/12/1961 |
09/12/1961 |
4F | 4410 | 44410 | 08/1927 | 18C W |
Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4411 | 44411 | 09/1927 | 22A 82F W |
Bristol Barrow Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1962 10/1963 |
21/09/1963 |
4F | 4412 | 44412 | 09/1927 | 16A W |
Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4413 | 44413 | 09/1927 | 21A 9E 17C 21A W |
Saltley Trafford Park (LMS) Rowsley Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1959 09/01/1960 23/06/1962 02/03/1963 |
02/03/1963 |
4F | 4414 | 44414 | 09/1927 | 16A 17B 15C 15E 16E W |
Nottingham Burton Leicester Midland Coalville Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/06/1961 05/08/1961 19/09/1964 19/12/1964 08/05/1965 |
08/05/1965 |
4F | 4415 | 44415 | 09/1927 | 16C 16D 16C 16D W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Mansfield Kirkby in Ashfield Mansfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/02/1950 18/04/1953 11/07/1953 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4416 | 44416 | 09/1927 | 16A 14A 16C 16D 16B W |
Nottingham Cricklewood East Kirkby in Ashfield Mansfield Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 02/10/1948 18/02/1950 09/04/1960 07/1963 |
07/1963 |
4F | 4417 | 44417 | 09/1927 | 22D W |
Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1962 |
27/11/1962 |
4F | 4418 | 44418 | 09/1927 | 19A 21A 15B 17C 16B 16A 16B W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Saltley Kettering Coalville Kirkby in Ashfield Nottingham Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/09/1948 13/08/1955 05/10/1957 10/01/1959 20/06/1959 09/01/1960 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4419 | 44419 | 09/1927 | 17A 17C 21A W |
Derby Rowsley Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1961 23/06/1962 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4420 | 44420 | 10/1927 | 17A 16G W |
Derby Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1964 09/1965 |
09/1965 |
4F | 4421 | 44421 | 10/1927 | 19D 8E 5D 5D 9F 17A 17C 15E 5D W |
Heaton Mersey Brunswick Stoke Stoke Heaton Mersey Derby Rowsley Coalville Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 11/09/1954 01/07/1961 06/01/1962 09/05/1964 07/11/1964 12/12/1964 |
12/12/1964 |
4F | 4422 | 44422 | 10/1927 | 22C 82E 82G 82E 85B W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Templecombe (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1960 03/12/1960 22/11/1964 07/02/1965 03/06/1965 |
03/06/1965 |
4F | 4423 | 44423 | 10/1927 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
4F | 4424 | 44424 | 10/1927 | 22A 5D W |
Bristol Barrow Road Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1959 26/10/1963 |
26/10/1963 |
4F | 4425 | 44425 | 10/1927 | 14A 16C 17A 9G 9E 9L W |
Cricklewood East Kirkby in Ashfield Derby Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 06/10/1956 12/05/1962 21/11/1964 12/12/1964 06/02/1965 |
06/02/1965 |
4F | 4426 | 44426 | 10/1927 | 19A 41D 41E W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1961 16/06/1962 12/1963 |
12/1963 |
4F | 4427 | 44427 | 10/1927 | 21A 18A W |
Saltley Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1955 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4428 | 44428 | 10/1927 | 17B 17A 17C W |
Burton Derby Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 30/07/1960 15/02/1964 |
15/02/1964 |
4F | 4429 | 44429 | 10/1927 | 17B 17D 17D 16F 16E W |
Burton Rowsley Rowsley Burton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 08/02/1964 10/10/1964 08/05/1965 |
08/05/1965 |
4F | 4430 | 44430 | 11/1927 | 17A 18B W |
Derby Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4431 | 44431 | 11/1927 | 20A 20F 24H 26A W |
Holbeck (MR) Skipton Hellifield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 09/04/1960 13/08/1960 26/09/1964 |
26/09/1964 |
4F | 4432 | 44432 | 11/1927 | 17A 5D W |
Derby Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/10/1953 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4433 | 44433 | 11/1927 | 17B 14B 17A 14E 17C 16C 15E W |
Burton Kentish Town Derby Bedford Rowsley Derby Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1960 24/09/1960 07/04/1962 03/08/1963 09/05/1964 30/05/1964 05/12/1964 |
05/12/1964 |
4F | 4434 | 44434 | 11/1927 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/09/1963 |
21/09/1963 |
4F | 4435 | 44435 | 12/1927 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1962 |
13/10/1962 |
4F | 4436 | 44436 | 12/1927 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1964 |
11/04/1964 |
4F | 4437 | 44437 | 11/1927 | 19A 41D 41E W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1961 26/05/1962 12/1963 |
12/1963 |
4F | 4438 | 44438 | 12/1927 | 2B 5D 8E 8E 10E 8F W |
Bletchley Stoke Brunswick Brunswick Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1948 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 02/01/1954 14/06/1958 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4439 | 44439 | 12/1927 | 3B 3D 12E 12F 12E 12B 10A 8G W |
Bushbury Aston Barrow in Furness Workington Barrow in Furness Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 12/11/1960 10/12/1960 20/04/1963 14/09/1963 30/11/1963 18/01/1964 11/04/1964 |
11/04/1964 |
4F | 4440 | 44440 | 12/1927 | 1A 14B 1A 1C 21B 66A 65D 21B W |
Willesden Kentish Town Willesden Watford Bescot Polmadie Dawsholm Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1949 24/03/1951 05/10/1957 23/06/1962 09/03/1963 16/03/1963 27/07/1963 04/1964 |
04/1964 |
4F | 4441 | 44441 | 12/1927 | 1A 1C 1D 16C 14A 15A 18A 16E W |
Willesden Watford Devons Road (Bow) Mansfield Cricklewood East Wellingborough Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/03/1950 23/02/1952 22/03/1958 10/01/1959 16/01/1960 15/09/1962 08/12/1962 09/11/1963 09/1964 |
09/1964 |
4F | 4442 | 44442 | 12/1927 | 1A 1C 21B W |
Willesden Watford Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 23/06/1962 20/07/1963 |
20/07/1963 |
4F | 4443 | 44443 | 12/1927 | 1C 11B W |
Watford Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 |
4F | 4444 | 44444 | 12/1927 | 9B 3C 3E 21D 8F W |
Stockport Edgeley Ryecroft (Walsall) Monument Lane Aston Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1954 14/06/1958 10/02/1962 14/07/1962 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4445 | 44445 | 12/1927 | 7B 24L 6B 8C 8F 24L 5B 9B W |
Bangor Carnforth Mold Junction Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Carnforth Crewe South Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 05/12/1959 11/06/1960 17/09/1960 28/10/1961 07/07/1962 10/11/1962 15/06/1963 |
15/06/1963 |
4F | 4446 | 44446 | 12/1927 | 20C W |
Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 |
4F | 4447 | 44447 | 01/1928 | 2B 12E W |
Bletchley Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1962 20/07/1963 |
20/07/1963 |
4F | 4448 | 44448 | 01/1928 | 5D 4B 5D 5D 3C 3A 66A 66F 21B W |
Stoke Northampton Stoke Stoke Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Polmadie Beattock Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 29/11/1952 14/06/1958 09/03/1963 16/03/1963 27/07/1963 09/11/1963 |
09/11/1963 |
4F | 4449 | 44449 | 01/1928 | 12D W |
Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 |
4F | 4450 | 44450 | 02/1928 | 5E 5B 5E 5B 6B W |
Alsager Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 29/10/1949 23/06/1962 16/03/1963 08/05/1965 |
08/05/1965 |
4F | 4451 | 44451 | 02/1928 | 1A 8B 12A 12D W |
Willesden Warrington Dallam Carlisle Kingmoor Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1960 15/10/1960 23/10/1965 18/12/1965 |
18/12/1965 |
4F | 4452 | 44452 | 02/1928 | 5E 5B 5E 5E 17B 5B 12B W |
Alsager Crewe South Alsager Alsager Burton Crewe South Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/07/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 29/11/1952 22/07/1961 10/11/1962 20/06/1964 |
20/06/1964 |
4F | 4453 | 44453 | 02/1928 | 5B 5E 5B 5E W |
Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Alsager Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 24/09/1949 04/03/1950 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4454 | 44454 | 02/1928 | 3C 10D 10D 12D 11A 12F 12E 9D 5D 17A W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Plodder Lane Plodder Lane Workington Carnforth Workington Barrow in Furness Buxton (LNWR) Stoke Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 11/07/1953 27/03/1954 17/09/1960 24/09/1960 18/08/1962 10/11/1962 01/12/1962 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4455 | 44455 | 02/1928 | 2A 5D W |
Rugby Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 23/03/1963 |
23/03/1963 |
4F | 4456 | 44456 | 02/1928 | 2A 9G 9G 10G W |
Rugby Northwich Northwich Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 19/12/1964 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 |
4F | 4457 | 44457 | 03/1928 | 19C 19C 19A 19A 56A 55E W |
Canklow Canklow Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 15/04/1961 04/08/1962 23/12/1963 |
23/12/1963 |
4F | 4458 | 44458 | 03/1928 | 16B 20D W |
Spital Bridge Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1954 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 |
4F | 4459 | 44459 | 04/1928 | 19E 19D 11E 5D W |
Belle Vue Heaton Mersey Tebay Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1949 13/08/1949 26/01/1957 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4460 | 44460 | 05/1928 | 24A 26B 24A 24D 9D W |
Accrington Agecroft Accrington Lower Darwen Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 12/03/1949 02/12/1950 30/11/1963 31/10/1964 |
31/10/1964 |
4F | 4461 | 44461 | 05/1928 | 5B 12E 12D W |
Crewe South Moor Row Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1949 14/08/1954 05/09/1964 |
05/09/1964 |
4F | 4462 | 44462 | 05/1928 | 23B 25D 25A 25D 27E 17B 27E 10H 10G 12D W |
Aintree Mirfield Wakefield Mirfield Walton on the Hill Burton Walton on the Hill Lower Darwen Skipton Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 23/04/1955 16/07/1955 16/06/1956 20/01/1962 27/01/1962 04/01/1964 07/11/1964 20/03/1965 13/11/1965 |
13/11/1965 |
4F | 4463 | 44463 | 05/1928 | 16C 21A 21A 21B 21A 18C W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Saltley Saltley Bournville Saltley Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/01/1954 07/09/1957 20/06/1959 20/02/1960 16/12/1961 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4464 | 44464 | 05/1928 | 25E 24A 24B 27E 27E 27D 12A 10A W |
Sowerby Bridge Accrington Rose Grove Walton on the Hill Walton on the Hill Wigan Central (L&Y) Carlisle Kingmoor Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 22/04/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 08/08/1953 02/03/1963 16/11/1963 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4465 | 44465 | 06/1928 | 15B 17F 17A 15A 18A W |
Kettering Trafford Park (LMS) Derby Wellingborough Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/10/1957 30/11/1957 04/03/1961 08/12/1962 07/1963 |
07/1963 |
4F | 4466 | 44466 | 07/1928 | 26A 22A 15A W |
Newton Heath Bristol Barrow Road Wellingborough Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 11/12/1948 16/05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
4F | 4467 | 44467 | 05/1928 | 20B W |
Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/04/1964 |
14/04/1964 |
4F | 4468 | 44468 | 05/1928 | 20H 20F W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4469 | 44469 | 05/1928 | 11E 24L 12B W |
Tebay Carnforth Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/11/1958 23/06/1962 30/03/1963 |
30/03/1963 |
4F | 4470 | 44470 | 05/1928 | 18A 14A 16C W |
Toton Cricklewood East Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 01/10/1949 15/06/1963 |
15/06/1963 |
4F | 4471 | 44471 | 06/1928 | 23C 25D 27E W |
Southport Mirfield Walton on the Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 25/02/1956 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4472 | 44472 | 06/1928 | 16C 16A W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/10/1949 25/05/1963 |
25/05/1963 |
4F | 4473 | 44473 | 07/1928 | 10E 10D 10D 1A 5D W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Plodder Lane Plodder Lane Willesden Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 09/10/1954 18/05/1957 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4474 | 44474 | 07/1928 | 23C 25D 27E 27E 25D W |
Southport Mirfield Walton on the Hill Walton on the Hill Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 21/12/1961 |
21/12/1961 |
4F | 4475 | 44475 | 08/1928 | 21A 15C 20C 18D W |
Saltley Leicester Midland Royston Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/10/1951 29/12/1951 26/01/1952 10/02/1963 |
10/02/1963 |
4F | 4476 | 44476 | 08/1928 | 16B 15C 17B 14B 17A 15A 14E 16A W |
Spital Bridge Leicester Midland Burton Kentish Town Derby Wellingborough Bedford Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1960 28/05/1960 09/07/1960 08/10/1960 18/03/1961 07/04/1962 26/01/1963 04/05/1963 |
04/05/1963 |
4F | 4477 | 44477 | 12/1927 | 19C 19A 19A W |
Canklow Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 07/07/1961 |
07/07/1961 |
4F | 4478 | 44478 | 12/1927 | 25A 5D 6H W |
Wakefield Stoke Bangor Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 09/09/1961 14/11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
4F | 4479 | 44479 | 12/1927 | 24A 24D W |
Accrington Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/12/1950 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4480 | 44480 | 11/1927 | 25F 16A W |
Low Moor Nottingham Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4481 | 44481 | 12/1927 | 23B 27E 9D W |
Aintree Walton on the Hill Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 21/12/1963 28/11/1964 |
28/11/1964 |
4F | 4482 | 44482 | 12/1927 | 17B 22B 18B 18D W |
Burton Gloucester Barnwood Westhouses Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 01/10/1949 30/11/1957 02/05/1962 |
02/05/1962 |
4F | 4483 | 44483 | 12/1927 | 24D W |
Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4484 | 44484 | 12/1927 | 5D 21B 8G 12B 12D W |
Stoke Bescot Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Carlisle Upperby Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1960 17/08/1963 04/07/1964 24/10/1964 28/11/1964 |
28/11/1964 |
4F | 4485 | 44485 | 12/1927 | 25C 25D 56A 55B W |
Goole Mirfield Wakefield Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 30/01/1960 04/08/1962 19/04/1963 |
19/04/1963 |
4F | 4486 | 44486 | 12/1927 | 25C 24A 26G 26A 27D 8F 10G 8F 9G W |
Goole Accrington Belle Vue Newton Heath Wigan Central (L&Y) Springs Branch (Wigan) Skipton Springs Branch (Wigan) Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 07/10/1950 21/04/1956 01/12/1956 02/11/1963 30/11/1963 25/01/1964 04/04/1964 23/01/1965 |
23/01/1965 |
4F | 4487 | 44487 | 12/1927 | 11B W |
Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/04/1962 |
07/04/1962 |
4F | 4488 | 44488 | 12/1927 | 3C 3B 3A W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Bushbury Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 14/06/1958 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4489 | 44489 | 12/1927 | 5D 8E 8E 9E 12D W |
Stoke Brunswick Brunswick Trafford Park (LMS) Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 24/09/1960 12/12/1964 28/08/1965 |
28/08/1965 |
4F | 4490 | 44490 | 12/1927 | 3D 3E 9D 5F W |
Aston Monument Lane Buxton (LNWR) Uttoxeter Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/11/1951 12/11/1960 28/01/1961 28/08/1965 |
28/08/1965 |
4F | 4491 | 44491 | 12/1927 | 2C 1A 2E 8B W |
Northampton Willesden Northampton Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1956 26/01/1957 30/06/1962 08/10/1962 |
08/10/1962 |
4F | 4492 | 44492 | 10/1927 | 3B 3D 1A 3D 8F 9F 15E W |
Bushbury Aston Willesden Aston Springs Branch (Wigan) Heaton Mersey Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1956 29/12/1956 26/01/1957 14/07/1962 22/06/1963 08/02/1964 05/1964 |
05/1964 |
4F | 4493 | 44493 | 11/1927 | 6B 8C 6H 8G W |
Mold Junction Speke Junction Bangor Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/06/1960 17/09/1960 10/06/1961 26/10/1963 |
26/10/1963 |
4F | 4494 | 44494 | 11/1927 | 5E 5B 5E 5E NTH NTH 8E 8E 8C 8B W |
Alsager Crewe South Alsager Alsager Northwich Northwich Brunswick Brunswick Speke Junction Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1949 26/11/1949 24/12/1949 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 16/09/1961 04/11/1961 07/1963 |
07/1963 |
4F | 4495 | 44495 | 11/1927 | 12B 12D W |
Carlisle Upperby Workington Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4496 | 44496 | 11/1927 | 5D W |
Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4497 | 44497 | 11/1927 | 1A 8G 9D W |
Willesden Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1960 18/08/1962 14/11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
4F | 4498 | 44498 | 11/1927 | 5D W |
Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4499 | 44499 | 11/1927 | 5D W |
Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/09/1964 |
26/09/1964 |
4F | 4500 | 44500 | 11/1927 | 5D 5B 8F 12C W |
Stoke Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/12/1963 26/12/1964 04/12/1965 09/07/1966 |
09/07/1966 |
4F | 4501 | 44501 | 11/1927 | 20A 20C 20C 20A 17A 17E 16J 15E W |
Holbeck (MR) Royston Royston Holbeck (MR) Derby Heaton Mersey Rowsley Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 24/04/1954 06/10/1956 20/04/1957 15/02/1964 09/05/1964 12/12/1964 |
12/12/1964 |
4F | 4502 | 44502 | 11/1927 | 5D W |
Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4503 | 44503 | 11/1927 | 5D 2A 5D 5E 5E W |
Stoke Rugby Stoke Alsager Alsager Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 29/12/1951 06/09/1952 27/12/1952 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4504 | 44504 | 11/1927 | 5F 6H 2E 9D 6H W |
Uttoxeter Bangor Northampton Buxton (LNWR) Bangor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/01/1960 11/06/1960 02/07/1960 10/09/1960 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4505 | 44505 | 11/1927 | 12D W |
Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1965 |
11/09/1965 |
4F | 4506 | 44506 | 12/1927 | 3E W |
Monument Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/10/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4507 | 44507 | 06/1928 | 1A 5D W |
Willesden Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4508 | 44508 | 06/1928 | 5D 9D W |
Stoke Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1960 09/1962 |
09/1962 |
4F | 4509 | 44509 | 08/1928 | 16B 31B W |
Spital Bridge March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
4F | 4510 | 44510 | 06/1928 | 11A W |
Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/02/1960 |
20/02/1960 |
4F | 4511 | 44511 | 06/1928 | 2A 11B W |
Rugby Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4512 | 44512 | 06/1928 | 3B 3B 3E 3C 3A 66A 66B 21B 9G W |
Bushbury Bushbury Monument Lane Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Polmadie Motherwell Bescot Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/04/1951 19/05/1951 29/12/1951 24/03/1956 14/06/1958 09/03/1963 16/03/1963 06/07/1963 14/09/1963 01/02/1964 |
01/02/1964 |
4F | 4513 | 44513 | 06/1928 | 5D W |
Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
4F | 4514 | 44514 | 06/1928 | 3E 21D 8F 9F 16E W |
Monument Lane Aston Springs Branch (Wigan) Heaton Mersey Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/02/1962 14/07/1962 06/07/1963 08/02/1964 26/09/1964 |
26/09/1964 |
4F | 4515 | 44515 | 06/1928 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4516 | 44516 | 06/1928 | 21A 21B 21A 17C 21A 2F 2E W |
Saltley Bournville Saltley Rowsley Saltley Bescot Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/11/1958 20/02/1960 16/12/1961 30/12/1961 04/01/1964 18/04/1964 09/1964 |
09/1964 |
4F | 4517 | 44517 | 07/1928 | 3D 5D 5D 8F 5D 17A 17C W |
Aston Stoke Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Stoke Derby Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/09/1957 05/10/1957 14/07/1962 10/11/1962 01/12/1962 22/06/1963 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4518 | 44518 | 07/1928 | 16B 41B 41E W |
Spital Bridge Sheffield Grimesthorpe Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1960 04/03/1961 09/1962 |
09/1962 |
4F | 4519 | 44519 | 07/1928 | 16B 15C W |
Spital Bridge Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1960 26/01/1963 |
26/01/1963 |
4F | 4520 | 44520 | 07/1928 | 21A 21B 21A 21B 21A 1A W |
Saltley Bournville Saltley Bournville Saltley Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1951 12/07/1952 21/02/1953 18/04/1953 04/01/1964 04/01/1964 |
04/01/1964 |
4F | 4521 | 44521 | 07/1928 | 16B 31B W |
Spital Bridge March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
4F | 4522 | 44522 | 07/1928 | 16B 2E 8B W |
Spital Bridge Northampton Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1960 30/06/1962 09/10/1965 |
09/10/1965 |
4F | 4523 | 44523 | 08/1928 | 22C 82E W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1960 08/1963 |
26/07/1963 |
4F | 4524 | 44524 | 08/1928 | 21A 21D 2E 8B 9D W |
Saltley Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Northampton Warrington Dallam Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 21/02/1953 30/06/1962 06/10/1962 19/01/1963 |
19/01/1963 |
4F | 4525 | 44525 | 08/1928 | 21A 21D 2E 2E 3D 3D 12D 6G 99C W |
Saltley Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Northampton Northampton Aston Aston Workington Llandudno Junction Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 06/11/1954 04/12/1954 19/12/1964 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 |
4F | 4526 | 44526 | 08/1928 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1963 |
30/11/1963 |
4F | 4527 | 44527 | 08/1928 | 17B 10G W |
Burton Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1964 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 |
4F | 4528 | 44528 | 08/1928 | 17B 16G W |
Burton Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/10/1964 15/05/1965 |
15/05/1965 |
4F | 4529 | 44529 | 08/1928 | 14B 14A 18A 15C W |
Kentish Town Cricklewood East Toton Kettering Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 13/04/1963 08/08/1964 05/09/1964 |
05/09/1964 |
4F | 4530 | 44530 | 09/1928 | 13A 14B 14B 91E 14A 15C W |
Plaistow Kentish Town Kentish Town To Eastern Region Cricklewood East Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/03/1951 24/03/1951 19/05/1951 22/03/1952 21/01/1961 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4531 | 44531 | 09/1928 | 14B 14A 14B 14A 18A W |
Kentish Town Cricklewood East Kentish Town Cricklewood East Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 28/05/1949 04/08/1962 16/02/1963 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 |
4F | 4532 | 44532 | 09/1928 | 14B 14A 14B 14A 16A W |
Kentish Town Cricklewood East Kentish Town Cricklewood East Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 28/05/1949 04/08/1962 23/02/1963 27/04/1963 |
27/04/1963 |
4F | 4533 | 44533 | 09/1928 | 16A 9E W |
Nottingham Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/11/1961 01/02/1964 |
01/02/1964 |
4F | 4534 | 44534 | 09/1928 | 22A SR 82E W |
Bristol Barrow Road To Southern Region Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 29/06/1963 28/11/1964 |
13/11/1964 |
4F | 4535 | 44535 | 09/1928 | 22C 21A 15C 91M 15B 19A 41E W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Saltley Leicester Midland To London Midland Region Kettering Sheffield Grimesthorpe Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 19/03/1952 22/03/1952 05/10/1957 04/03/1961 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4536 | 44536 | 09/1928 | 22A 5D 8F 8G 12D W |
Bristol Barrow Road Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1959 09/11/1963 29/02/1964 20/02/1965 28/08/1965 |
28/08/1965 |
4F | 4537 | 44537 | 09/1928 | 22A 22A 8F 11A W |
Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Springs Branch (Wigan) Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 24/10/1959 07/11/1959 08/10/1962 |
08/10/1962 |
4F | 4538 | 44538 | 10/1928 | 21A 17B W |
Saltley Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1954 25/01/1964 |
25/01/1964 |
4F | 4539 | 44539 | 10/1928 | 17C W |
Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/09/1963 |
07/09/1963 |
4F | 4540 | 44540 | 10/1928 | 17D 17A 14E 15B 15A W |
Rowsley Derby Bedford Wellingborough Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 07/04/1962 14/09/1963 02/11/1963 16/05/1964 |
16/05/1964 |
4F | 4541 | 44541 | 10/1928 | 23B 27E 17B 18A W |
Aintree Walton on the Hill Burton Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 14/06/1958 01/06/1963 09/11/1963 |
09/11/1963 |
4F | 4542 | 44542 | 11/1928 | 17A 17B W |
Derby Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1956 07/1963 |
07/1963 |
4F | 4543 | 44543 | 11/1928 | 26A 5B 26B 26A W |
Newton Heath Crewe South Agecroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 12/02/1949 12/03/1949 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4544 | 44544 | 11/1928 | 26A 26D 24B 24B 27E 27E 27D 9G 9D W |
Newton Heath Bury Rose Grove Rose Grove Walton on the Hill Walton on the Hill Wigan Central (L&Y) Gorton Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 18/04/1953 18/04/1964 14/11/1964 03/04/1965 |
03/04/1965 |
4F | 4545 | 44545 | 11/1928 | 21A 17A 17A 17C 17A W |
Saltley Derby Derby Rowsley Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 04/03/1961 13/10/1962 23/03/1963 |
23/03/1963 |
4F | 4546 | 44546 | 11/1928 | 16A W |
Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4547 | 44547 | 11/1928 | 18A 14B 16C 20F 19A W |
Toton Kentish Town Kirkby in Ashfield Skipton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1948 02/10/1948 06/11/1948 06/10/1956 09/1961 |
09/1961 |
4F | 4548 | 44548 | 11/1928 | 9D 5D 8F 10H 10G W |
Buxton (LNWR) Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Lower Darwen Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1949 09/11/1963 14/12/1963 07/11/1964 09/01/1965 |
09/01/1965 |
4F | 4549 | 44549 | 12/1928 | 2B 12E 12D W |
Bletchley Moor Row Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1949 29/11/1952 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 |
4F | 4550 | 44550 | 12/1928 | 19A 20C W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1954 02/03/1962 |
02/03/1962 |
4F | 4551 | 44551 | 12/1928 | 17B 18A 17B W |
Burton Toton Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/01/1962 10/03/1962 05/1963 |
05/1963 |
4F | 4552 | 44552 | 12/1928 | 18A 14A 17B 14A 16C 17B W |
Toton Cricklewood East Burton Cricklewood East Kirkby in Ashfield Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 16/04/1949 28/05/1949 01/10/1949 01/11/1952 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4553 | 44553 | 12/1928 | 22B 22A 22A 9D 8B W |
Gloucester Barnwood Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Buxton (LNWR) Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 12/08/1962 06/10/1962 27/10/1962 |
27/10/1962 |
4F | 4554 | 44554 | 12/1928 | 20H 16B 17C 9F 15E W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Spital Bridge Coalville Heaton Mersey Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 20/08/1949 13/12/1958 15/02/1964 03/1964 |
03/1964 |
4F | 4555 | 44555 | 12/1928 | 20G 17A 20E 14A 16A W |
Hellifield Derby Manningham Cricklewood East Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/12/1950 30/01/1954 27/03/1954 06/11/1954 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4556 | 44556 | 12/1928 | 20H 19A 17D W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Sheffield Grimesthorpe Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 17/07/1954 07/12/1963 |
07/12/1963 |
4F | 4557 | 44557 | 04/1922 | 22C 71H 12A W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Templecombe (S&D) Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/07/1957 12/08/1962 15/09/1962 |
15/09/1962 |
4F | 4558 | 44558 | 04/1922 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/12/1964 |
14/12/1964 |
4F | 4559 | 44559 | 04/1922 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/02/1963 |
11/01/1963 |
4F | 4560 | 44560 | 04/1922 | 22C 82G 85B 85B W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Templecombe (S&D) Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1960 22/11/1964 13/06/1965 09/1965 |
25/08/1965 |
4F | 4561 | 44561 | 04/1922 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1962 |
05/04/1962 |
4F | 4562 | 44562 | 05/1937 | 20D 20B 17B W |
Normanton Stourton Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 06/10/1956 09/11/1963 |
09/11/1963 |
4F | 4563 | 44563 | 07/1937 | 14B W |
Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4564 | 44564 | 07/1937 | 17D 9E W |
Rowsley Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/01/1960 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4565 | 44565 | 07/1937 | 17A 17D 9E W |
Derby Rowsley Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 09/01/1960 26/09/1964 |
26/09/1964 |
4F | 4566 | 44566 | 07/1937 | 17A 17D 9E W |
Derby Rowsley Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 09/01/1960 26/09/1964 |
26/09/1964 |
4F | 4567 | 44567 | 07/1937 | 21A 21D 22B 24G 26D W |
Saltley Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Gloucester Barnwood Skipton Bury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 21/02/1953 26/03/1960 15/09/1962 06/1964 |
06/1964 |
4F | 4568 | 44568 | 08/1937 | 19A 41D W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1961 11/1963 |
11/1963 |
4F | 4569 | 44569 | 08/1937 | 22A 22A W |
Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 20/07/1964 |
13/07/1964 |
4F | 4570 | 44570 | 08/1937 | 20D 20E 23A 23A 20B W |
Normanton Manningham Skipton Skipton Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/10/1948 02/06/1951 16/06/1951 20/10/1951 25/10/1965 |
25/10/1965 |
4F | 4571 | 44571 | 08/1937 | 21A 21B 21A 5B 8D 5B W |
Saltley Bournville Saltley Crewe South Widnes Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/11/1958 20/02/1960 25/07/1964 22/08/1964 24/10/1964 12/12/1964 |
12/12/1964 |
4F | 4572 | 44572 | 09/1937 | 19A 20H 16B 17C 14B 14A 18A 16E W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Lancaster Green Ayre Spital Bridge Coalville Kentish Town Cricklewood East Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 18/06/1949 20/08/1949 20/06/1959 25/08/1962 16/02/1963 09/11/1963 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4573 | 44573 | 09/1937 | 19A 41E W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1961 24/05/1962 |
24/05/1962 |
4F | 4574 | 44574 | 09/1937 | 15A 18A W 16E |
Wellingborough Toton Withdrawn Kirkby in Ashfield |
01/01/1948 08/12/1962 10/1963 05/10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4575 | 44575 | 09/1937 | 15A 18A 15A 15E W |
Wellingborough Toton Leicester Midland Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1963 08/08/1964 03/10/1964 14/11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
4F | 4576 | 44576 | 10/1937 | 22B 22C 19C 19C W |
Gloucester Barnwood Bath Green Park (S&D) Canklow Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/10/1949 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 17/05/1962 |
17/05/1962 |
4F | 4577 | 44577 | 04/1939 | 16A 16A W |
Nottingham Nottingham Withdrawn |
04/1939 01/01/1948 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4578 | 44578 | 04/1939 | 16A 17A 14E 16B W |
Nottingham Derby Bedford Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/11/1961 07/04/1962 22/06/1963 15/02/1964 |
15/02/1964 |
4F | 4579 | 44579 | 04/1939 | 20G 24G W |
Hellifield Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/01/1960 03/11/1962 |
03/11/1962 |
4F | 4580 | 44580 | 05/1939 | 21A 2F 2E W |
Saltley Bescot Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1964 21/11/1964 21/11/1964 |
21/11/1964 |
4F | 4581 | 44581 | 05/1939 | 14A 14B 14A 15D W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Cricklewood East Coalville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 01/10/1949 03/03/1962 12/09/1964 |
12/09/1964 |
4F | 4582 | 44582 | 05/1939 | 15D 20A 20C W |
Bedford Holbeck (MR) Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/11/1951 08/10/1955 18/11/1963 |
18/11/1963 |
4F | 4583 | 44583 | 06/1939 | 21A 15C 15C 21A 5B 99C 5B W |
Saltley Leicester Midland Leicester Midland Saltley Crewe South Crewe Works Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 19/06/1954 28/12/1963 25/04/1964 25/07/1964 08/1964 |
08/1964 |
4F | 4584 | 44584 | 07/1939 | 21A 20A 20B 20B W |
Saltley Holbeck (MR) Stourton Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 18/11/1963 |
18/11/1963 |
4F | 4585 | 44585 | 07/1939 | 22C 16A W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 09/1960 |
09/1960 |
4F | 4586 | 44586 | 09/1939 | 20D 20B W |
Normanton Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 07/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
4F | 4587 | 44587 | 09/1939 | 21D 22B 8E 9E 9L W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Gloucester Barnwood Brunswick Trafford Park (LMS) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 23/03/1957 16/09/1961 27/03/1965 15/05/1965 |
15/05/1965 |
4F | 4588 | 44588 | 09/1939 | 17D 16C W |
Rowsley Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/05/1964 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 |
4F | 4589 | 44589 | 09/1939 | 16C 17A 21A 27F 8C 8B W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Derby Saltley Brunswick Speke Junction Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1956 06/12/1958 10/01/1959 16/09/1961 04/11/1961 14/11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
4F | 4590 | 44590 | 09/1939 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1961 |
09/1961 |
4F | 4591 | 44591 | 10/1939 | 21A 17B 16E W |
Saltley Burton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1954 26/09/1964 28/11/1964 |
28/11/1964 |
4F | 4592 | 44592 | 10/1939 | 3E 5B W |
Monument Lane Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1955 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4593 | 44593 | 10/1939 | 12D 9F 9F 4A 4A 2B 6C 8B 5D 6C 5D 99C W |
Workington Heaton Mersey Heaton Mersey Bletchley Bletchley Nuneaton Birkenhead Mollington Street Warrington Dallam Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Stoke Crewe Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 18/08/1951 08/09/1951 25/01/1958 22/03/1958 19/04/1958 01/11/1958 29/06/1963 14/09/1963 09/11/1963 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 |
4F | 4594 | 44594 | 10/1939 | 11B 12A W |
Barrow in Furness Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/09/1961 08/10/1962 |
08/10/1962 |
4F | 4595 | 44595 | 10/1939 | 5E 5B 5E 5B 5E 5B 8D 6B W |
Alsager Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Alsager Crewe South Widnes Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 14/08/1948 29/10/1949 01/07/1950 20/10/1951 18/06/1960 24/09/1960 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4596 | 44596 | 11/1939 | 2C 12D 5D 5D 12A 9D 8G W |
Northampton Workington Stoke Stoke Carlisle Upperby Buxton (LNWR) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 24/03/1956 17/09/1960 15/10/1960 09/1963 |
09/1963 |
4F | 4597 | 44597 | 03/1940 | 17B 10G 12D W |
Burton Skipton Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1964 20/03/1965 09/1965 |
09/1965 |
4F | 4598 | 44598 | 03/1940 | 16A 16A 18B W |
Nottingham Nottingham Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/07/1948 22/03/1952 10/1963 |
10/1963 |
4F | 4599 | 44599 | 04/1940 | 17B 16G 9L W |
Burton Westhouses Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/10/1964 07/11/1964 11/1965 |
11/1965 |
4F | 4600 | 44600 | 07/1940 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1960 |
05/03/1960 |
4F | 4601 | 44601 | 08/1940 | 17A 17B 22B 17A 5D 11A W |
Derby Burton Gloucester Barnwood Derby Stoke Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/01/1954 24/04/1954 24/03/1956 07/11/1959 28/11/1959 13/11/1965 |
13/11/1965 |
4F | 4602 | 44602 | 08/1940 | 17A 17D 9G W |
Derby Rowsley Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1955 12/05/1962 09/1964 |
09/1964 |
4F | 4603 | 44603 | 09/1940 | 20D 21A 18C W |
Normanton Saltley Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1953 31/10/1953 24/10/1964 |
24/10/1964 |
4F | 4604 | 44604 | 09/1940 | 20D W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/01/1964 |
20/01/1964 |
4F | 4605 | 44605 | 02/1941 | 17A 18B 27E 21A W |
Derby Westhouses Walton on the Hill Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/07/1950 23/03/1957 13/10/1962 09/1964 |
09/1964 |
4F | 4606 | 44606 | 03/1941 | 21D 18D W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 23/03/1962 |
23/03/1962 |