LYR/LMS Aspinall "23" Class 0-6-0ST
Class | LYR | LMS (1924) | BR | Built | Date Withdrawn | Modification | Modification Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 528 | 11335 | 08/1876 | 12/1930 | Reboilered | 09/1913 | |
23 | 529 | (11332) | 08/1876 | 06/1928 | Reboilered | 08/1898 | |
23 | 530 | 11332 | 02/1877 | 12/1932 | Reboilered | 07/1913 | |
23 | 531 | 11316 | 51316 | 03/1877 | 24/01/1959 | Reboilered | 05/1915 |
23 | 532 | 11330 | 03/1877 | 11/1930 | Reboilered | 02/1914 | |
23 | 533 | 11308 | 03/1877 | 03/1939 | Reboilered | 08/1903 | |
23 | 534 | 11307 | 51307 | 03/1877 | 23/11/1957 | Reboilered | 01/1917 |
23 | 535 | 11318 | (51318) | 04/1877 | 02/1949 | Reboilered | 04/1915 |
23 | 536 | 11315 | 04/1877 | 12/1930 | Reboilered | 03/1905 | |
23 | 538 | 11313 | 51313 | 07/1877 | 27/10/1956 | Reboilered | 12/1915 |
23 | 539 | (11317) | 07/1877 | 12/1928 | Reboilered | 01/1910 | |
23 | 540 | (11331) | 08/1877 | 10/1926 | Reboilered | 05/1916 | |
23 | 541 | 11328 | 08/1877 | 05/1936 | Reboilered | 12/1906 | |
23 | 542 | 11309 | 08/1877 | 12/1930 | Reboilered | 05/1915 | |
23 | 543 | 11303 | 08/1877 | 12/1928 | Reboilered | 08/1897 | |
23 | 544 | 11343 | 51343 | 02/1878 | 30/01/1960 | Reboilered | 09/1912 |
23 | 545 | (11354) | 02/1878 | 04/1928 | Reboilered | 11/1915 | |
23 | 546 | 11350 | 02/1878 | 12/1930 | Reboilered | 11/1915 | |
23 | 547 | 11361 | 51361 | 02/1878 | 27/10/1956 | Reboilered | 09/1903 |
23 | 548 | 11351 | 02/1878 | 11/1930 | Reboilered | 09/1914 | |
23 | 550 | 11326 | 06/1877 | 12/1928 | Reboilered | 07/1902 | |
23 | 552 | (11324) | 06/1877 | 10/1963 | Reboilered | 12/1896 | |
23 | 553 | 11305 | (51305) | 06/1877 | 12/1964 | Reboilered | 02/1914 |
23 | 554 | 11314 | 06/1877 | 03/1939 | Reboilered | 11/1909 | |
23 | 556 | 11311 | 08/1877 | 04/1928 | Reboilered | 01/1899 | |
23 | 559 | 11325 | (51325) | 08/1877 | 03/1949 | Reboilered | 01/1897 |
23 | 560 | 11312 | 09/1877 | 11/1933 | Reboilered | 04/1914 | |
23 | 561 | 11319 | 51319 | 09/1877 | 14/11/1959 | Reboilered | 08/1899 |
23 | 562 | 11338 | 51338 | 10/1877 | 20/07/1957 | Reboilered | 04/1916 |
23 | 567 | 11310 | 11/1877 | 12/1928 | Reboilered | 02/1899 | |
23 | 240 | (11359) | 08/1878 | 06/1928 | Reboilered | 04/1915 | |
23 | 242 | 11366 | 08/1878 | 01/1946 | Reboilered | 11/1909 | |
23 | 257 | 11370 | 09/1878 | 11/1930 | Reboilered | 11/1915 | |
23 | 238 | 11363 | 09/1878 | 09/1934 | Reboilered | 05/1915 | |
23 | 143 | 11364 | 09/1878 | 02/1939 | Reboilered | 10/1900 | |
23 | 245 | (11346) | 10/1878 | 06/1928 | Reboilered | 11/1917 | |
23 | 236 | 11345 | 51345 | 12/1878 | 06/10/1956 | Reboilered | 04/1915 |
23 | 256 | 11369 | 12/1878 | 04/1939 | Reboilered | 06/1908 | |
23 | 311 | 11365 | 03/1879 | 03/1938 | Reboilered | 06/1916 | |
23 | 249 | 11342 | (51342) | 04/1879 | 18/09/1948 | Reboilered | 10/1913 |
23 | 248 | 11347 | 05/1879 | 05/1939 | Reboilered | 10/1900 | |
23 | 268 | 11349 | 06/1879 | 12/1930 | Reboilered | 12/1916 | |
23 | 314 | 11344 | 08/1879 | 11/1930 | Reboilered | 08/1913 | |
23 | 258 | 11355 | 09/1879 | 12/1932 | Reboilered | 11/1915 | |
23 | 615 | (11428) | 02/1880 | 04/1928 | Reboilered | 10/1899 | |
23 | 663 | 11489 | 51489 | 02/1880 | 10/02/1954 | Reboilered | 04/1916 |
23 | 175 | 11425 | 51425 | 03/1880 | 07/1956 | Reboilered | 11/1909 |
23 | 324 | 11426 | 03/1880 | 02/1936 | Reboilered | 09/1905 | |
23 | 292 | 11458 | 51458 | 06/1880 | 16/05/1959 | Reboilered | 12/1913 |
23 | 284 | 11415 | 51415 | 08/1880 | 25/10/1958 | Reboilered | 01/1914 |
23 | 303 | 11387 | 10/1880 | 11/1930 | Reboilered | 01/1917 | |
23 | 304 | 11418 | 01/1881 | 12/1947 | Reboilered | 01/1915 | |
23 | 307 | 11383 | 02/1881 | 09/1932 | Reboilered | 06/1902 | |
23 | 309 | 11406 | 05/1881 | 05/1936 | Reboilered | 11/1916 | |
23 | 322 | 11444 | 51444 | 07/1881 | 09/1961 | Reboilered | 11/1916 |
23 | 305 | 11511 | 51511 | 09/1881 | 01/10/1955 | Reboilered | 02/1914 |
23 | 122 | 11353 | 51353 | 10/1878 | 07/1957 | Reboilered | 01/1900 |
23 | 128 | 11352 | 10/1878 | 04/1938 | Reboilered | 12/1918 | |
23 | 164 | 11371 | 51371 | 10/1878 | 25/03/1961 | Reboilered | 07/1916 |
23 | 168 | 11341 | 11/1878 | 10/1928 | Reboilered | 06/1912 | |
23 | 172 | (11339) | 11/1878 | 06/1927 | Reboilered | 12/1897 | |
23 | 174 | (11334) | 11/1878 | 10/1926 | Reboilered | 11/1899 | |
23 | 178 | (11333) | 11/1878 | 10/1926 | Reboilered | 07/1902 | |
23 | 180 | (11340) | 11/1878 | 03/1928 | Reboilered | 11/1917 | |
23 | 165 | 11348 | 51348 | 10/1878 | 05/09/1953 | Reboilered | 02/1899 |
23 | 126 | (11389) | 12/1879 | 12/1928 | Reboilered | 03/1906 | |
23 | 136 | 11379 | 51379 | 12/1879 | 09/04/1955 | Reboilered | 01/1914 |
23 | 138 | 11381 | 51381 | 01/1880 | 23/11/1957 | Reboilered | 04/1914 |
23 | 140 | 11417 | 01/1880 | 12/1932 | Reboilered | 07/1907 | |
23 | 148 | 11408 | 51408 | 02/1880 | 17/02/1962 | Reboilered | 09/1912 |
23 | 149 | 11437 | 02/1880 | 09/1939 | Reboilered | 03/1916 | |
23 | 166 | 11419 | 51419 | 05/1880 | 23/09/1961 | Reboilered | 01/1914 |
23 | 167 | 11395 | 05/1880 | 12/1932 | Reboilered | 11/1909 | |
23 | 173 | 11394 | (51394) | 06/1880 | 05/1960 | Reboilered | 01/1915 |
23 | 179 | 11384 | 08/1880 | 12/1930 | Reboilered | 07/1912 | |
23 | 181 | 11376 | 51376 | 09/1880 | 16/04/1955 | Reboilered | 03/1907 |
23 | 197 | 11405 | (51405) | 09/1880 | 11/12/1948 | Reboilered | 12/1914 |
23 | 204 | 11308 | 09/1880 | 03/1939 | Reboilered | 07/1916 | |
23 | 207 | (11374) | 09/1880 | 10/1926 | Reboilered | 04/1916 | |
23 | 222 | 11386 | 10/1880 | 12/1930 | Reboilered | 09/1912 | |
23 | 568 | 11521 | 51521 | 08/1880 | 20/10/1956 | Reboilered | 09/1913 |
23 | 569 | 11485 | 08/1880 | 02/1936 | Reboilered | 02/1914 | |
23 | 572 | 11459 | 09/1880 | 02/1938 | Reboilered | 01/1917 | |
23 | 574 | 11397 | 51397 | 09/1880 | 21/03/1959 | Reboilered | 09/1913 |
23 | 579 | 11500 | 51500 | 10/1880 | 16/02/1957 | Reboilered | 01/1910 |
23 | 581 | 11466 | 11/1880 | 01/1936 | Reboilered | 02/1916 | |
23 | 583 | 11423 | 51423 | 03/1881 | 12/1958 | Reboilered | 10/1916 |
23 | 593 | 11509 | 02/1881 | 10/1939 | Reboilered | 12/1914 | |
23 | 595 | 11530 | 51530 | 03/1881 | 26/11/1955 | Reboilered | 08/1891 |
23 | 598 | 11412 | 51412 | 03/1881 | 01/09/1962 | Reboilered | 10/1912 |
23 | 599 | 11421 | 03/1881 | 12/1939 | Reboilered | 10/1917 | |
23 | 600 | 11473 | 04/1881 | 12/1930 | Reboilered | 03/1916 | |
23 | 747 | 11413 | 51413 | 04/1881 | 12/08/1961 | Reboilered | 01/1915 |
23 | 749 | 11430 | 05/1881 | 01/1936 | Reboilered | 01/1907 | |
23 | 751 | 11513 | 51513 | 05/1881 | 05/05/1956 | Reboilered | 08/1908 |
23 | 753 | 11435 | 05/1881 | 01/1939 | Reboilered | 02/1915 | |
23 | 754 | 11433 | 06/1881 | 05/1932 | Reboilered | 07/1907 | |
23 | 755 | 11399 | 06/1881 | 12/1930 | Reboilered | 06/1908 | |
23 | 757 | 11493 | 06/1881 | 11/1933 | Reboilered | 07/1916 | |
23 | 758 | 11454 | 06/1881 | 11/1930 | Reboilered | 01/1900 | |
23 | 759 | 11403 | 09/1881 | 02/1936 | Reboilered | 11/1909 | |
23 | 760 | 11495 | (51495) | 09/1881 | 05/1949 | Reboilered | 04/1905 |
23 | 763 | 11464 | 51464 | 10/1881 | 06/10/1956 | Reboilered | 01/1916 |
23 | 764 | 11499 | 51499 | 10/1881 | 06/1957 | Reboilered | 10/1913 |
23 | 766 | 11449 | 11/1881 | 03/1928 | Reboilered | 04/1914 | |
23 | 767 | 11436 | 51436 | 11/1881 | 12/03/1955 | Reboilered | 11/1909 |
23 | 772 | 11492 | (51492) | 01/1882 | 07/1949 | Reboilered | 02/1915 |
23 | 773 | 11443 | (51443) | 01/1882 | 05/1949 | Reboilered | 11/1917 |
23 | 775 | 11391 | 02/1882 | 01/1936 | Reboilered | 11/1916 | |
23 | 776 | 11388 | 02/1882 | 12/1939 | Reboilered | 12/1905 | |
23 | 777 | 11465 | 02/1882 | 01/1939 | Reboilered | 02/1916 | |
23 | 778 | 11429 | 51429 | 02/1882 | 06/05/1961 | Reboilered | 08/1913 |
23 | 780 | 11407 | 02/1882 | 02/1942 | Reboilered | 09/1916 | |
23 | 782 | 11457 | 51457 | 02/1883 | 21/03/1959 | Reboilered | 03/1914 |
23 | 783 | 11390 | 51390 | 03/1882 | 07/07/1956 | Reboilered | 03/1915 |
23 | 785 | 11393 | 03/1882 | 12/1932 | Reboilered | 12/1915 | |
23 | 786 | 11507 | 03/1882 | 11/1933 | Reboilered | 07/1914 | |
23 | 787 | 11503 | 51503 | 03/1882 | 11/04/1957 | Reboilered | 08/1913 |
23 | 788 | 11484 | 51484 | 04/1882 | 13/06/1959 | Reboilered | 02/1917 |
23 | 795 | 11434 | 12/1882 | 04/1946 | Reboilered | 11/1913 | |
23 | 796 | 11517 | 12/1882 | 02/1937 | Reboilered | 04/1916 | |
23 | 797 | 11487 | (51487) | 12/1882 | 23/10/1948 | Reboilered | 12/1892 |
23 | 798 | 11441 | 51441 | 01/1883 | 18/03/1961 | Reboilered | 05/1916 |
23 | 801 | 11453 | 51453 | 01/1883 | 09/1958 | Reboilered | 07/1908 |
23 | 802 | 11524 | 51524 | 02/1883 | 10/09/1960 | Reboilered | 04/1914 |
23 | 803 | 11475 | (51475) | 03/1883 | 11/1949 | Reboilered | 02/1914 |
23 | 804 | 11463 | 03/1883 | 06/1939 | Reboilered | 11/1913 | |
23 | 805 | 11532 | 03/1883 | 02/1938 | Reboilered | 10/1913 | |
23 | 807 | 11400 | (51400) | 03/1883 | 12/11/1949 | Reboilered | 06/1916 |
23 | 809 | 11514 | 51514 | 04/1883 | 21/11/1953 | Reboilered | 11/1912 |
23 | 810 | 11510 | 51510 | 04/1883 | 10/1955 | Reboilered | 11/1913 |
23 | 812 | 11490 | 51490 | 04/1883 | 15/08/1953 | Reboilered | 11/1918 |
23 | 843 | 11482 | (51482) | 03/1885 | 10/1949 | Reboilered | 05/1916 |
23 | 844 | 11519 | 51519 | 03/1885 | 18/09/1954 | Reboilered | 08/1896 |
23 | 845 | 11488 | 51488 | 03/1885 | 10/03/1956 | Reboilered | 10/1909 |
23 | 846 | 11496 | 51496 | 03/1885 | 18/03/1961 | Reboilered | 04/1914 |
23 | 847 | 11477 | 51477 | 03/1885 | 13/08/1955 | Reboilered | 05/1915 |
23 | 849 | 11529 | 04/1885 | 12/1932 | Reboilered | 08/1896 | |
23 | 850 | 11522 | 04/1885 | 12/1933 | Reboilered | 05/1916 |