LYR/LMS Hughes "898" Class 0-6-0
Class | LYR | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
898 | 625 | 12528 | 52528 | 09/1909 | 26C W |
Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 |
27/11/1948 |
898 | 907 | 12541 | 52541 | 04/1912 | 24C W |
Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 |
898 | 917 | 12542 | 52542 | 04/1912 | 24E W |
Blackpool Central Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1950 |
03/1950 |
898 | 1364 | 12545 | 52545 | 05/1912 | 26F W |
Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 |
13/11/1948 |
898 | 239 | 12549 | 52549 | 06/1912 | 26B 25F 23B 23D 26F 26F 26E W |
Agecroft Low Moor Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Lees (Oldham) Lees (Oldham) Bacup Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 12/02/1949 24/09/1949 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 21/03/1953 06/11/1954 |
06/11/1954 |
898 | 20 | 12551 | 52551 | 06/1912 | 12E 4A 10A 6H 10A W |
Moor Row Shrewsbury Springs Branch (Wigan) Bangor Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 14/06/1952 11/08/1956 06/10/1956 23/03/1957 |
23/03/1957 |
898 | 237 | 12554 | 52554 | 08/1912 | 26D 27D W |
Bury Wigan Central (L&Y) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1951 25/10/1952 |
25/10/1952 |
898 | 893 | 12568 | 52568 | 11/1909 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 |
13/03/1948 |