01/1920 |
Condemned |
178 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1920 |
Condemned |
1257 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1920 |
Condemned |
69 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1920 |
Condemned |
484 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1922 |
Condemned |
3718 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1922 |
Condemned |
994 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1922 |
Condemned |
1012 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1922 |
Condemned |
782 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1924 |
Condemned |
7697 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1924 |
Condemned |
7556 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1924 |
Condemned |
7776 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1925 |
Condemned |
7589 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1926 |
Condemned |
7637 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1926 |
Condemned |
7644 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1926 |
Condemned |
7633 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1926 |
Condemned |
2492 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1926 |
Condemned |
1251 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7612 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7622 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7628 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7658 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7683 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7723 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7745 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7754 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7786 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7810 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1927 |
Condemned |
7819 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1927 |
Condemned |
7670 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1927 |
Condemned |
7798 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1927 |
Condemned |
7837 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1927 |
Condemned |
7570 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1927 |
Condemned |
7598 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1927 |
Condemned |
7653 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1927 |
Condemned |
7675 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1927 |
Condemned |
7767 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1927 |
Condemned |
7766 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1927 |
Condemned |
7689 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1927 |
Condemned |
7701 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1927 |
Condemned |
7726 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1927 |
Condemned |
7685 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1927 |
Condemned |
7694 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1927 |
Condemned |
7753 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1927 |
Condemned |
7800 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1927 |
Condemned |
7832 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1927 |
Condemned |
7825 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1928 |
Condemned |
7771 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1928 |
Condemned |
7749 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1928 |
Condemned |
7647 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1928 |
Condemned |
7839 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1928 |
Condemned |
7566 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1928 |
Condemned |
7665 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1928 |
Condemned |
7567 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1928 |
Condemned |
7693 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1928 |
Condemned |
7708 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1928 |
Condemned |
7620 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1928 |
Condemned |
7629 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1928 |
Condemned |
7732 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1928 |
Condemned |
7560 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1928 |
Condemned |
7706 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1928 |
Condemned |
7714 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1928 |
Condemned |
7731 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1928 |
Condemned |
7673 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1928 |
Condemned |
7702 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1928 |
Condemned |
7578 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1928 |
Condemned |
7579 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1928 |
Condemned |
7698 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1928 |
Condemned |
7809 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1928 |
Condemned |
7716 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1928 |
Condemned |
7661 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1928 |
Condemned |
7617 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1928 |
Condemned |
7676 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1928 |
Condemned |
7828 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1928 |
Condemned |
7554 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1928 |
Condemned |
7569 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1928 |
Condemned |
7695 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1928 |
Condemned |
7735 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1928 |
Condemned |
7815 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1929 |
Condemned |
7574 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1929 |
Condemned |
7581 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1929 |
Condemned |
7634 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1930 |
Condemned |
7595 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1930 |
Condemned |
7777 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1930 |
Condemned |
7607 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1930 |
Condemned |
7614 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1930 |
Condemned |
7725 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1930 |
Condemned |
7775 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1930 |
Condemned |
7599 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1930 |
Condemned |
7557 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1930 |
Condemned |
7704 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1930 |
Condemned |
7707 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1930 |
Condemned |
7738 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1930 |
Condemned |
7743 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1930 |
Condemned |
7760 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1930 |
Condemned |
7790 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1930 |
Condemned |
2356 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7582 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7601 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7611 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7667 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7668 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7559 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7739 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7744 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7788 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7805 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1931 |
Condemned |
7564 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1931 |
Condemned |
7671 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1931 |
Condemned |
7748 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1931 |
Condemned |
7550 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7568 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7573 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7610 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7613 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7656 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7687 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7677 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7679 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7718 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7719 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7758 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7785 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7783 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7793 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7801 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1932 |
Condemned |
7826 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1932 |
Condemned |
7779 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1932 |
Condemned |
7696 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1932 |
Condemned |
7584 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1932 |
Condemned |
7813 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1932 |
Condemned |
7587 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1932 |
Condemned |
7642 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1932 |
Condemned |
7588 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1932 |
Condemned |
7641 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1932 |
Condemned |
7713 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1933 |
Condemned |
7649 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1933 |
Condemned |
7632 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1934 |
Condemned |
7781 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1934 |
Condemned |
7811 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1934 |
Condemned |
7638 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1934 |
Condemned |
2488 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1934 |
Condemned |
7576 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1934 |
Condemned |
7608 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1934 |
Condemned |
7563 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1934 |
Condemned |
7804 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1934 |
Condemned |
7818 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1934 |
Condemned |
7820 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1934 |
Condemned |
7652 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1934 |
Condemned |
7630 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1934 |
Condemned |
7814 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
1935 |
Condemned |
27691 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1935 |
Condemned |
7762 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1935 |
Condemned |
7831 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1935 |
Condemned |
27659 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1935 |
Condemned |
7684 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1935 |
Condemned |
27686 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
27623 |
|
|
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
27635 |
|
|
23B |
Aintree |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
7711 |
|
|
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
7778 |
|
|
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
30/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
7733 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/1936 |
Condemned |
27592 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1936 |
Condemned |
7784 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1936 |
Condemned |
7770 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
27681 |
|
|
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
7764 |
|
|
7B |
Bangor |
|
03/1936 |
Condemned |
27615 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1936 |
Condemned |
27727 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1936 |
Condemned |
27750 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1936 |
Condemned |
7774 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1936 |
Condemned |
7806 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1936 |
Condemned |
7835 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
7791 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
05/1936 |
Condemned |
27736 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1936 |
Condemned |
27734 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1936 |
Condemned |
27639 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1936 |
Condemned |
27657 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1937 |
Condemned |
27583 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1937 |
Condemned |
27680 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1937 |
Condemned |
27655 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1937 |
Condemned |
27600 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1937 |
Condemned |
7792 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1938 |
Condemned |
27593 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1938 |
Condemned |
7688 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1938 |
Condemned |
7712 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1938 |
Condemned |
27594 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1938 |
Condemned |
7724 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1938 |
Condemned |
27660 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1938 |
Condemned |
27651 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1938 |
Condemned |
27551 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1938 |
Condemned |
7838 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1938 |
Condemned |
27575 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1938 |
Condemned |
7728 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1939 |
Condemned |
7764 |
7B |
Bangor |
|
COND |
|
01/1944 |
Condemned |
7729 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1944 |
Condemned |
7631 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1944 |
Condemned |
27626 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1944 |
Condemned |
27623 |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
COND |
|
12/1944 |
Condemned |
7768 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1945 |
Condemned |
7824 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1945 |
Condemned |
27616 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1945 |
Condemned |
27645 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1945 |
Condemned |
27678 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1945 |
Condemned |
7797 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1946 |
Condemned |
7807 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1946 |
Condemned |
7812 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1946 |
Condemned |
27577 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1946 |
Condemned |
27604 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1946 |
Condemned |
27650 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1946 |
Condemned |
7761 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1946 |
Condemned |
27605 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1946 |
Condemned |
27609 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1946 |
Condemned |
7763 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1946 |
Condemned |
7827 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1946 |
Condemned |
27624 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
27602 |
|
|
7B |
Bangor |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
27674 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
7765 |
|
|
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
7821 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
07/1946 |
Condemned |
27662 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1946 |
Condemned |
27571 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1946 |
Condemned |
7778 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
11/1946 |
Condemned |
27572 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1946 |
Condemned |
27606 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1946 |
Condemned |
7705 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1947 |
Condemned |
27555 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1947 |
Condemned |
27666 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1947 |
Condemned |
27558 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1947 |
Condemned |
7722 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1947 |
Condemned |
27795 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1947 |
Condemned |
7772 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1947 |
Condemned |
7682 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1947 |
Condemned |
7709 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1947 |
Condemned |
7823 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1947 |
Condemned |
7690 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1947 |
Condemned |
27552 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1947 |
Condemned |
7747 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1947 |
Condemned |
7755 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1947 |
Condemned |
27618 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1947 |
Condemned |
27640 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1947 |
Condemned |
27672 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1947 |
Condemned |
7742 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1947 |
Condemned |
7834 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1947 |
Condemned |
27590 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1947 |
Condemned |
27597 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1947 |
Condemned |
7717 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1947 |
Condemned |
27636 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1947 |
Condemned |
27663 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1947 |
Condemned |
27664 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1948 |
Condemned |
27648 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1948 |
Condemned |
7715 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
27621 |
|
|
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
7829 |
|
|
4E |
Tredegar |
|
02/1948 |
Condemned |
7796 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1948 |
Condemned |
7841 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
58906 |
|
|
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
03/1948 |
Condemned |
7700 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
13/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
27580 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
13/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
27602 |
7B |
Bangor |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
13/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
7711 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
7B |
Bangor |
|
13/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
58930 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
20/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
58886 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
20/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
58893 |
|
|
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
20/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
58896 |
|
|
7D |
Rhyl |
|
20/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
58930 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
27/03/1948 |
Condemned |
58931 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
58894 |
23B |
Aintree |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
24/04/1948 |
Condemned |
58918 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
24/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
7794 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
24/04/1948 |
Condemned |
58937 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
27603 |
|
|
7D |
Rhyl |
|
08/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
58896 |
7D |
Rhyl |
7B |
Bangor |
|
22/05/1948 |
Condemned |
58936 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
58917 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
7B |
Bangor |
|
12/06/1948 |
Condemned |
58909 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1948 |
Condemned |
58901 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1948 |
Condemned |
58922 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
58890 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
7692 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
7757 |
|
|
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
58913 |
|
|
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
7794 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
58896 |
7B |
Bangor |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
58906 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7B |
Bangor |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
7757 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
14/08/1948 |
Condemned |
58920 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
28/08/1948 |
Condemned |
58905 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
28/08/1948 |
Condemned |
58914 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
58897 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
11/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
58906 |
7B |
Bangor |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
18/09/1948 |
Condemned |
58885 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
18/09/1948 |
Condemned |
58930 |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
COND |
|
18/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
58932 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
02/10/1948 |
Condemned |
58898 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1948 |
Condemned |
58907 |
2A |
Rugby |
|
COND |
|
16/10/1948 |
Condemned |
58893 |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
COND |
|
23/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
7692 |
2B |
Bletchley |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
23/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
58913 |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
23/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
58916 |
|
|
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
23/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
58917 |
7B |
Bangor |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
30/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
58908 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
58897 |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
7720 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
58923 |
|
|
4E |
Tredegar |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
7799 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
58927 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
13/11/1948 |
Condemned |
58884 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
13/11/1948 |
Condemned |
58906 |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
COND |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
58890 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
58921 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/1949 |
Condemned |
58886 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
01/1949 |
Condemned |
58896 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
22/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
7720 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
03/1949 |
Condemned |
58894 |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
COND |
|
23/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
58908 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
23/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
58912 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
23/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
58881 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
58908 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
58911 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
17/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
58908 |
4E |
Tredegar |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
10/1949 |
Condemned |
58882 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1949 |
Condemned |
58927 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
COND |
|
10/1949 |
Condemned |
58934 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1949 |
Condemned |
58890 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
58926 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
58928 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
58935 |
|
|
4E |
Tredegar |
|
19/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
58935 |
4E |
Tredegar |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
7699 |
|
|
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
7699 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
31/12/1949 |
Condemned |
58883 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
01/1950 |
Condemned |
58923 |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
COND |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
58888 |
7D |
Rhyl |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
02/1950 |
Condemned |
58917 |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
58924 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
03/1950 |
Condemned |
58929 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
58900 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
58908 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
58919 |
|
|
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
01/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
58897 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
01/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
58900 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
01/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
58908 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
09/1950 |
Condemned |
58881 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
58932 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
58911 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
58926 |
2B |
Bletchley |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
10/1950 |
Condemned |
58897 |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
58911 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
07/10/1950 |
Condemned |
58916 |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
58887 |
|
|
4A |
Bletchley |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
58911 |
4A |
Bletchley |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
31/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
58924 |
7D |
Rhyl |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
58887 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
58911 |
7D |
Rhyl |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
58932 |
7D |
Rhyl |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
58932 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
16/12/1950 |
Condemned |
58912 |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
58889 |
7D |
Rhyl |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
58921 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
27/01/1951 |
Condemned |
58928 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
COND |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
58900 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
58900 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
58908 |
4A |
Bletchley |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
58908 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
58908 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
10/1951 |
Condemned |
58895 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1951 |
Condemned |
58935 |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
COND |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
58911 |
7D |
Rhyl |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
58921 |
7D |
Rhyl |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
10/11/1951 |
Condemned |
58908 |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
COND |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
58932 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
15/12/1951 |
Condemned |
58933 |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
COND |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
58888 |
4E |
Tredegar |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
58880 |
|
|
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
58915 |
4E |
Tredegar |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
58921 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
58925 |
4E |
Tredegar |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
58932 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
29/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
58888 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
29/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
58880 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
29/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
58915 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
29/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
58921 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
29/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
58925 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
58932 |
4A |
Bletchley |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
24/05/1952 |
Condemned |
58892 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1952 |
Condemned |
58913 |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
COND |
|
06/1952 |
Condemned |
58932 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
COND |
|
05/07/1952 |
Condemned |
58910 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
31/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
58880 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
58911 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
20/12/1952 |
Condemned |
58919 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
COND |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
58889 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
58921 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
58899 |
4D |
Abergavenny |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/08/1953 |
Condemned |
58889 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
COND |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
58900 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
58915 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/03/1954 |
Condemned |
58911 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
COND |
|
30/04/1954 |
Condemned |
58880 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
COND |
|
22/05/1954 |
Reallocation |
58888 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
22/05/1954 |
Reallocation |
58924 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
22/05/1954 |
Reallocation |
58926 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
58900 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
19/06/1954 |
Condemned |
58903 |
7B |
Bangor |
|
COND |
|
08/1954 |
Condemned |
58899 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1954 |
Condemned |
58921 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1954 |
Condemned |
58888 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1954 |
Condemned |
58915 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1954 |
Condemned |
58924 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
COND |
|
10/1954 |
Condemned |
58900 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1954 |
Condemned |
58902 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/04/1955 |
Condemned |
58887 |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
COND |
|
08/1955 |
Condemned |
58891 |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1955 |
Condemned |
58904 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1955 |
Condemned |
58925 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
58926 |
86K |
Abergavenny |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
31/10/1958 |
Condemned |
58926 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|