Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 2889 Today
» 5326 Yesterday
» 8215 Week
» 143620 Month
» 603561 Year
» 5042998 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)

LMS Fowler "2F" Class 0-6-0T


Class LMS LMS (1933) LMS (1939) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
2F 11270 7100 7160 47160 12/1928 6C
6F
6E
6F
1D
6C
8C
6C
6F
6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bidston
Wrexham Rhosddu
Bidston
Devons Road (Bow)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Speke Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1952
23/03/1957
18/05/1957
30/11/1957
14/06/1958
19/12/1959
17/12/1960
15/12/1962
09/02/1963
26/10/1963
26/10/1963
2F 11271 7101 7161 47161 12/1928 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1963
10/08/1963
2F 11272 7102 7162 47162 12/1928 28B
64A
W
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
09/12/1959
09/12/1959
2F 11273 7103 7163 47163 12/1928 28B
66D
66C
66D
W
Dalry Road
Greenock Ladyburn
Hamilton (West)
Greenock Ladyburn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/09/1960
24/02/1962
16/06/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
2F 11274 7104 7164 47164 12/1928 6C
6F
1D
6C
8G
6C
8C
6C
6F
6C
99H
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bidston
Devons Road (Bow)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Speke Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Horwich Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1952
11/08/1956
14/06/1958
04/04/1959
04/07/1959
19/12/1959
04/02/1961
15/12/1962
09/02/1963
09/11/1963
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
2F 11275 7105 7165 47165 12/1928 24F
26B
26C
99H
W
Fleetwood
Agecroft
Bolton
Horwich Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1961
18/11/1961
09/11/1963
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
2F 11276 7106 7166 47166 12/1928 6C
6F
10D
6F
8A
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bidston
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Bidston
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1952
30/11/1957
06/09/1958
08/04/1961
11/05/1963
11/05/1963
2F 11277 7107 7167 47167 01/1929 27B
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/07/1960
07/07/1960
2F 11278 7108 7168 47168 01/1929 27B
66C
66D
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Hamilton (West)
Greenock Ladyburn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1962
16/06/1962
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
2F 11279 7109 7169 47169 01/1929 27B
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/09/1959
04/09/1959